Quiros v. Barnhart
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00044-T-LDA
District Judge Ernest C. Torres, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 5:20 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ramon Quiros, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by m-n-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna M. Nesselbush +1 401 274 7400 +1 401 274 7420 jwilson@m-n-law.com
v.
No Logo JOANNE BARNHART, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 2/6/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 865 - Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Providence
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
Motion Forwarded to Chambers [14] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [12] MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner filed by Jo Anne Barnhart, [10] First MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Ramon Quiros; FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge Ernest C. Torres. (Jackson, Ryan)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Commissioner's Motion for an Order Affirming the Decision of the Commissioner (Document No. 12) be GRANTED and that Plaintiff's Motion to Reverse Without a Remand for a Rehearing or, Alternatively, with a Remand for a Rehearing of Commissioner's Final Decision (Document No. 10) be DENIED. [12] MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner filed by Jo Anne Barnhart, [10] First MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration filed by Ramon Quiros Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2008. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/25/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
      MOTIONS REFERRED: [12] MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner referred to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond for Report & Recommendation. (Jackson, Ryan)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008
        RESPONSE in Opposition re [12] MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Ramon Quiros. (Nesselbush, Donna)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
          MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Jo Anne Barnhart. (Nguyen, Ly)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007
            TEXT ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to file Defendant's Motion to Affirm up to and including 1/28/08. Plaintiff's reply brief due by 2/12/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/28/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007, Terminated: 12/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
              MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner and supporting Memorandum by Jo Anne Barnhart.Responses due by 1/14/2008 (Nguyen, Ly)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                MOTIONS REFERRED: [10] First MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Motions referred to Lincoln D. Almond for Report & Recommendation. (Jackson, Ryan)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                  First MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Ramon Quiros. (Nesselbush, Donna)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Jo Anne Barnhart.(Nguyen, Ly)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007, Terminated: 11/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                      MOTION for an Extension of Time by Ramon Quiros.Responses due by 11/19/2007 (Jackson, Ryan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                        TEXT ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time; Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 11/30/2007. Defendant's Motion to Affirm due by 12/28/07. Plaintiff's reply brief due by 1/12/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/2/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                          MOTIONS REFERRED: [8] MOTION for an Extension of Time Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond for determination. (Jackson, Ryan)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer due 11/16/2007. (Noel, Jeannine)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                              TEXT ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to file answer or other responsive pleading up to and including 11/16/07 . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/20/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007
                                [7] MOTION for an Extension of Time for Defendant to file an Answer or other responsive pleading up to and including November 16, 2007. REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Almond for determination. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 9/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  MOTION for an Extension of Time for Defendant to file an Answer or other responsive pleading up to and including November 16, 2007. by Jo Anne Barnhart. Responses due by 10/4/2007 (Nguyen, Ly)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 10/31/2007. Defendant's Motion to Affirm due by 11/28/07. Plaintiff's reply brief due by 12/12/07. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/24/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: This matter is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Lincoln Almond for Report & Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Ernest C. Torres on 8/22/07. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                        Faxed Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction forms to all counsel of record (Nesselbush, Nguyen) (Jackson, Ryan)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ly Nguyen on behalf of Jo Anne Barnhart (Nguyen, Ly)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007
                                            TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown [3] Motion for Extension of Time until 8/1/07 to serve Defendant with the Complaint and Summons . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/18/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007, Terminated: 7/18/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                              First MOTION for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendants WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Ramon Quiros. Responses due by 8/3/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Copies of Complaint and Summonses)(Nesselbush, Donna)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Summons Issued
                                                Summons Issued as to Ramon Quiros. (Saucier, Martha)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007
                                                  TEXT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/6/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007
                                                    [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Almond for determination. (Jackson, Ryan)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ramon Quiros. (Gilfillan, Barbara)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against Jo Anne Barnhart , filed by Ramon Quiros.(Gilfillan, Barbara) Civil Cover Sheet attached added on 2/1/2007 (Gilfillan, Barbara).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?