Sheally v. Colgan Air, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00375-ML-LDA
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ellen Sheally, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by tarrolawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Tarro, III +7377 737 737 7200 +7323 732 732 3362 ttarro3rd@tarrolawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Space Patrick B. Landers +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 patrick.landers@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Saab Ab, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pannone Lopes Devereaux & West LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. O'Gara +1 401 824 5100 +8245 824 824 5123 wogara@pld-law.com
No Logo Saab Aircraft AB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pannone Lopes Devereaux & West LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. O'Gara +1 401 824 5100 +8245 824 824 5123 wogara@pld-law.com
No Logo Saab Aircraft of America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pannone Lopes Devereaux & West LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. O'Gara +1 401 824 5100 +8245 824 824 5123 wogara@pld-law.com
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick B. Landers +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 patrick.landers@wilsonelser.com
Office Providence
Filed 8/22/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 310 - Personal Injury: Airplane
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 4/10/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007
TEXT ORDER entering [29] Stipulation filed by Colgan Air, Inc, US Airways, Inc- So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 4/10/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
    LREF
    Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Colgan Air, Inc, US Airways, Inc. (Landers, Patrick)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Settlement Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen : Settlement Conference held on 1/30/2007. (Price, Rhonda)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007
        TEXT ORDER entering [28] Stipulation filed by Ellen Sheally- So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 1/30/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
          LREF
          Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007
          STIPULATION by Ellen Sheally. (Tarro, Thomas)
            LREF
            Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Court Filing
            NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference reset for 1/30/2007 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Price, Rhonda)
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007
              NOTICE to Take Deposition by Colgan Air, Inc of Ellen Sheally (Landers, Patrick)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006
                NOTICE by US Airways, Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance (Batastini, Armando)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Landers on behalf of US Airways, Inc (Landers, Patrick)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2007 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 519 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Price, Rhonda)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/17/2007; Motions due by 10/1/2007; Pretrial Memorandum due by 10/17/2006;- So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 11/29/06. (Barletta, Barbara)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                        Two Summons Issued as to Saab AB, Saab Aircraft AB. (Noel, Jeannine)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M Lisi : Rule 16 Conference held on 11/29/2006; all counsel of record present (Barletta, Barbara)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [18] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carey L. Bertrand, Esquire . So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 11/22/2006. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                              PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM (RULE 16 CONFERENCE STATEMENT) by US Airways, Inc. (Batastini, Armando)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Ellen Sheally. (Tarro, Thomas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006, Terminated: 11/22/2006 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                  MOTION for Carey Bertrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Colgan Air, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Landers, Patrick)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 11/29/2006 09:15 AM in Chambers 310 before Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Saab AB, Saab Aircraft AB, Saab Aircraft of America, LLC.(O'Gara, William)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006
                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc.(Landers, Patrick)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Sheally. Saab Aircraft of America, LLC served on 10/3/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Sheally. Saab AB served on 10/3/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/11/2006
                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Sheally. Saab Aircraft AB served on 10/3/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by US Airways, Inc..(Batastini, Armando)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Ellen Sheally.(Tarro, Thomas)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Summons Issued
                                                    Summons Issued as to Saab Aircraft AB. (Duhamel, John)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006
                                                      ORDER granting [9] Motion to Amend/Correct . So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 9/29/06. (Lisi, Mary)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Ellen Sheally. Responses due by 10/16/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Amended Complaint)(Tarro, Thomas)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by US Airways, Inc..(Batastini, Armando)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgan Air, Inc.. (Landers, Patrick)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                              Reset Deadlines: US Airways, Inc. answer due 9/27/2006. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006
                                                                ORDER entering [4] Stipulation filed by Ellen Sheally,, US Airways, Inc., - So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 9/15/06. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc..(Landers, Patrick)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Sheally. US Airways, Inc. served on 8/29/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                                      STIPULATION extending US Airways, Inc.'s time to respond to complaint by Ellen Sheally, US Airways, Inc.. (Batastini, Armando)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Armando E. Batastini on behalf of US Airways, Inc. (Batastini, Armando)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ellen Sheally. Colgan Air, Inc., served on 8/25/2006. (Duhamel, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006
                                                                            COMPLAINT against Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 64075.) filed by Ellen Sheally. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006 Summons Issued
                                                                            Summons Issued as to Colgan Air, Inc., US Airways, Inc.. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?