Mak v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00307-ML-DLM
District Judge Mary M. Lisi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thy Mak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by m-n-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna M. Nesselbush +1 401 274 7400 +1 401 274 7420 jwilson@m-n-law.com
v.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 8/21/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to U.S. Agency
County Providence
Terminated 2/26/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008
JUDGMENT ENTERED pursuant to [10] Order: REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner, and REMANDING the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 2/26/2008. (Duhamel, John)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: REVERSING the Commissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. section 405(g), and REMANDING the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings: re [9] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; re [8] MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Michael J. Astrue; re [7] First MOTION to Remand filed by Thy Mak. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/22/2008. (Duhamel, John)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re [8] MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Michael J. Astrue, [7] First MOTION to Remand filed by Thy Mak; Recommending that Defendant's Motion for Remand be granted and that the matter be remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2008. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 2/25/08. (Saucier, Martha)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 Motion to Remand to Agency
        MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Michael J. Astrue.Responses due by 3/3/2008 (Nguyen, Ly)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 2/26/2008 Motion to Remand
          First MOTION to Remand by Thy Mak.Responses due by 1/31/2008 (Nesselbush, Donna)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Court Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Motion due by 1/14/2008. Defendant's Motion due by 2/14/08. Plaintiff's Reply Memo due by 2/28/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 11/13/07. (Saucier, Martha)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for Report and Recommendation- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 11/9/07. (Barletta, Barbara)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Court Filing
                Letter for consensual transfer to jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge forwarded to counsel of record (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form) (Barletta, Barbara)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                  ANSWER to Complaint by Michael J. Astrue.(Nguyen, Ly)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                    ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD re: [3] Answer, filed by Michael J. Astrue. (Duhamel, John)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Summons Issued
                      Summons Issued as to Michael J. Astrue. (Barletta, Barbara)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
                        TEXT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/21/07. (Saucier, Martha)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thy Mak. (Duhamel, John)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007
                            COMPLAINT against Michael J. Astrue , filed by Thy Mak. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Duhamel, John)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007
                              [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for determination (Barletta, Barbara)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?