United States of America v. Rapoza
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00202-S-LDA
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Craig F. Rapoza, Respondent
Office Providence
Filed 5/30/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402 IRS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Providence
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CASREF
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007
TEXT ORDER re [5] Notice of Compliance filed by United States of America. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/15/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007
    NOTICE by United States of America re [4] Stipulation and Order (Compliance) (Nguyen, Ly)
      LREF
      Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/9/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond : Show Cause Hearing held on 7/9/2007. (Nguyen, Rapoza - pro se) IRS officer present; Deft has confered with his counsel; Deft understands stipulation; Deft signs stipulation; Deft to turn over documents to IRS; Matter is passed as resolved (Courtroom A at 10:03 am.) (Noel, Jeannine)
          LREF
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007
          Process Return and Receipt Executed by United States Marshal as to [2] Order to Show Cause. (Geile, Wendy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 7/9/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/12/07. Moved from 6/25/07.(Noel, Jeannine)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
              NOTICE of Hearing on [1] Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. Hearing set for 6/25/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. PETITIONER SHALL SERVE RESPONDENT WITH THE PETITION TO ENFORCE IRS SUMMONS AND THIS NOTICE OF HEARING BY JUNE 11, 2007. (Noel, Jeannine)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                [1] Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons referred to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007
                  PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit A -Declaration of Revenue Officer# (3) Exhibit B - Summons)(Geile, Wendy)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 571 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?