United Steelworkers v. Southern Union Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00350-T-DLM
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo United Steelworkers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Roberts, Carroll, Feldstein & Peirce, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Peirce +5217 521 521 7000 +5211 521 521 1328 rpeirce@rcfp.com
v.
No Logo Southern Union Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert P. Brooks +2747 274 274 7200 +7510 751 751 0604 rbrooks@apslaw.com
Space Michael D. Chittick +2747 274 274 7200 +7510 751 751 0604 mchittick@apslaw.com
Office Providence
Filed 8/1/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 8/22/2006
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Court Filing
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Steelworkers entered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 8/22/06 (Jackson, Ryan)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006
    Motion Forwarded to Chambers [2] MOTION to Dismiss FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United Steelworkers (Peirce, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006, Terminated: 8/22/2006 Motion to Dismiss
        MOTION to Dismiss with supporting memo by Southern Union Company. Responses due by 8/18/2006 (Brooks, Robert)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Southern Union Company from Superior Court, State of Rhode Island, Providence County, case number PC2006-3669 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 63942). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Richard Enright, Jr.# (2) Exhibit in Support of Affidavit# (3) Civil Cover Sheet # (4) Complaint)(Leyva, Lucia)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 103 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?