Giordano v. Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00048-S-LDA
District Judge William E Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Antonio L. Giordano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Adler Pollock & Sheehan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Avanzato +1 401 274 7200 +1 401 351 4607 javanzato@apslaw.com
Space Edward L. Maggiacomo +401274 720 0ext123 +1 401 751 0604 emaggiacomo@apslaw.com
Space Geoffrey Williams Millsom +1 401 274 7200 +1 401 751 0604 gmillsom@apslaw.com
v.
No Logo American Senior Living Communities RI I, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shechtman Halperin Savage, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas A. Giron +2721 272 272 1400 +2721 272 272 1403 dgiron@shslawfirm.com
No Logo Midland Loan Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark W. Freel +2766 276 276 6611 +2766 276 276 6611 mfreel@eapdlaw.com
Space Stephen M. Prignano +1 401 274 9200 +1 401 276 6611 sprignano@eapdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul M. Hoffmann +1 816 691 2746 +1 816 412 1191 phoffmann@stinson.com
No Logo Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ferrucci Russo PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph P. Ferrucci +4551 455 455 1000 +4557 455 455 7778 jferrucci@frlawri.com
Space Christopher M. Mulhearn +4551 455 455 1000 +4557 455 455 7778 cmulhearn@frlawri.com
United States Department of Housing and Urban Development United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Joseph P. Ferrucci, Receiver

Toggle Switch Represented by Ferrucci Russo PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Mulhearn +4551 455 455 1000 +4557 455 455 7778 cmulhearn@frlawri.com
United States Department of Housing and Urban Development United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, Interpleader

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Interpleader

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Brown +1 202 307 6053 +1 785 295 2853 James.E.Brown2@usdoj.gov
Space Dulce Donovan +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 dulce.donovan@usdoj.gov
Space Ly Nguyen +7095 709 709 5000 ly.nguyen@usdoj.gov
Office Providence
Filed 2/13/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County Providence
Terminated 7/31/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
Motion Forwarded to Chambers [55] MOTION establish claims bar date for secured and administrative claims and for Procedure for Adjuidcation of Claims FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Geile, Wendy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    RESPONSE in Opposition re [55] MOTION establish claims bar date for secured and administrative claims and for Procedure for Adjuidcation of Claims WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by United States of America. (Brown, James)
      LREF
      Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
      RESPONSE in Opposition re [55] MOTION establish claims bar date for secured and administrative claims and for Procedure for Adjuidcation of Claims (Limited Objection) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit proof of claim form)(Nguyen, Ly)
        LREF
        Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
        MOTION establish claims bar date for secured and administrative claims and for Procedure for Adjuidcation of Claims by Joseph P. Ferrucci. Responses due by 9/8/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notice of Claim, # (2) Exhibit Proof of Claim Form, # (3) Exhibit Order-Claims Bar Date)(Mulhearn, Christopher)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008
          TEXT ORDER granting [54] MOTION for an Extension of Time up to and including September 22, 2008 to File Answer to Amended Complaint. Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P. answer due 9/22/2008; Joseph P. Ferrucci answer due 9/22/2008.. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 8/13/2008. (Vorias, Doreen)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008
            Motion Forwarded to Chambers [54] MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint in Intervention FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Geile, Wendy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008, Terminated: 8/13/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
              MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint in Intervention by Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P., Joseph P. Ferrucci. Responses due by 8/25/2008 (Mulhearn, Christopher)
                LREF
                Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                AMENDED COMPLAINT in Intervention against Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P., Joseph P. Ferrucci, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proof of Claim, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Notices of Federal Tax Lien)(Brown, James)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                  AFFIDAVIT of Notice by Joseph P. Ferrucci. (Ferrucci, Joseph)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Court Filing
                    CONSENT ORDER ENTERED. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 7/31/2008. (Vorias, Doreen)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER entered. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 7/31/2008. (Vorias, Doreen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [32] Motion Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate and Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 7/31/2008. (Vorias, Doreen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Joseph P. Ferrucci served on 7/23/2008, answer due 8/12/2008. (Brown, James)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P. served on 7/23/2008, answer due 8/12/2008. (Brown, James)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/2008. All counsel of record present. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton.) (Geile, Wendy)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2008 re [32] MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens filed by Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P.. Robert Stolzman for Plaintiff. Ly Nguyen, Douglas Giron, and Mark Freel for Defendants. Interpleaders: Dulce Donovan and James Brown. Receiver: Joseph Ferrucci. All counsel of record present. Arguments heard as to Receiver Ferrucci's Petition to Approve the Sale; Court GRANTS. Court addresses. No objections to the Receiver's proposed draft order. No objections to the two orders submitted in open Court as to Midland Loan. Receiver Ferrucci to finalize the draft of the main order and circulate to all parties for review and signatures before submitting to the Court. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton in Courtroom 2 at 5:04 pm.) (Smith, Rana)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [41] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul M. Hoffman. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 7/18/2008. (Geile, Wendy)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Court Filing
                                    RE-FORMATTED TRANSCRIPT of Chambers Conference Proceedings held on July 7, 2008 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Lajoie, Telephone number 401-952-2731. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/1/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2008. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                      CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY re: [44] Transcript, TRANSCRIPT FILED IN AN INCORRECT FORMAT. RE-FORMATTED TRANSCRIPT WILL BE FILED. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Chambers Conference Proceedings held on 07/07/08 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra D. Lajoie, Telephone number 401-952-2731. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/1/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2008. (Lajoie, Debra)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                          NOTICE of Hearing: Notice of Hearing RE: Petition to Approve the Sale set for 7/23/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Court Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by United States of America, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development for proceedings held on July 7, 2008 before Judge William E. Smith.. (Nguyen, Ly)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
                                              APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re [41] MOTION for Paul M. Hoffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Midland Loan Services, Inc.. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008, Terminated: 7/18/2008 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                MOTION for Paul M. Hoffmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Midland Loan Services, Inc.. (Freel, Mark)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Status Conference held on 7/7/2008. (Court Reporter Debra Lajoie.) (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Chambers Conference Proceedings held on July 2, 2008 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2008. (Clayton, Anne)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 7/2/2008. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton.) (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
                                                        REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference set for 7/7/2008 at 9:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers - before Judge William E Smith. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                          MOTION Relief from Stay WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by United States of America, United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. Responses due by 7/18/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26)(Nguyen, Ly)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                          NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference set for 7/2/2008 at 9:30 AM in Judge Smith Chambers - before Judge William E Smith. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                            REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Motion to Approve the Sale Hearing RESET for 7/7/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
                                                              NOTICE of Cancellation RE: Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2008 at 9:30. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                                                                NOTICE OF CANCELLATION RE: Notice of Hearing scheduled for June 25, 2008 at 3:00 p.m. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                                                                  SECOND REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing RE: Motion to Approve the Sale RESET for 7/2/2008 AT 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. Hearing has been rescheduled to this date per request of the receiver. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                                                                    REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing RE: Motion to Approve the Sale RESET for 6/25/2008 AT 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008
                                                                      REVISED NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: Motion to Approve the Sale RESET for 6/25/2008 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [32] MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Nguyen, Ly)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [32] MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens with Supporting Memo filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Supporting Memorandum)(Brown, James)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [32] MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens including Midland's Motion to Determine that Stay Does Not Bar Assignment and/or Relief from Stay with Supporting Memo filed by Midland Loan Services, Inc.. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                                                                              Motion Forwarded to Chambers [32] MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens FORWARDED to Chambers of Chambers of Judge Smith. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER ENTERING [33] Joint Stipulation filed by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 6/16/2008. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re [32] MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens With Supporting Memo filed by Antonio L. Giordano. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Avanzato, Joseph)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
                                                                                    STIPULATION by Midland and HUD by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Nguyen, Ly)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008
                                                                                      TEXT ORDER granting [31] Motion to Enter into an Extension Agreement. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 6/10/2008. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                        MOTION Receiver's Petition to Sell Real Estate & Business Assets Free and Clear of Liens by Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P.. Responses due by 6/26/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Ferrucci, Joseph)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                          MOTION Enter Into An Extension Agreement with ASLC Management of RI, I, LLC by Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P.. Responses due by 6/26/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H)(Ferrucci, Joseph)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 26, 2008 before Judge Smith. Court Reporter/Transcriber Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number (401) 255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (Clayton, Anne)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008
                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: Motion to Approve the Sale set for 6/25/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Status Conference held on 5/29/2008. Edward L. Maggiacomo, Joseph Avanzato, Geoffrey W. Millsom for Plaintiff. Joseph P. Ferrucci for Mt. St. Francis. Douglas A. Giron, Mark W. Freel for Defendant, Midland, Dulce Donovan, Ly Nguyen, Wendy Kisch for Government, R. Thomas Dunn, Ann DiArpino, Jon Savage, Scott Flynn and John Leonard present. (Vorias, Doreen)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Freel on behalf of Midland Loan Services, Inc. (Freel, Mark)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 5/29/2008 at 2:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                                                                                      NOTICE by Suburban Mortgage Associates Incorporated of Withdrawal of Appearance (Brenner, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Prignano on behalf of Midland Loan Services, Inc. (Prignano, Stephen)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Civil Hearing held on 3/26/2008 re: Giordano's Motion for Approval of Administrative Claim. Joseph Avanzato for Plaintiff. Douglas Giron and John Savage for Defendants. Interpleader: James Brown. Receiver: Joseph Ferrucci. All counsel of record present. Arguments heard in regards to Plaintiffs Motion for Administrative Claim; Court reserves ruling. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton in Courtroom 2 at 10:11 am.) (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008
                                                                                                            Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proof of Claim# (2) Exhibit 2 - Notices of Federal Tax Lien)(Brown, James)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of James E. Brown by United States of America. (Brown, James)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                                                Proposed Findings of Fact by United States of America.(Brown, James)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                                                                                                                  Proposed Findings of Fact by United States of America, Antonio L. Giordano.(Brown, James)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008
                                                                                                                    Addendum (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) by Antonio L. Giordano. (Avanzato, Joseph)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by Antonio L. Giordano in support of Notice of Hearing (In Support Of Motion For Administrative Claim). (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Avanzato, Joseph)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Suburban Mortgage Associates Incorporated Response to the United States' Objection to Motion to Prove Administrative Claim. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Joseph P. Ferrucci Receiver's Response to United States' Objection to Motion to Prove Administrative Claim. (Ferrucci, Joseph)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by United States of America in support of Notice of Hearing (in support of Objection to Motion to Prove Admin Claim. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - United States' Objection# (2) Exhibit 2 - Motion to Prove Claim# (3) Exhibit 3 - Nursing Home Agreement# (4) Exhibit 4 - Receivership Petition# (5) Exhibit 5 - Information# (6) Exhibit 6 - Original Plea# (7) Exhibit 7 - Amended Plea# (8) Exhibit 8 - Criminal Docket# (9) Exhibit 9 - Judgment# (10) Exhibit 10 - Satisfaction of Judgment# (11) Exhibit 11 - Purchase and Sale)(Brown, James)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [15] Motion to Appoint Receiver; Joseph P. Ferrucci appointed. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on March 11, 2008. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P. re [15] Assented MOTION to Appoint Receiver Joseph P. Ferrucci and Confirm All Previous Orders of RI Superior Court (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Ferrucci, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008, Terminated: 3/12/2008 Motion to Appoint Receiver
                                                                                                                                Assented MOTION to Appoint Receiver Joseph P. Ferrucci and Confirm All Previous Orders of RI Superior Court by Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P..Responses due by 3/24/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Supporting Memorandum)(Ferrucci, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by O. Ahlborg & Sons, Inc. TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROVE ADMINISTRATIVE CLAIM AND MOTION TO ATTACH (FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Dunn, R.)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing:Motion Hearing re: Giordano's Motion for Approval of Administrative Claim set for 3/26/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : Status Conference held on 3/5/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 3/5/2008 at 2:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : In Chambers Conference held on 2/29/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008
                                                                                                                                            STATE COURT RECORD. (Geile, Wendy)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing:In Chambers Conference set for 2/29/2008 at 10:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith : In Chambers Conference held on 2/22/2008. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by O. Ahlborg & Sons, Inc. OF APPEARANCE BY R. THOMAS DUNN (Little, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Giron on behalf of American Senior Living Communities RI I, LLC (Giron, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Antonio L. Giordano (Millsom, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Avanzato on behalf of Antonio L. Giordano (Avanzato, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Allan M. Shine on behalf of Health Facilities Associates (Shine, Allan)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING: In Chambers Conference set for 2/22/2008 at 11:30 AM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E Smith. (Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James E Brown on behalf of United States of America (Brown, James)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher H. Little on behalf of O. Ahlborg & Sons, Inc. (Little, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph P. Ferrucci on behalf of Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P. (Ferrucci, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Mulhearn on behalf of Mt. St. Francis Associates, L.P. (Mulhearn, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ly Nguyen on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Nguyen, Ly)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Brenner on behalf of Suburban Mortgage Associates Incorporated (Brenner, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States of America from Superior Court, case number P.B. 06-3301., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Receiver's Petition# (3) Exhibit A - Legal Description# (4) Exhibit B - Real Estate Purchase and Sale Agreement# (5) Exhibit C - Schedule# (6) Motion# (7) Exhibit A - Mount St. Francis Agreement)(Baldinelli, Doreen)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?