USA v. Brown
Criminal Case Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00069-S-DLM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 2, 2021 at 6:14 PM DT (3.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zechariah Chafee +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 zechariah.chafee@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Scott M. Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by srt-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis J. Flanagan +8493 849 849 3040 +8494 849 849 4330 fflanagan@srt-law.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Providence
Filed 8/7/2008
County Providence
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case 1:08-CR-65-01JD District of New Hampshire
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) - BANK ROBBERY
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/2/2021, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/10/2021, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Warrant Returned Executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Order Setting Conditions of Release
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Order Appointing Public Defender (Form Attached)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                    REVISED NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Scott M. BrownNotice with Intent to Plea Hearing set for 9/29/2008 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith.(Geile, Wendy)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                      NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Scott M. Brown Notice with Intent to Plea Hearing set for 10/30/2008 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith.(Geile, Wendy)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Scott M. Brown. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/27/08. (Saucier, Martha)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Arraignment OrderCourt Filing
                          ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to Scott M. Brown Motions due by 10/6/2008. Responses due by 10/16/2008 Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2008 03:30 PM in Judge Smith Chambers - Room 412 before Judge William E Smith.So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/25/08. (Saucier, Martha)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                            CJA 20 as to Scott M. Brown: Appointment of Attorney Francis J. Flanagan for Scott M. Brown. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/25/08. (Saucier, Martha)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Francis J. Flanagan appearing for Scott M. Brown. (Saucier, Martha)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Arraignment
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin:Arraignment as to Scott M. Brown (1) Count 1 held on 8/25/2008, Detention Hearing as to Scott M. Brown held on 8/25/2008. Z. Chafee for the government; Frank Flanagan for the defendant; Maureen Bradley for probation. Court informs defendant of the charge; Court questions defendant; Court enters a plea of not guilty on behalf of the defendant; Court enters an arraignment order; No bail arugment; Court orders defendant detained.(Courtroom B at 2:18.) (Saucier, Martha)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008
                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Scott M. Brown Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2008 at 3:30 PM in Judge Smith Chambers - before Judge William E Smith.(Geile, Wendy)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008
                                    RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Scott M. Brown Arraignment RESCHEDULED for 8/25/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. MOVED FROM 8/18/08.(Noel, Jeannine)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
                                      NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Scott M. Brown Arraignment set for 8/18/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(Noel, Jeannine)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Rule 20 - Transfer In
                                        CONSENT TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION (Rule 20) from District of New Hampshire by Scott Brown. (Noel, Jeannine)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?