Cambio v. Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00537-ML-LDA
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gail Cambio, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by bgmalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony J. Gianfrancesco +3311 331 331 1434 +3519 351 351 9653 a.gianfrancesco@bgmalaw.com
v.
No Logo Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
Space William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
Office Providence
Filed 12/11/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 1002 E.R.I.S.A.
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Providence
Terminated 7/18/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007
TEXT ORDER entering [10] Stipulation filed by Gail Cambio, Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 7/18/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gail Cambio, Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Settlement Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen : Settlement Conference held on 6/12/2007. (Price, Rhonda)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Court Filing
        NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 6/12/2007 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Lovegreen Chambers - Room 521 before Magistrate Judge Robert W Lovegreen. (Price, Rhonda)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 7/31/2007; Pretrial Memorandum due by 8/14/2007;- So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 4/6/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
            TEXT ORDER granting [7] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Carey L. Bertrand - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 4/5/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
              TEXT ORDER granting [6] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William T. Bogaert - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 4/5/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M Lisi : Rule 16 Conference held on 4/5/2007; all counsel of record present (Barletta, Barbara)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007, Terminated: 4/5/2007 motion to appear pro hac vice
                  MOTION for Carey L. Bertrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Thorvaldsen, Kara)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007, Terminated: 4/5/2007 motion to appear pro hac vice
                    MOTION for William T. Bogaert to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Certification for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Thorvaldsen, Kara)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007
                      NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference RESET for Thursday, 4/5/2007 09:45 AM in Chambers 310 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007
                        Rule 16 Conference scheduled for 3/14/07 has been cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date (Barletta, Barbara)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Court Filing
                          NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 3/14/2007 09:15 AM in Chambers 310 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Thorvaldsen, Kara)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint by the Prudential Insurance Company of America by Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America.(Thorvaldsen, Kara)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Gail Cambio.(Gianfrancesco, Anthony)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                                  COMPLAINT against Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America ( Filing Fee $ 350.00; Receipt Number 64926), filed by Gail Cambio. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Issued
                                  Summons Issued as to Prudential Financial Insurance Company of America. (Duhamel, John)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?