Havlik v. Johnson & Wales University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00510-ML-LDA
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Christopher Havlik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
v.
No Logo Johnson & Wales University, Defendant

Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Office Providence
Filed 12/7/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Providence
Terminated 5/11/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-1879'[]
Def Custody Status
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008
Appeal Record Returned from USCA-Boston re: [32] Notice of Appeal. (Duhamel, John)
    LREF
    Legal Document 37 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 1/2/2008 USCA Mandate
    MANDATE of USCA (USCA Judgment entered 12/5/2007) as to [32] Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Havlik. THE DISTRICT COURT'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT ORDER IS AFFIRMED. (Duhamel, John)
      LREF
      Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
      NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re [32] Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Havlik. USCA Case Number 07-1879 (Duhamel, John)
        LREF
        Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [32] Notice of Appeal. Forwarded case filed (incl. Doc# 31 - original transcript); certified docket. (Duhamel, John)
          LREF
          Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 Clerk's Certificate Re: Appeal Record
          CLERK'S CERTIFICATE Re: [32] Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Havlik (Duhamel, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Notice of Appeal
            THIS DOCUMENT/APPEAL TERMINATED. DUPLICATIVE OF DOCUMENT #[32]. NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [29] Judgment, by Christopher Havlik. Appeal Record due by 7/2/2007. (Duhamel, John) Modified on 6/1/2007 TO NOTE TERMINATION OF THIS DOCUMENT. (Duhamel, John).
              LREF
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [29] Judgment, [28] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Christopher Havlik. Appeal Record due by 7/2/2007. (Mahoney, John)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 12/31/2007 USCA Appeal Fees
                USCA Appeal Fees received: $ 455.00 Receipt Number 66133, re [32] Notice of Appeal filed by Christopher Havlik. (Duhamel, John)
                  LREF
                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment held on December 28, 2006, before Judge Mary M. Lisi. Court Reporter: Karen Wischnowsky. (Duhamel, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Christopher Havlik for summary judgment proceedings held on 12/28/2006, before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Duhamel, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                      JUDGMENT in favor of defendant against plaintiffentered by Deputy Clerk: on 5/11/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Court Filing
                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [20] Motion for Summary Judgment - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 5/11/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [20] MOTION for Summary JudgmentAMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION filed by Christopher Havlik. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Havlik Depo Pages# (2) Exhibit Annotated Map# (3) Exhibit Secretary of State Corporation Search# (4) Exhibit Providence Code# (5) Affidavit John E. Fornaro, Jr.)(Mahoney, John)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re [20] MOTION for Summary JudgmentSUPPLEMENTAL SUPPORTING MEMO IN OPPOSITION filed by Christopher Havlik. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Havlik Deposition Pages# (2) Exhibit Annotated Map# (3) Exhibit Secretary of State Corporation Search# (4) Exhibit Providence Code# (5) Affidavit John E. Fornaro, Jr.)(Mahoney, John)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                              RESPONSE in Support re [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit: JWU Unusual Incident Report; # (2) Exhibit: Providence Police Report; # (3) Exhibit: Map showing 43-49 Richmond Street; # (4) Affidavit of Christopher O. Placco; # (5) Affidavit of Charles S. Meyers)(Tarantino, John)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi : Telephone Conference held on 4/5/2007;all counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 4/5/2007 11:30 AM in Chambers 310 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi : Motion Hearing held on 12/28/2006 re [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Johnson & Wales University. Counsel present: John R. Mahoney (for pltf); John A. Tarantino (for deft). Counsel argue deft's motion. Court takes matter under advisement; written decision to issue. (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky.) (Duhamel, John)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [22] Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Selected Portions Deposition of Barbara Bennett# (2) Exhibit Crime Alert (Alegria)# (3) Exhibit JWU Unusual Incident Report# (4) Exhibit Witness Statement - Elyse Okolita# (5) Exhibit Selected Pages Handbook for Campus Crime Reporting# (6) Exhibit Providence Map JWU Downtown Campus)(Tarantino, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
                                        NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 12/28/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                                          Motion Forwarded to Chambers [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                            STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS re [22] Response in Opposition, filed by Christopher Havlik. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit: COREY PLACE DEPO TESTIMONY; # (2) Exhibit: RATCLIFFE TRIAL TESTIMONY; # (3) Exhibit: COUGHLIN AFFIDAVIT; # (4) Exhibit: PHILLIPS TRIAL TESTIMONY; # (5) Exhibit: MARTEL DEPO TRANSCRIPT; # (6) Exhibit: HAVLIK DEPO TRANSCRIPT; # (7) Exhibit: BENNETT DEPO TRANSCRIPT; # (8) Exhibit: SCHNEIDER DEPO TRANSCRIPT)(Mahoney, John) Modified on 12/11/2006 to establish proper linkage. (Duhamel, John).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/9/2006, Entered: 12/9/2006
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [20] MOTION for Summary JudgmentMEMORANDUM OF LAW SUBMITTED IN OPPOSITION filed by Christopher Havlik. (Mahoney, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                                                STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Johnson & Wales University re [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Providence Police Dept Offense Report# (2) Exhibit Selected Pages Havlik Deposition# (3) Exhibit Witness Statement - Donald Ratcliffe# (4) Exhibit Witness Statement - Elyse Okolita# (5) Exhibit JWU Unusual Incident Report# (6) Exhibit Notice of Suspension# (7) Exhibit Selected Pages - Bennett Deposition# (8) Exhibit Crime Alert# (9) Exhibit Student Conduct Hearing Decision# (10) Exhibit Letter from Havlik to Martel# (11) Exhibit Appeal Review Notice# (12) Exhibit JWU General Order - 033# (13) Exhibit Selected Pages - JWU Student Handbook)(Tarantino, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006, Terminated: 5/11/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memo by Johnson & Wales University. Responses due by 12/18/2006 (Tarantino, John)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Johnson & Wales University.(Curcio, Paul)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006
                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Johnson & Wales University, filed by Christopher Havlik.(Mahoney, John)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                      TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's [15] Motion to Amend Complaint by adding a claim for "punitive damages". So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/15/2006, pursuant to motion hearing held in open court on this day. (Duhamel, John)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi : Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2006 re [15] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Christopher Havlik. Counsel present: John R. Mahoney (for pltf); John A. Tarantino (for deft) -- Counsel address pltf's motion, to which deft objects. After argument by counsel, the Court GRANTS pltf's motion to amend the complaint by adding a "punitive damages" claim. Mr. Tarantino advises that he accepts service of said amended complaint, which is to be filed electronically by Mr. Mahoney. Court advises Mr. Tarantino that his planned motion for summary judgment must be filed within 10 days of today's hearing, not including the upcoming weekends and Thanksgiving holday, and thus due by COB, Thurs., 11/30/2006. Text Order to issue re: the granting of pltf's motion to amend. (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky.) (Duhamel, John)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006
                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [15] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                                                            Motion Forwarded to Chambers [15] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006
                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [15] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaintwith Supporting Memo filed by Johnson & Wales University. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Crime Alert# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B - JWU Unusual Incident Report# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C - Witness Statement# (4) Exhibit Exhibit D - Portions of Deposition Transcript of Barbara L. Bennett# (5) Exhibit Exhibit E - JWU Student Conduct Hearing Decision)(Tarantino, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                                              TEXT ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time - So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 10/27/06. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006, Terminated: 10/27/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                MOTION for an Extension of Time Extend Time to File Dispositive Motions WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Johnson & Wales University. Responses due by 11/6/2006 (Tarantino, John)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006, Terminated: 11/15/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by all plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/6/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Mahoney, John)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Tarantino on behalf of Johnson & Wales University (Tarantino, John)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                      SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Dean of Students - Ron Martel (on 7/25/06). (Duhamel, John)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/21/2006 Subpoena Returned Executed or Unexecuted
                                                                        SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Corey Place (6/12/06). (Duhamel, John)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER passed for compliance [7] Motion to Compel . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/9/06. Sent to counsel. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006
                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to [7] MOTION to Compel documents. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Notice sent to counsel. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                              SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Kristy Robbins (on 5/22/06). (Duhamel, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                [7] MOTION to Compel documents, [9] MOTION to Strike [7] MOTION to Compel documents REFERRED to Judge Almond. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006, Terminated: 10/27/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                  MOTION to Strike [7] MOTION to Compel Documents, with Supporting Memo by Johnson & Wales University. Responses due by 6/12/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1: Notice of Deposition; # (2) Exhibit 2: letter dated 2/20/06 from P. Curcio to J.R. Mahoney; # (3) Exhibit 3: letter dated 2/22/06 from K. Hynes to J.R. Mahoney; # (4) Exhibit 4: letter dated 2/24/06 from J.R. Mahoney to P. Curcio; # (5) Exhibit 5: letter dated 3/13/06 from P. Curcio to J.R. Mahoney; # (6) Exhibit 6: letter dated 3/17/06 from P. Curcio to J.R. Mahoney)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Havlik by Johnson & Wales University.(Duhamel, John)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006, Terminated: 6/9/2006 Motion to Compel
                                                                                      MOTION to Compel documents WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Christopher Havlik. Responses due by 6/5/2006 (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006
                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2006 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. Moved from 5/3/06 per Atty Mahoney. Letter to follow. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Notice to Take Deposition
                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Havlik by Johnson & Wales University.(Duhamel, John)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2006 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. Notice sent to counsel. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                              PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/12/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2006. Pretrial Memoranda due by 11/13/2006. Signed by Judge Mary M Lisi on 2/9/2006. -- forwarded to counsel of record(Duhamel, John)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi : Rule 16 Conference held in Chambers on 2/9/2006. Counsel present: Curcio, Hynes, Mahoney. (Duhamel, John)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/9/2006 09:30 AM in Chambers 310 before Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Wales University.(Duhamel, John)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                      STIPULATION extending time for defendant to answer complaint - signed by Judge Mary M. Lisi - faxed to counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Johnson & Wales University answer due 1/17/2006. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Havlik. -- Johnson & Wales University served on 12/12/2005, answer due 1/1/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2005, Entered: 12/13/2005
                                                                                                            Attachment to Complaint filed with the Court - Exhibit A (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Johnson & Wales University ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 61933.), filed by Christopher Havlik. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                                                                                                              Summons Issued (1) (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 299 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?