Jordan v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00175-LDA-LDA
District Judge Lincoln D. Almond, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Kenneth A. Jordan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Gannon +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 jjgannon@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 5/21/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Affirmed Decision in its Entirety
County Providence
Terminated 1/10/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Court Filing
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Michael J. Astrue against Kenneth A. Jordan. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/10/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [8] Motion to Remand; granting [10] Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner. Final judgment shall enter in favor of the Commissioner. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/10/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007, Terminated: 1/10/2008 Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner
      MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Michael J. Astrue. (Nguyen, Ly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007
        TEXT ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time for filing Defendant's Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner up to and including 12/12/07. Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 12/26/07. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/5/07. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 11/5/2007 (Saucier, Martha). Added the word "Text"
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007, Terminated: 11/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
          MOTION for an Extension of Time by Michael J. Astrue.Responses due by 11/19/2007 (Nguyen, Ly)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/28/2007, Entered: 10/28/2007, Terminated: 1/10/2008 Motion to Remand
            MOTION to Remand the Decision of the Commissioner with supporting memo by Kenneth A. Jordan.Responses due by 11/14/2007 (Gannon, James)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
              TEXT ORDER granting in part. 30 day extension only [7] Motion for Extension of Time ; Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 10/29/2007; Defendant's Motion to Affirm due by 11/26/07; Plaintiff's reply brief due by 12/9/07. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/1/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007, Terminated: 10/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION for an Extension of Time to file motion to modify, reverse or remand the decision of the Commissioner by Kenneth A. Jordan. Responses due by 10/15/2007 (Gannon, James)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand due by 9/28/2007. Defendant's Motion to Affirm due by 10/26/07. Plaintiff's Reply brief due by 11/9/07. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/31/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 Court Filing
                    CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge ; Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond So Ordered by: Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Barletta, Barbara)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                      Letter to counsel for consensual transfer to magistrate with consent form (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form) (Barletta, Barbara)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007
                        ANSWER to Complaint by Michael J. Astrue.(Nguyen, Ly)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Administrative Record
                          ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed re: [3] Answer. (Duhamel, John)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Summons Issued
                            Summons Issued as to Michael J. Astrue. (Barletta, Barbara)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                              TEXT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 5/21/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007
                                [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Almond for determination (Barletta, Barbara)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007, Terminated: 5/21/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth A. Jordan. (Attached Financial Affidavit not scanned pursuant to Privacy Act.) (Duhamel, John)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007
                                    COMPLAINT against Michael J. Astrue , filed by Kenneth A. Jordan. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?