Lewis v. U S Probation Office
Federal Court Proceeding Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-mc-00016
District Judge Hilda G. Tagle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ronald Lee Lewis, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Lee Lewis
v.
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L Turner +1 713 567 9361 +1 713 718 3302 jim.turner@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 7/10/2003
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Cameron
Terminated 1/8/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CRB-01-343[Criminal Case]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Order Adopting Memorandum and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING [6-1] report and recommendations , entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Hilda G. Tagle ) (mperez)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Terminate Case
    Case closed (mperez)
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Felix Recio , entered. Parties ntfd. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Felix Recio Objections to R and R due by 12/20/03 (mperez)
        LREF
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER , entered; Request for additional time to pay filing fees is Granted. Petitioner has 30 days from the date of this order. Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Felix Recio ) (ogutierrez)
          LREF
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
          RESPONSE by Ronald Lee Lewis to Magistrate Judge's [3-1] Notice of Dismissal, filed. (gmendieta)
            LREF
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003
            NOTICE of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution, filed. It is Ordered that Complaint and Demand for Damages be placed on the dismissal docket and dismissed therafter is no response is received from Petitioner by 9/29/03. (ogutierrez)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003
              Letter has been sent to Mr. Lewis informing him of the cost for filing. (ogutierrez)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 Letter
                Letter to Court regarding filing fee by Ronald Lee Lewis , filed. (ogutierrez)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Remark
                  Complaint and Demand for Damages, filed. (ogutierrez)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Remark
                    Petitioner has been forwarded an application to proceed in forma pauperis via U S Mail as of this date. (ogutierrez)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/11/2003 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                      CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Felix Recio (ogutierrez)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 47 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?