Morales v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00188
District Judge Filemon B. Vela, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Javier Morales, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
Space Paula C Offenhauser +1 713 567 9364 +1 713 718 3302 paula.offenhauser@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 12/13/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cameron
Terminated 7/9/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case B-96-314-04[Criminal Case]
Def Custody Status
Flags 2255, CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002
The petition for a writ of certiorari filed with the Supreme Court has been denied; Court of Appeals #: 01-40846, filed. (ogutierrez)
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001
    ORDER OF USCA (certified copy) 11/29/01 issued as mandate on denying Certificate of Appealability, filed.. CCA No. 01-40846 (ogutierrez)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001
      Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: (ogutierrez)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001
        Certified and transmitted record on appeal consisting of 1 vol. of the record to U.S. Court of Appeals: . Circuit No. 01-40846 Parties ntfd. (mperez)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 USCA Appeal Fees
          USCA appeal fees received $ 105.00 Receipt #: 115362 Parties ntfd. (ogutierrez)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Appeal Remark
            USCA LETTER Re: 01-40846 received. (ogutierrez)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER denying [8-1] motion for certificate of appealability , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001
                Notice of appeal and Copy of docket transmitted to USCA: (ogutierrez)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001, Terminated: 8/3/2001 Motion for Certificate of Appealability
                  REQUEST for certificate of appealability by Javier Morales, Motion Docket Date 8/9/01 [8-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001, Terminated: 8/3/2001 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL of [7-1] order by Javier Morales , filed. Fee Status: not paid Appeal record due on 8/4/01 (ogutierrez)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Order Adopting Memorandum and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                      ORDER ADOPTING [5-1] report and recommendations , entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (lalaniz)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Terminate Case
                        Case closed (lalaniz)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001
                          OBJECTION by Javier Morales to [5-1] report and recommendations , filed (ogutierrez)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge John W. Black Re: [4-1] motion to dismiss, [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , entered. Parties ntfd. Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 6/22/01. Recommendation that motion to dismiss be Granted and 2255 motion be dismissed. (ogutierrez)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Terminated:
                              MOTION to dismiss , alternative for summary judgment by USA, Motion Docket Date 2/25/01 [4-1] motion, 2/25/01 [4-2] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Terminated:
                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA (Added attorney Jeffrey Alan Babcock), filed. (ogutierrez)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 Filing Fee Received
                                  Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 114570 (ogutierrez)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Court Filing
                                    ORDER Petitioner will be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis , Response to motion reset to 1/31/01 for [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge John W. Black ) (ogutierrez)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000
                                      Forwarded on this date an application to proceed in forma pauperis to petitioner. (ogutierrez)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000
                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John W. Black (ogutierrez)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000
                                          MEMORANDUM by Javier Morales in support of [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , filed (ogutierrez)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000, Terminated: 7/9/2001 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
                                            MOTION to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Javier Morales, Motion Docket Date 1/2/01 [1-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?