Zabrana v. Barnhart
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00282-DLM-DLM
Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 6:04 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Luz Zabrana, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maria L. Nunez +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 mnoakhill@cs.com
v.
No Logo JOANNE BARNHART, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 6/19/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 863 - D.I.W.C./D.I.W.W. (US Defendant)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Providence
Terminated 3/28/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CASREF, CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Court Filing
JUDGMENT in favor of Jo Anne Barnhart against Luz Zabrana. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 3/28/08. (Saucier, Martha)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [8] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting [9] Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 3/28/08. (Saucier, Martha)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007
      TEXT ORDER granting [10] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael P. Iannotti terminated . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 7/24/07. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 8/24/2007 (Saucier, Martha). Added the word Text
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
        NOTICE of Appearance by Ly Nguyen on behalf of Jo Anne Barnhart (Nguyen, Ly)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007, Terminated: 8/24/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jo Anne Barnhart. Responses due by 9/10/2007 (Iannotti, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2008 Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner
            MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Jo Anne Barnhart. (Iannotti, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006, Terminated: 3/28/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Luz Zabrana. Responses due by 11/13/2006 (Attachments: # (1) FACT SHEET)(Nunez, Maria)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Motion due by 11/7/2006; Defendant's Motion due by 12/7/06; Reply memo due by 12/21/06. Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 9/7/06. (Saucier, Martha)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin- Signed by Judge Mary M Lisi on 9/5/06. (Barletta, Barbara)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006
                    Letter of consensual transfer to Magistrate Judge forwarded to counsel of record (Barletta, Barbara)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                      Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Jo Anne Barnhart.(Iannotti, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Jo Anne Barnhart. (Duhamel, John)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006
                          AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Luz Zabrana for Summons and Complaint as to Jo Anne Barnhart and govt agencies, via certified mail on 6/22/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Summons Issued
                            Summons Issued as to Jo Anne Barnhart. (Barletta, Barbara)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Signed by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 6/19/06. Forwarded to counsel (Saucier, Martha)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006, Terminated: 6/19/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luz Zabrana. (Duhamel, John)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                  COMPLAINT against Jo Anne Barnhart , filed by Luz Zabrana. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                    [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis REFERRED to Judge Martin. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?