Hebert v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00452-S-LDA
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 3:51 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Florence M Hebert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Currier +8612 861 861 2200 currlaw@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 12/10/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346 Tort Claim
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Providence
Terminated 4/24/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
TEXT ORDER ENTERING [6] Stipulation filed by Florence M Hebert, United States of America. This matter is hereby dismissed without prejudice, and that each party is to bear its own fees, costs, and expenses. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 4/24/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008
    STIPULATION (Dismissal) by Florence M Hebert, United States of America. (Nguyen, Ly)
      LREF
      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
      Letter from Plaintiff's Attorney dated March 27, 2008 (Baldinelli, Doreen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
        TEXT ORDER GRANTING [5] Letter from Plaintiff's Attorney dated March 27, 2008, which is being treated as a Motion for Extension of Time for an additional thirty (30) days, up to and including April 24, 2008 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss.. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/28/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/24/2008 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction WITH SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by United States of America.Responses due by 3/24/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C# (5) Exhibit D# (6) Exhibit 2)(Nguyen, Ly)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
          TEXT ORDER granting [3] MOTION for an Extension of Time up to and including March 10, 2008 for filing Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 2/13/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION for an Extension of Time for filing Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading by United States of America.Responses due by 2/25/2008 (Nguyen, Ly)
              LREF
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Florence M Hebert. United States of America served on 12/11/2007, answer due 12/31/2007. (Geile, Wendy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 67495.), filed by Florence M Herbert. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Summons Issued
                Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 62 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?