Colindres v. United States of
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:91-cv-00060
District Judge Filemon B. Vela, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Pedro Angel Colindres, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Gene Woods +1 713 862 9600 +1 713 864 8738 ronwoodslaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
Space Paula C Offenhauser +1 713 567 9364 +1 713 718 3302 paula.offenhauser@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 3/25/1991
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cameron
Terminated 12/16/1992
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993 USCA Judgment
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 8/20/93 issued as mandate on 9/13/93 affirming the Judgment of the District Court Re: [11-1] appeal , filed. (ogutierrez)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993 USCA Per Curiam
    Certified copy of PER CURIAM by USCA, filed. (ogutierrez)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 9/17/1993 Appeal Record Returned
      Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: (ogutierrez)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/1993, Entered: 1/22/1993
        Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [11-1] appeal (ogutierrez)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 1/20/1993, Entered: 1/21/1993 Certificate of Probable CauseCourt Filing
          CERTIFICATE OF PROBABLE CAUSE , entered ( Signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 12/31/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL of [10-1] order by Pedro Angel Colindres , filed. Appeal record due on 1/15/93. No fee paid. (mgarza)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 12/16/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [8-1] report and recommendations denying [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/16/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 Terminate Case
                Case closed (mgarza)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/1/1992, Entered: 9/4/1992 Objections
                  OBJECTION to [8-1] Magistrate's report and recommendations by Pedro Angel Colindres , filed. (mgarza)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/1992, Entered: 8/17/1992, Terminated: 12/16/1992 Terminated:
                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Fidencio Garza Jr. , entered. Parties ntfd. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Fidencio Garza Jr. Objections to R and R due by 8/24/92 (fmremp)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/15/1992, Entered: 7/16/1992 Remark
                      Recv'd ltr from petitioner requesting copy of complete file. Send copy certified, rrr. (fmremp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 2/5/1992 Terminated:
                        RESPONSE by USA to [6-1] motion for default judgment against USA , filed (ogutierrez)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/14/1991, Entered: 2/5/1992 Terminated:
                          MOTION for default judgment against USA by Pedro Angel Colindres, Motion Docket Date 9/3/91 [6-1] motion , filed (ogutierrez)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/12/1991, Entered: 1/28/1992 Terminated:
                            MOTION for summary judgment by USA, Motion Docket Date 8/1/91 [5-1] motion , filed (ogutierrez)
                              LREF
                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/12/1991, Entered: 7/16/1991 Terminated:
                              ANSWER to Complaint by United States of (Added attorney Jeffery A Babock), filed. (ogutierrez)
                                LREF
                                Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/1991, Entered: 6/27/1991
                                ORDER granting [2-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Fidencio Garza Jr. ) (ogutierrez)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/3/1991, Entered: 5/6/1991 Order
                                  ORDER that gvt respond to Pet's 2255 Mot on or before 7/8/91, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Fidencio Garza Jr. ) (fmremp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/25/1991, Entered: 3/25/1991, Terminated: 2/5/2007 Motion/Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                    MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by Pedro Angel Colindres, Motion Docket Date 4/15/91 [2-1] motion , filed (fmremp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/25/1991, Entered: 3/25/1991, Terminated: 12/16/1992 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255
                                      MOTION to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Pedro Angel Colindres, Motion Docket Date 4/15/91 [1-1] motion , filed (fmremp)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?