Gautieri v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00109-ML-LDA
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 1:49 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Daniel Gautieri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Gannon +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 jjgannon@yahoo.com
Space Kelly McKenna-Cournoyer +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 mckennacournoyer@cox.net
v.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 3/23/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Providence
Terminated 3/4/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Court Filing
ORDER granting [9] Motion to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner; denying [10] Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner; adopting Report and Recommendations re [11] Report and Recommendations.- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 3/4/08. (Barletta, Barbara)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 3/4/2008 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Commissioner's Motion for an Order Affirming the Decision of the Commissioner (Document No. 10) be DENIED, that Plaintiff's Motion to Reverse or Remand the Decision of the Commissioner (Document No. 9) be GRANTED and that final judgment enter for Plaintiff remanding this matter for further administrative proceedings consistent with this recommendation. [10] MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner filed by Michael J. Astrue, [9] MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner filed by Daniel Gautieri Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2008. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/13/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 3/4/2008 Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner
      MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Michael J. Astrue. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(Nguyen, Ly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007, Terminated: 3/4/2008 Motion to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner
        MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner with supporting memo by Daniel Gautieri. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fact Sheet# (2) Exhibit Alcantara decision)(Gannon, James)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007
          NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gannon on behalf of Daniel Gautieri (Gannon, James)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 12/31/2007. Defendant's Motion to Affirm due by 1/28/08. Plaintiff's reply brief due by 2/12/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
              ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by Judge Mary M Lisi on 10/29/07. (Lisi, Mary)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION for an Extension of Time to file Motion to Reverse or Remand the decision of the Commissioner by Daniel Gautieri.Responses due by 11/13/2007 (McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 10/31/2007. Defendant's Motion to Affirm due by 11/28/07. Plaintiff's reply brief due by 12/12/07. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/12/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER: This matter is referred to USMJ Lincoln D. Almond for a Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/11/2007. (Duhamel, John)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Court Filing
                      Letter of consensual transfer to Magistrate Judge forwarded to counsel of record (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form) (Barletta, Barbara)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Michael J. Astrue.(Nguyen, Ly)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
                          ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed re: [3] Answer by Michael J. Astrue. (Duhamel, John)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
                            AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Daniel Gautieri for Complaint & Summons Michael J. Astrue served on 6/20/2007, answer due 7/10/2007. (McKenna-Cournoyer, Kelly)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                              COMPLAINT against Michael J. Astrue ( Filing Fee $ 350.00; Receipt Number 65600), filed by Daniel Gautieri. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Michael J. Astrue, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (Duhamel, John)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?