Louis v. Mukasey, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00134-ML-LDA
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Phillip J. Louis, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Blais Cunningham & Crowe Chester

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David C. Clarke +7266 726 726 6140 dclarke@blaislaw.com
v.
No Logo Denis Riordan, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Emilio T. Gonzalez, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Michael B. Mukasey, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Chertoff, Michael Chertoff, Michael, Respondent
Officially listed as "Michael Chertoff"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 4/11/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 8 U.S.C. § 1421(c) Review of Denial of Naturalization Application
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Providence
Terminated 12/17/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008
CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: Final Pretrial Conference ERROR: Minute entry entered in wrong case. (Geile, Wendy)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Final Pretrial Conference held on 8/19/2008. Terrence Donnelly for Plaintiff. Gerald Petros and John Tarantino for Defendant. All counsel of record present. Parties to sumbit proposed jury questionnaire to the court by August 25, 2008. (Geile, Wendy)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
      CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: [21] Transcript; ERROR: transcript incorrectly docketed in case. (Smith, Rana)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/17/08 re: [12] Motion to Enlarge Dates Set in the Arraignment and Pretrial Discovery Order before Judge Ernest C. Torres. Court Reporter: Debra Lajoie. (Smith, Rana)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007
          TEXT ORDER granting [20] Motion to Withdraw [1] Complaint, - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 12/17/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 12/17/2007 Motion to Withdraw
            MOTION to Withdraw [1] Complaint, (Petition for Review) by Phillip J. Louis.Responses due by 12/31/2007 (Clarke, David)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007
              TEXT ORDER: DENYING Respondents' [8] Motion for Summary Judgment; pursuant to proceedings held in open court on 12/5/2007. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/5/2007. (Duhamel, John)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007
                TEXT ORDER: GRANTING Respondents' [19] Motion for Leave to File a Supplement to their Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/5/2007. (Duhamel, John)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007
                  NOTICE of Hearing: Evidentiary Hearing set for Tuesday, 12/18/2007, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Duhamel, John)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007
                    ORAL ORDER granting Petitioner's Oral Motion for Hearing on Merits of the Case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi at conclusion of hearing on Respondents' Motion for Summary Judgment on 12/5/2007. (Duhamel, John)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Hearing
                      Oral MOTION for Hearing on Merits of the Case, by Phillip J. Louis.Responses due by 12/24/2007 (Duhamel, John)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi : Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2007 re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Alberto R. Gonzales, Denis Riordan.Ms. Nguyen addresses Respondents' motion. Court concludes that there is a genuine dispute as to a material fact in this case, and so the Respondents' motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Mr. Clarke moves for an evidentiary hearing on the merits of the case: GRANTED. Hearing set for Tuesday, December 18, 2007, at 9:30AM. (Court notes that Michael B. Mukasey is substituted for Alberto R. Gonzales as a Respondent in this case.) (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky in Courtroom 1 at 10:04.) (Duhamel, John)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                          MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Their Motion for Summary Judgment by Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denis Riordan.Responses due by 12/21/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 5)(Nguyen, Ly)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 25, 2007 before Judge Ernest C. Torres. Court Reporter: Debra D. Lajoie.. (Smith, Rana)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007
                              CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: [18] Transcript; this document was filed in error and does not relate to this case (Barletta, Barbara)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007
                                NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 12/5/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007
                                  TEXT ORDER granting [17] Motion to Continue- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 11/8/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007, Terminated: 11/8/2007 Motion to Continue
                                    MOTION to Continue Hearing by Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denis Riordan.Responses due by 11/26/2007 (Nguyen, Ly)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for Friday, 11/16/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [13] Response in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment With Supporting Memo filed by Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denis Riordan. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stephen Higgins# (2) Ex. 1a Application)(Nguyen, Ly)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Phillip J. Louis re [13] Response in Opposition to Motion (Barletta, Barbara)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                            STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Phillip J. Louis re [13] Response in Opposition to Motion. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                              Motion Forwarded to Chambers [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment FORWARDED to Chambers of Chief Judge Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [8] MOTION for Summary JudgmentWITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Phillip J. Louis. (Attachments: # (1) Supporting Memorandum)(Clarke, David)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007
                                                  TEXT ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 8/27/2007;- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 8/20/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/18/2007, Entered: 8/18/2007, Terminated: 8/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Phillip J. Louis. Responses due by 9/4/2007 (Clarke, David)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Clarke on behalf of Phillip J. Louis (Clarke, David)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Alberto R. Gonzales. Amendment to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [9] Statement of Undisputed Facts Certificate of Service. (Nguyen, Ly)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                          STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denis Riordan re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Nguyen, Ly)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denis Riordan. Responses due by 8/13/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Carole Karlowicz# (2) Exhibit Immigrant Visa# (3) Exhibit Rap Sheet# (4) Exhibit MA Criminal Record# (5) Exhibit Application# (6) Exhibit Document Request# (7) Exhibit Initial Decision# (8) Exhibit Hearing Request# (9) Exhibit Interview Request# (10) Exhibit Final Decision# (11) Exhibit Examiner notes# (12) Exhibit Islam decision# (13) Errata Nguyen decision# (14) Exhibit Butt decision)(Nguyen, Ly)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007
                                                            TEXT ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [1] Complaint, Alberto R. Gonzales answer due 7/25/2007; Michael Chertoff answer due 7/25/2007; Emilio T. Gonzalez answer due 7/25/2007; Denis Riordan answer due 7/25/2007. - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 6/15/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007, Terminated: 6/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Response up to and including July 25, 2007 by all parties. Responses due by 6/29/2007 (Nguyen, Ly)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip J. Louis. Robert Clark Corrente, U.S. Attorney-RI, served on 4/26/2007. Answer due 6/25/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Return Receipt card)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip J. Louis. Emilio T. Gonzalez (via Thomas W. Hussey, Director, Immigration Litigation) served on 5/1/2007, answer due 7/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Return Receipt Card)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip J. Louis. Michael Chertoff ( via Dept. of Homeland Security, Trial Attorney Unit) served on 4/26/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Return Receipt card)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip J. Louis. Denis Riordan served on 4/26/2007, answer due 6/25/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Return Receipt card)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip J. Louis. Alberto R. Gonzales served on 4/30/2007, answer due 6/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Return Receipt card)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007
                                                                          6 Summons Issued. (Leyva, Lucia)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                            COMPLAINT (PETITION FOR REVIEW) against Alberto R. Gonzales, Michael Chertoff, Emilio T. Gonzalez, Denis Riordan ( Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 65841), filed by Phillip J. Louis. (Attachments: # (1) Decision on Naturalization Appeal Proceedings; # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?