Crown v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:95-cv-00109
District Judge Filemon B. Vela, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Errol L. Crown, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 7/5/1995
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cameron
Terminated 7/2/1996
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CR.B-92-123/SD-Tx[Brownsville Div]
Def Custody Status
Flags 2255, CLOSED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 Order Adopting Memorandum and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING [4-1] report and recommendations granting [3-1] motion for summary judgment and brief , entered. Government's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and case of action is dismissed with prejudice. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/3/1996 Terminate Case
    Case closed (mgarza)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996, Terminated: 7/2/1996 Terminated: Court Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Fidencio Garza Jr Re: [3-1] motion for summary judgment and brief , entered. Parties ntfd. Motion no longer referred Objections to R and R due by 4/4/96 (mgarza)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 Terminated:
        MOTION for summary judgment and brief by United States of Ame Jeffery Alan Babcock for defendant United States of Ame, Motion Docket Date 11/7/95 [3-1] motion , filed. (mgarza)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995 Terminated:
          ANSWER to Amended Section 2255 Motion, by United States of Ame (Added attorney Jeffery Alan Babcock), filed. (mgarza)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER , entered; Government is hereby ORdered to respond on or before October 18, 1995. Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Fidencio Garza Jr ) (mgarza)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 7/5/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995 Terminated:
              MOTION to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by Errol L. Crown Errol L. Crown for plaintiff Errol L. Crown, Motion Docket Date 7/25/95 [1-1] motion , filed. (mgarza)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 49 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?