Coronado v. U.S. Marshal, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-00283
District Judge Filemon B. Vela, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ruben Garza Coronado, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo U. S. Parole Commission, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.S. Marshal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by grwpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mervyn Milton Mosbacker, Jr +1 281 265 2522 +1 281 690 5171 mmosbacker@grwpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 10/14/1994
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1651 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cameron
Terminated 2/17/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 6/9/1997, Entered: 6/16/1997 Order Adopting Memorandum and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING [29-1] report and recommendations, Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be Dismissed; entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (fmremp)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 3/4/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Objections
    OBJECTION to [29-1] report and recommendations by Ruben Garza Coronado , filed. (ogutierrez)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 2/10/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Fidencio Garza Jr , entered. Parties ntfd. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Fidencio Garza Jr Objections to R and R due by 2/20/97 (ogutierrez)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 1/28/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997 Terminated:
        MOTION for judgment by Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 2/17/97 [28-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Terminated:
          MOTION for expedited hearing by Ruben Garza Coronado Ruben Garza Coronado for plaintiff Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 11/17/96 [27-1] motion , filed. (mgarza)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.
            Second AMENDED PETITION OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Ruben Garza Coronado , (Answer due 11/7/96 for U.S. Marshal, for U. S. Probation Offi, for U. S. Parole Commiss ) amending , filed. (mgarza)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996 Terminated:
              MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Petition of Writ of Habeas Corpus by Ruben Garza Coronado Ruben Garza Coronado for plaintiff Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 11/17/96 [25-1] motion , filed. (mgarza)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/13/1996 Terminated:
                MOTION to dismiss , for summary judgment by U.S. Marshal, Motion Docket Date 8/29/96 [24-1] motion, 8/29/96 [24-2] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Terminated:
                  JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 7/9/96 issued as mandate on 7/31/96 affirming the Judgment of the District Court Re: [22-1] appeal , filed. (ogutierrez)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Terminated:
                    Certified copy of PER CURIAM by USCA, filed. (ogutierrez)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996 Terminated:
                      USCA LETTER Re: record returned l vol. , filed. (ogutierrez)
                        LREF
                        Blank 21 Filed: 5/9/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER , entered; The Government is hereby ordered to respond to Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, and to submit with its response the relevant transcript(s) and/or record(s) to this Court by August 9, 1996. Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Fidencio Garza Jr ) (mgarza)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 4/16/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Terminated:
                          MOTION Leave to Proceed and excuse from Complying with the district Court Rules of Procedure by Ruben Garza Coronado Ruben Garza Coronado for plaintiff Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 5/6/96 [20-1] motion , filed. (mgarza)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Remark
                            In Forma Pauperis Declaration by petitioner, filed. (ogutierrez)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Memorandum
                              MEMORANDUM by Ruben Garza Coronado in support of [16-1] petition, [15-1] petition , filed (ogutierrez)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Terminated:
                                MOTION for appointment of counsel by Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 5/2/96 [17-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                  AMENDED Prisoner Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; filed. FILING FEE $ ifp (ogutierrez)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/2/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                    PETITION for writ of habeas corpus; filed FILING FEE $ IFP (ogutierrez)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996, Terminated: 3/25/1998 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                      Motion of Appellant to reinstate the appeal is GRANTED. Record transmitted to Court of Appeals as requested. Circuit No. 95-40213. Record consists of 1 volume and 1 container of exhibits. (mgarza)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995, Terminated: 3/25/1998 USCA Judgment
                                        JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 11/6/95 issued as mandate on 11/6/95 dismissing appeal for want of prosecution for failure of appellant to file brief within the time fixed by the rules, [0-0] of the District Court Re: [9-1] appeal , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995, Terminated: 3/25/1998 Appeal Record Returned
                                          Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: L vol.of record, l envelope, and 1 supplemental record. (ogutierrez)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995, Terminated: 3/25/1998 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                            Transmitted supplemental record on appeal: [9-1] appeal (mgarza)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [11-1] motion to proceed in forma pauperis , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/8/1995, Entered: 5/8/1995, Terminated: 3/25/1998 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                Certified and transmitted record on appeal consisting of l volume of record/l container of exhibits/depositions to U.S. Court of Appeals: [9-1] appeal . Circuit No. 95-40213 Parties ntfd. (mgarza)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/2/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion for Fred Leon III to withdraw as attorney , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 4/3/1995, Entered: 4/20/1995, Terminated: 8/23/1995 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by Ruben Garza Coronado Fred G Leon III for plaintiff Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 4/23/95 [11-1] motion , filed. (mgarza)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995, Terminated: 5/2/1995 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Fred Leon III to withdraw as attorney , and for appointment of counsel by Ruben Garza Coronado Fred G Leon III for plaintiff Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 3/20/95 [10-1] motion, 3/20/95 [10-2] motion , filed. (mgarza)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/28/1995, Entered: 3/15/1995 Terminated:
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL of [8-1] order of 2/17/95 by Ruben Garza Coronado , filed. Appeal record due on 3/15/95 (mgarza)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying [7-1] motion for reconsideration of [2-1] order of denial of application for writ of habeas corpus , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (mgarza)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/24/1995 Terminate Case
                                                            Case closed (mgarza)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: 11/8/1994, Terminated: 2/17/1995 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION for reconsideration of [2-1] order of denial of application for writ of habeas corpus by Ruben Garza Coronado Fred G Leon III for plaintiff Ruben Garza Coronado, Motion Docket Date 11/23/94 [7-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/26/1994 Exhibit
                                                                Exhibit list by Ruben Garza Coronado , filed (ogutierrez)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/26/1994 Terminated:
                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Marshal (Added attorney Mervyn M Mosbacker Jr), filed. (ogutierrez) Modified on 10/26/1994
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/20/1994, Entered: 10/26/1994 Writ HearingCourt Filing
                                                                    Hearing held b/Judge Vela; Bill Holloway ct/rpt. re:Application for writ of Habeas Corpus. Fred Leon f/pet; Mervyn Mosbacker f/govt; Court hears arguments of both sides. Court finds petitioner is not being held illegally. Application for writ is denied. (ogutierrez) Modified on 10/26/1994
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: 10/18/1994 Court Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Writ of Habeas Corpus filed in this cause is hereby set for evidentiary hearing on the 20th day of October, l994 at 1:30 p.m. in the U. S. District Court located in Brownsville, Texas before U. S. District Judge Filemon B. Vela , filed (mgarza)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 10/18/1994, Entered: 10/18/1994 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) Petitioner shall be transferred from the Southern District of Texas in the Starr county Jail; U. S. Marshal, U. S. Probation, and U. S. Parole Commission shall be required to substantiate their continued jurisdiction over petitioner; petitioner shall not be released on bond pending the Writ of Habeas Corpus Hearing; petitioner shall not be immediately released from custody and this cause shall not be terminated instanter. (mgarza)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/14/1994, Entered: 10/14/1994
                                                                          PETITION for writ of habeas corpus and Request For Expedited Hearing; filed FILING FEE $ 5.00 RECEIPT # 107486 (mgarza)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 95 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?