Sellers v. United States Department of Defense et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00418-S-DLM
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 12:41 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Rosezola Sellers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia E. Andrews +4210 421 421 0966 +4210 421 421 0964 peandrews@verizon.net
Space Louise A. Herman +2774 277 277 4110 +4210 421 421 0964 lahermanlaw@verizon.net
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert M. Gates"
Brinker International, Inc. Officer/Director, Brinker International, Inc.
Nacco Industries, Inc. Officer/Director, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Parker Drilling Co /de/
Starbucks Corporation Officer/Director, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 11/16/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Providence
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
105-cv-00381-S-DLM
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Rosezola Sellers re [10] Exhibit in Support. (Andrews, Patricia)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
    EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by United States Department of Defense, pursuant to [9] Order. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit G (amended))(Nguyen, Ly)
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER TO FILE COMPLETE EXHIBIT - Defendant is directed to file by July 2, 2008, an amended Exhibit G which includes the enclosures which Plaintiff states on the last page of Exhibit G she was enclosing with her answer. Within fourteen days of the filing of the amended Exhibit G, Plaintiff shall file any objection(s) to its authenticity re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim filed by United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 6/18/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin: Motion Hearing held on 6/11/2008 re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim filed by United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates. Patricia Andrews for the plaintiff; Ly Nguyen for the defendants. Hearing continued from 5/28/08. Plaintiff states objections to the motion to dismiss; Defendants respond; Plaintiff shall have ten days to file a response to the authenticity of documents; Court takes matter under advisement. (Courtroom B at 10:15.) (Saucier, Martha)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
          NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim : Motion Hearing continued to 6/11/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2008 re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim filed by United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates. Patricia Andrews and Louise Herman for the plaintiff; Ly Nguyen for the defendants; Defendant argues motion; Plaintiff requests a continuance; Court grants the request and continues the hearing to June 11, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (Courtroom B at 10:13.) (Saucier, Martha)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008
              RESPONSE in Support re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8)(Nguyen, Ly)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
              TEXT ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim Replies to objections are due by 5/23/2008. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/19/08. (Saucier, Martha) Modified on 5/19/2008 (Saucier, Martha). Added the word "text"
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
                MOTIONS REFERRED: [7] MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [6] Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [6] Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for determination. (Geile, Wendy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008, Terminated: 5/19/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                  MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [6] Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim by United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates. Responses due by 5/30/2008 (Nguyen, Ly)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim : Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                      MOTIONS REFERRED: [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim Motions referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for Report and Recommendation. (Geile, Wendy)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim with supporting memo filed by Rosezola Sellers. (Andrews, Patricia)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008
                          TEXT ORDER granting [5] Motion to Redact. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 4/28/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008, Terminated: 4/28/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION To Redact Certain Exhibits Attached to Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim re [4] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim by United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates. Responses due by 5/9/2008 (Nguyen, Ly)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008
                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Hostile Work Environment Claim WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates. Responses due by 5/8/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit 2, # (12) Exhibit 3, # (13) Exhibit 4, # (14) Exhibit 5)(Nguyen, Ly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2008: # (15) Exhibit 2(redacted), # (16) Exhibit C- (Redacted), # (17) Exhibit D (Redacted), # (18) Exhibit E (Redacted), # (19) Exhibit F (Redacted), # (20) Exhibit H (Redacted), # (21) Exhibit I (Redacted)) (Geile, Wendy). Modified on 5/2/2008 Deleted exhibits 2, C, D, E, F, H, I per Text Order Granting [5] (Geile, Wendy).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosezola Sellers. United States Department of Defense served on 2/21/2008, answer due 4/21/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Geile, Wendy)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                                Summons Issued (1) as to U.S.A.(Jackson, Ryan)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against all defendants, filed by Rosezola Sellers.(Andrews, Patricia)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007
                                    CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED - Since Judge William E Smith has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 05-381 this case is permanently assigned to Judge William E Smith for all further proceedings (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                      CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Judge William E Smith. Related Case Number 05-381 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                        COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense, Robert M. Gates ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 67347.), filed by Rosezola Sellers. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Geile, Wendy)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?