USA v. Cahill
Criminal Case Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00054-ML-DLM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zechariah Chafee +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 zechariah.chafee@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo David R. Cahill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by mdlawri.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark W. Dana +4541 454 454 1222 +4904 490 490 4834 mwd@mdlawri.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Providence
Filed 6/18/2008
County Providence
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
108-mj-00068-DLM
Count 1-2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
Count 3-7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2118B.F
Offense Level 4
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
NOTICE OF HEARING, DEFENDANT REQUEST as to David R. Cahill: Sentencing set for Friday, 1/9/2009, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi.(Duhamel, John)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi: Change of Plea Hearing as to David R. Cahill held on 8/26/2008. Plea entered by David R. Cahill (1); Guilty: Counts 1 through 7. -- AUSA Zechariah Chafee (Govt); Mark W. Dana (for Deft) -- (No Plea Agreement filed in this case.) Deft is sworn & questioned by the Court. Deft is advised of his rights. Govt summarizes the evidence had this case proceeded to trial. Deft enters guilty plea as to the seven-count Indictment. Court accepts the guilty plea. Sentencing is set for Friday, January 9, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. Deft is remanded. (Court Reporter Debra Lajoie in Courtroom 1 at 10:11.) (Duhamel, John)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
      NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to David R. Cahill: Change of Plea Hearing set for Tuesday, 8/26/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi.(Barletta, Barbara)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008
        NOTICE to change plea by David R. Cahill (Dana, Mark)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
          NOTICE OF HEARING as to David R. Cahill: Final Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, 8/26/2008 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 310 before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi.(Barletta, Barbara)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Court Filing
            PRETRIAL ORDER as to David R. Cahill - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 8/4/08. (Barletta, Barbara)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Court Filing
              TRIAL NOTICE signed by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/4/08(Barletta, Barbara)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to David R. Cahill: Jury Selection set for Thursday, 9/11/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (Barletta, Barbara)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                  CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF HEARING as to David R. Cahill; pretrial conference scheduled for 8/6/08 is cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date(Barletta, Barbara)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Court Filing
                    ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to David R. Cahill Motions due by 8/5/2008. Responses due by 8/15/2008 Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2008 09:30 AM in Judge Lisi Chambers - Room 307 before Judge Mary M Lisi. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 6/24/08. (Saucier, Martha)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin:Arraignment as to David R. Cahill (1) Count 1-2,3-7 held on 6/24/2008. Z. Chafee for the government; Mark Dana for the defendant; Charleen Tryhubczak for probation. Court informs defendant of pending charges; Court questions defendant; Court enters a plea of not guilty as to all counts on behalf of the defendant; Court enters an arraignment order; Court continues the previous order of detention; Defendant remanded into custody.(Courtroom B at 10:15.) (Saucier, Martha)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                        NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to David R. Cahill Arraignment set for 6/24/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(Saucier, Martha)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Indictment
                          INDICTMENT as to David R. Cahill (1) count(s) 1-2, 3-7. (Attachments: # (1) Cover Sheet) (Saucier, Martha)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to David R. Cahill Time excluded from 5/20/08 until 6/19/08. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/20/08. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Court Filing
                            ORDER OF DETENTION as to David R. Cahill. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 5/2/08. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008
                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/24/08. in case as to David R. Cahill. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin:Detention Hearing as to David R. Cahill held on 4/28/2008. Z. Chafee for the government; Mark Dana for the defendant; Brian Pletcher for probation. Attorneys argue; Court orders defendant detained pending further proceedings; Defendant remanded into custody.(Courtroom B at 3:40.) (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Court Filing
                                  WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by David R. Cahill; accepted by Magistrate Judge David Martin. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark W. Dana appearing for David R. Cahill (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to David R. Cahill Detention Hearing set for 4/28/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin:Initial Appearance as to David R. Cahill held on 4/24/2008. Z. Chafee for the government; Mark Dana for the defendant; Charleen Tryhubczak for probation; Court questions defendant; Court informs defendant of pending charges; Court informs defendant of his rights; Defendant waives preliminary examination and the Court accepts the waiver; Government requests detention; Defendant requests a continuance of the detention hearing; Court schedules Detention hearing for April 28, 2008 at 3:30 p.m.; Court orders defendant detained pending the detention hearing.(Courtroom B at 2:21.) (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                                          Arrest of David R. Cahill (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008
                                            COMPLAINT as to David R. Cahill (1). (Attachments: # (1) Cover Sheet, # (2) Attachment) (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00068-DLM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?