Gay v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00403-DLM-DLM
Magistrate Judge David L. Martin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Daniel C. Gay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Gannon +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 jjgannon@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 10/31/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition District Court Reversed Decision in Whole or Part
County Providence
Terminated 5/8/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Daniel C. Gay against Michael J. Astrue. Entered by Concetta R. Zinni Deputy Clerk: on 5/8/2008. (Zinni, Concetta)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Plaintiff's [7] Motion to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner is granted to the extent that the matter be remanded to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings; Defendant's [8] Motion to Remand is granted. Judgment shall enter for plaintiff.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/8/2008. (Zinni, Concetta)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008
      NOTICE THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR MONDAY MAY 12, 2008 HAS BEEN CANCELLED PER ORDER OF THE COURT (Saucier, Martha)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
        RESPONSE to Motion re [8] MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration filed by Daniel C. Gay. (Gannon, James)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008
          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [8] MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration : Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 5/8/2008 Motion to Remand to Agency
            MOTION to Remand to Social Security Administration WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Michael J. Astrue. Responses due by 5/5/2008 (Nguyen, Ly)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008, Terminated: 5/8/2008 Motion to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner
              MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner with supporting memo by Daniel C. Gay. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SSI award notice)(Gannon, James)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff's Motion due by 3/18/2008. Defendant's Motion due by 4/18/08. Reply Memo due by 5/2/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1/18/08. (Saucier, Martha)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                  CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. So Ordered by William E. Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                    ANSWER to Complaint by Michael J. Astrue.(Nguyen, Ly)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                      AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Daniel C. Gay for summons & complaint by certified mail Michael J. Astrue served on 11/2/2007. (Gannon, James)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007
                        Summonses Issued as to Michael J. Astrue, U.S. Attorney-RI and U.S. Attorney General (Duhamel, John)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007
                          TEXT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 10/31/07. (Saucier, Martha)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 10/31/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis * Financial Affidavit could not be scanned due to privacy act, by Daniel C. Gay. (Geile, Wendy)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                              COMPLAINT against Michael J. Astrue, filed by Daniel C. Gay. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Geile, Wendy)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                MOTIONS REFERRED: [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis * Financial Affidavit could not be scanned due to privacy act, Motions referred to David L. Martin for determination. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?