Disney et al v. Thorton et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00511-S-LDA
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo David Disney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
No Logo Kathleen L. Disney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Asquith, Mahoney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John W. Mahoney +3315 331 331 5353 +3317 331 331 7373 johnmahoney@amlawllp.com
v.
No Logo Bethany Thorton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by amica.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J. Flannery +8612 861 861 2840 +2721 272 272 1736 kflannery@amica.com
No Logo Laurea Thorton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by amica.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J. Flannery +8612 861 861 2840 +2721 272 272 1736 kflannery@amica.com
No Logo Todd R. Schram, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Schreiber +1 401 781 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Starkweather & Kibler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rui P. Alves +7812 781 781 2000 +9430 943 943 0800 ruipalves@gmail.com
No Logo URS Midwest, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Schreiber +1 401 781 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Starkweather & Kibler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rui P. Alves +7812 781 781 2000 +9430 943 943 0800 ruipalves@gmail.com
No Logo Bethany Thorton, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by amica.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J. Flannery +8612 861 861 2840 +2721 272 272 1736 kflannery@amica.com
No Logo Laurea Thorton, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by amica.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J. Flannery +8612 861 861 2840 +2721 272 272 1736 kflannery@amica.com
No Logo Todd R. Schram, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Schreiber +1 401 781 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Starkweather & Kibler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rui P. Alves +7812 781 781 2000 +9430 943 943 0800 ruipalves@gmail.com
No Logo URS Midwest, Inc, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Schreiber +1 401 781 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Starkweather & Kibler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rui P. Alves +7812 781 781 2000 +9430 943 943 0800 ruipalves@gmail.com
No Logo Bethany Thorton, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Laurea Thorton, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Todd R. Schram, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Starkweather & Kibler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rui P. Alves +7812 781 781 2000 +9430 943 943 0800 ruipalves@gmail.com
No Logo URS Midwest, Inc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Starkweather & Kibler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rui P. Alves +7812 781 781 2000 +9430 943 943 0800 ruipalves@gmail.com
Office Providence
Filed 12/8/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 350 - Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 11/13/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
TEXT ORDER entering [25] Stipulation of dismissal, filed by David Disney, Kathleen L. Disney, Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton, Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc- So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 11/13/06. (Barletta, Barbara)
    LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
    STIPULATION DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc, Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton, David Disney, Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton, Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc, Kathleen L. Disney, Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton, Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc. (Alves, Rui)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2006 02:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers - Room 412 before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
        TRIAL NOTICE filed. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Court Filing
          NOTICE of Hearing: Calendar Call set for 10/24/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
            Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Pretrial Memorandum due by 10/27/2006. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Status Conference held on 9/20/2006. All counsel present. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006
                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Summary Judgment/Status Conference set for 9/20/2006 03:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers - Room 412 before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Amended MOTION for Extension of Time n to File Dispositive Motions and Discovery by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2006 (Alves, Rui)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006
                    Motion Forwarded to Chambers [22] Amended MOTION for Extension of Time n to File Dispositive Motions and Discovery FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006, Terminated: 9/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                      Assented MOTION for Extension of Time n for dispositive motions and Discovery by URS Midwest, Inc.. Responses due by 9/25/2006 (Alves, Rui)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Rui P. Alves on behalf of URS Midwest, Inc., Todd Schram (Alves, Rui) Modified on 9/7/2006 - added filer Todd Schram (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Court Filing
                          NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2006 9:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Price, Rhonda)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                            SUBPOENA Returned executed as to State Trooper Jeffrey L. Heureux. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006
                              SUBPOENA Returned executed as to William Soares. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006
                                Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2006 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Price, Rhonda)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006 Settlement Conference
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond : Settlement Conference held on 7/26/2006. Counsel of Record present. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Almond Chambers - Room P-208 before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Moved from 7/5/06 per Atty Flannery. Letter to follow. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 7/5/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Almond Chambers - Room P-208 before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Moved from 6/28/06 per Atty Flannery. Letter from atty confirming date. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 6/28/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Almond Chambers - Room P-208 before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Moved from 6/26/06. Letter to follow. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006
                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 6/26/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Almond Chambers - Room P-208 before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Moved from 6/14/06 per Atty Schreiber. Letter to follow. (Theall, Jeannine)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: 3/2/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [10] Motion to Allow a Counter-Claim, granting [11] Motion to Amend Cross-Claim. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 3/2/06. (faxed to counsel of record) (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006
                                              REPLY to Counterclaim of Todd Schram and URS Midwest, Inc. by David Disney, Kathleen L. Disney. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF Settlement Conference set for 6/15/2006 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Almond Chambers - Room P-208 before Magistrate Lincoln D. Almond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/13/06. Sent to counsel.(Theall, Jeannine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER: Discovery due by 6/8/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 9/8/2006. Pretrial Memorandum due by 9/15/2006. Signed by Judge William E Smith on 2/8/06. (faxed to counsel of record)(Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Rule 16 Conference held on 2/8/2006. All counsel of record present. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006
                                                      MEMORANDUM by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc. in support of [10] MOTION to Allow Counter-Claim, [11] MOTION to Amend [3] Crossclaim. Attachments to memorandum could not be scanned - exceed system page capacity. (Baldinelli, Doreen) Modified on 2/6/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 3/2/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                        MOTION to Amend [3] Crossclaim by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc.. Responses due by 2/23/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006, Terminated: 3/2/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                          MOTION for an Order allowing Co-Defendants' Counter-Claim by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc.. Responses due by 2/23/2006 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006
                                                            ANSWER to Crossclaim by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc.. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Stipulation
                                                              STIPULATION extending time for Bethany Thornton and Laurea B. Thornton to respond to Complaint up to and including January 16, 2006 by David Disney, Kathleen L. Disney, Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 16 Conference set for 2/8/2006 11:30 AM before Judge William E Smith. (Mercurio, Alba-Sue)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of John R. Mahoney, Esquire re [1] Complaint, Summons Issued. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006
                                                                    ANSWER to Crossclaim by Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin J. Flannery on behalf of Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Answer
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc. by Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton.(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Answer
                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Bethany Thorton, Laurea Thorton by Todd R. Schram, URS Midwest, Inc..(Baldinelli, Doreen) Modified on 12/28/2005 (Baldinelli, Doreen).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Disney, Kathleen L. Disney. Bethany Thorton served on 12/8/2005, answer due 12/28/2005; Laurea Thorton served on 12/8/2005, answer due 12/28/2005; Todd R. Schram served on 12/8/2005, answer due 12/28/2005; URS Midwest, Inc. served on 12/8/2005, answer due 12/28/2005. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005
                                                                              Summons Issued (8) (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 61934.), filed by David Disney, Kathleen L. Disney. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Ryan)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?