Lake v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00414-LDA-LDA
District Judge Lincoln D. Almond, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:22 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Maureen A Lake, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Gannon +3318 331 331 8989 +3316 331 331 6644 jjgannon@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo Michael J Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 11/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 864 - Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Providence
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 7 Motion to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner; granting 8 Motion to Affirm the Decision of the Commissioner. Final judgment shall enter in favor of the Commissioner. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/17/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008
    MOTION to Reverse Decision of the Commissioner with supporting memo by Maureen A Lake. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Fact Sheet)(Gannon, James)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Court Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion is due by 8/29/2008. Defendant's Motion is due by 9/26/08. Plaintiff's Reply Memo is due by 10/10/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/26/08. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 6/26/2008 (Saucier, Martha). Added reply date
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Court Filing
        CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith. (Vorias, Doreen)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Court Filing
          LETTER OF CONSENT forwarded to counsel of record. Signed by Judge William E. Smith (Vorias, Doreen)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
            ANSWER to [1] Complaint by Michael J Astrue.(Nguyen, Ly)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
              TEXT ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/19/07. (Noel, Jeannine)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 11/19/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis n by Maureen Lake. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007
                  COMPLAINT against Michael J Astrue, filed by Maureen Lake.(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007
                    MOTIONS REFERRED: [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Motions referred to Lincoln D. Almond for determination. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 58 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?