USA v. Murray
Criminal Case Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:08-cr-00073-ML-DLM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 29, 2016 at 3:29 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Zechariah Chafee +7095 709 709 5000 +7095 709 709 5001 zechariah.chafee@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Alvin Murray, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Crowell +2726 272 272 6600 +2740 274 274 0175 judithcrowell@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Providence
Filed 8/13/2008
County Providence
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
108-mj-00103-DLM
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a) - BANK ROBBERY
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Amended Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Alvin Murray. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 8/28/08. (Saucier, Martha)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Arraignment OrderCourt Filing
          ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to Alvin Murray Motions due by 10/6/2008. Responses due by 10/16/2008 Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2008 09:30 AM in Judge Lisi Chambers - Room 307 before Judge Mary M Lisi. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 08/25/08. (Saucier, Martha)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Arraignment
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin:Arraignment as to Alvin Murray (1) Count 1 held on 8/25/2008. Z. Chafee for the government; Judith Crowell for the defendant; Maureen Bradley for probation. Court informs defendant of pending charge; Court questions defendant; Court enters a plea of not guilty on behalf of the defendant; Court enters an arraignment order; Court orders the previous order of detention to continue; Defendant remanded into custody.(Courtroom B at 2:45.) (Saucier, Martha)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
              NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Alvin Murray Arraignment set for 8/25/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(Noel, Jeannine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Indictment
                INDICTMENT as to Alvin Murray (1) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (Noel, Jeannine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/21/08 in case as to Alvin Murray. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
                  Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Returned Executed as to Alvin Murray on 7/21/08. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Court Filing
                    WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Alvin Murray; accepted by Magistrate Judge David Martin. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Judith Crowell appearing for Alvin Murray (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Court Filing
                        CJA 20 as to Alvin Murray: Appointment of Attorney Judith Crowell for Alvin Murray. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 7/17/08. (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin:Initial Appearance as to Alvin Murray held on 7/21/2008, Detention Hearing as to Alvin Murray held on 7/21/2008. Z. Chafee for the government; Judith Crowell for the defendant; Maureen Bradley for probation. Court informs defendant of pending charge; Court informs defendant of his rights; Court questions defendant; Defendant waives preliminary examination and the Court accepts the waiver; Government requests detention; Defendant waives bail argument; Defendant requests to file a motion for reconsideration of bail at a later date; Court grants the request; Court orders defendant detained.(Courtroom B at 2:22.) (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                            Arrest of Alvin Murray (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                              Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Alvin Murray for 7/21/08 (Saucier, Martha)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to Alvin Murray Initial Appearance set for 7/21/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin.(Noel, Jeannine)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                  Attorney update in case as to Alvin Murray. Attorney Judith Crowell for Alvin Murray added. (Noel, Jeannine)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
                                    COMPLAINT as to Alvin Murray (1). (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Cover Sheet) (Noel, Jeannine)[1:08-mj-00103-DLM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?