Ortega, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-00002
District Judge Filemon B. Vela, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
Space Paula C Offenhauser +1 713 567 9364 +1 713 718 3302 paula.offenhauser@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 1/4/1993
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cameron
Terminated 6/9/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 2255, CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 4/19/1994, Entered: 4/21/1994 Terminated: Court Filing
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 3/24/94 issued as mandate on 04/15/94 held before Thornberry, Duhe and Barksdale, Circuit Judges, Affirming the Judgment of the District Court Re: [14-1] appeal , filed. (mgarza)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 8/10/1993, Entered: 8/10/1993 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [4-1] Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, supporting documentation and order, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 7/26/1993, Entered: 8/13/1993 Terminated:
      MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, Motion Docket Date 8/15/93 [16-1] motion , filed (mgarza)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/21/1993, Entered: 8/10/1993 Terminated:
        Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [14-1] appeal. Record on appeal consisting of l volume record C. A. B-93-002 and l volume record Cr-B-86-361 forwared to Court of Appeals. (mgarza)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: 7/21/1993 Terminated:
          FRAP 24 CERTIFICATE, filed. The Appeal is taken in good faith. The party appealing is entitled to proceed in forma pauperis. (mgarza)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 7/2/1993 Terminated:
            NOTICE OF APPEAL of [13-1] order by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega , filed. Fee Status: None. Appeal record due on 7/13/93 (mgarza)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/10/1993 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [9-1] motion for summary judgment dismissing [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/10/1993 Terminate Case
                Case closed (mgarza)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/26/1993, Entered: 5/28/1993 Reply
                  Reply by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, to the Government's Response and Objections to the Magistrate's Report and Recommendation, filed. (mgarza)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/1993, Entered: 5/25/1993 Terminated:
                    MOTION to extend time to respond to Govt's response to Report and Recommendation by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, Motion Docket Date 6/8/93 [11-1] motion , filed (mgarza)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 5/6/1993, Entered: 5/7/1993, Terminated: 8/10/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [4-1] Motion to proceed in forma pauperis , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Mag Judge John W. Black ) (mgarza)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Terminated: Court Filing
                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Mag Judge John W. Black Re: [9-1] motion for summary judgment, [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , entered. Parties ntfd. Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 5/14/93 (ogutierrez)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Notice of Change of Address
                          Notice of change of address by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega , filed. As per telephone call of petitioner his new address is P.O. Box 5000, Oakdale, La. 71463. (ogutierrez)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993, Terminated: 6/9/1993 Brief
                            BRIEF by USA in support of [9-1] motion for summary judgment , filed. (ogutierrez)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993, Terminated: 6/9/1993 Terminated:
                              MOTION for summary judgment by USA, Motion Docket Date 4/20/93 [9-1] motion , filed (ogutierrez)
                                LREF
                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/31/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993, Terminated: 6/9/1993 Terminated:
                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA (Added attorney ), filed. (ogutierrez)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER, set answer due for 4/12/93 for USA , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Mag Judge John W. Black ) (ogutierrez)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for certificate of probable cause by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, Motion Docket Date 1/24/93 [7-1] motion , filed (ogutierrez)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Brief
                                      BRIEF by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega in support of [5-1] motion for appointment of counsel , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Terminated:
                                        MOTION for appointment of counsel by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, Motion Docket Date 1/24/93 [5-1] motion , filed (ogutierrez)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993, Terminated: 5/6/1993 Terminated:
                                          Application for Leave to Proceed IFP by petitioner Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega received on 1/4/93 along with the Original Complaint , entered. Application for IFP () (ogutierrez)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Memorandum
                                            MEMORANDUM by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega in support of [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 , filed (ogutierrez)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                              PETITION for writ of habeas corpus; filed (ogutierrez)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/1993, Entered: 5/5/1993 Terminated:
                                                MOTION to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Reynaldo Fuentes Ortega, Motion Docket Date 1/24/93 [1-1] motion , filed (ogutierrez)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?