Quinones v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00311-DLM-DLM
Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jose Quinones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Gannon +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 jjgannon@yahoo.com
Space Maria L. Nunez +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 mnoakhill@cs.com
v.
No Logo Michael J Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 8/21/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1383 Review of HHS Decision
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Providence
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gannon on behalf of Jose Quinones (Gannon, James)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
    NOTICE by Jose Quinones Withdrawal of Appearance (Nunez, Maria)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008
      MOTION to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Michael J Astrue. (Nguyen, Ly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
        MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner with supporting memo by Jose Quinones. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fact Sheet)(Nunez, Maria)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Court Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Motion due by 4/11/2008. Defendant's Motion due by 5/12/08. Plaintiff's Reply Memo due by 5/27/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 2/11/08. (Saucier, Martha)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Court Filing
            CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin So Ordered by: William E. Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008
              ANSWER to Complaint by Michael J Astrue.(Nguyen, Ly)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Remark
                Forward letter of Consent to counsel of record. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                  AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Jose Quinones for Summons & Complaint via certified mail; RRR Michael J Astrue served on 11/13/2007. (Nunez, Maria)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to Michael J Astrue. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
                      TEX ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/21/07. (Saucier, Martha)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis n by Jose Quinones. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
                          COMPLAINT against Michael J Astrue , filed by Jose Quinones. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
                            [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Martin for determination. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 52 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?