Quintero v. United States of Ame
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-00082
District Judge Filemon B. Vela, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Luis Donald Quintero, Petitioner
v.
United States of America United States of America, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Alan Babcock +1 713 567 9363 +1 713 718 3302 jeff.babcock@usdoj.gov
Space Paula C Offenhauser +1 713 567 9364 +1 713 718 3302 paula.offenhauser@usdoj.gov
Office Brownsville
Filed 5/21/1996
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 510 - Taking - Personalty
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cameron
Terminated 3/31/1997
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CR-92-B-203-03[SD/Tex-Bro Divs]
Def Custody Status
Flags 2255, CLOSED, MAG
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999
JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 2/10/99 issued as mandate on 4/6/99 dismissing [0-0] appeal. (ogutierrez)
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999, Terminated: 4/9/1999 USCA Per Curiam
    Certified copy of PER CURIAM by USCA, filed. (ogutierrez)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999
      Record on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals: (ogutierrez)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998
        Certified and transmitted record on appeal consisting of 1 volume of civil record and 1 volume of criminal record together with 5 volumes of transcript, 1 envelope of PSI and 1 envelope of Sentencing recommendation report forwarded this day by UPS to U.S. Court of Appeals: . Circuit No. 97-41470 Parties ntfd. (ogutierrez)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [21-1] motion for relief from judgment , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/17/1998
            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John W. Black (fmremp)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998, Terminated: 8/26/1998 Motion for Relief from Judgment
              MOTION for relief from judgment by Luis Donald Quintero, Motion Docket Date 7/5/98 [21-1] motion , filed. (fmremp)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [19-1] motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/12/1998, Entered: 5/12/1998
                  Appeal has been reinstated as per 5th Circuit. (ogutierrez)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998, Terminated: 5/15/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis by Luis Donald Quintero, Motion Docket Date 5/11/98 [19-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/23/1998 Terminated:
                      JUDGMENT OF USCA (certified copy) 2/18/98 issued as mandate on dismissing for want of prosecution for failure of appellant to pay docketing fee within the time fixed by the rules [0-0] case the Judgment of the District Court Re: [17-1] appeal , filed. (ogutierrez) Modified on 02/23/1998
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/24/1997 Terminated:
                        USCA LETTER Re: 97-41470 acknowledging receiving notice of appeal. (ogutierrez)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997, Terminated: 5/26/1998 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
                          Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket transmitted to USCA: [17-1] appeal (ogutierrez)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997 Terminated:
                            NOTICE OF APPEAL of [16-1] order by Luis Donald Quintero , filed. Fee Status: not paid Appeal record due on 12/5/97 (ogutierrez)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 10/28/1997, Entered: 10/28/1997 Court Filing
                              ORDER denying [15-1] motion for clarification of [13-1] order denying [14-2] motion for appointment of counsel , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997, Terminated: 10/28/1997 Terminated:
                                MOTION for clarification of [13-1] order by Luis Donald Quintero, Motion Docket Date 9/23/97 [15-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/3/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997 Terminated:
                                  MOTION to correct magistrate's order , for appointment of counsel by Luis Donald Quintero, Motion Docket Date 9/23/97 [14-1] motion, [14-2] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997 Court Filing
                                    ORDER denying [12-1] motion for leave to file Notice of Appeal , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/15/1997, Terminated: 8/15/1997 Terminated:
                                      MOTION for leave to file Notice of Appeal by Luis Donald Quintero, Motion Docket Date 8/27/97 [12-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Order Adopting Memorandum and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                        ORDER ADOPTING [9-1] report and recommendations granting [4-2] motion for summary judgment dismissing [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, with Memorandum of Law , entered. Parties ntfd. ( Signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER OF DISMISSAL adopting [9-1] report and recommendations , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Filemon B. Vela ) (ogutierrez)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 4/2/1997 Terminate Case
                                            Case closed (ogutierrez)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 2/5/1997, Terminated: 3/31/1997 Terminated: Court Filing
                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge John W. Black , entered. Parties ntfd. Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge John W. Black Objections to R and R due by 2/9/97 (ogutierrez)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/16/1997, Entered: 1/21/1997 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Attempted Compliance by United States of Ame , filed (ogutierrez)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER transcript due of the sentencing from the govermnent on 1/10/97 , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge John W. Black ) (ogutierrez)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to extend time to respond Response to motion reset to 10/25/96 for [1-1] motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, with Memorandum of Law , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge John W. Black ) (ogutierrez)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/23/1996, Entered: 9/27/1996, Terminated: 10/16/1996 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION to extend time to respond by United States of Ame, Motion Docket Date 10/13/96 [5-1] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 Brief
                                                        BRIEF by United States of Ame in support of [4-2] motion for summary judgment , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by United States of Ame (Added attorney Jeffery Alan Babcock), filed. (ogutierrez)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION to dismiss , for summary judgment by United States of Ame, Motion Docket Date 10/9/96 [4-1] motion, 10/9/96 [4-2] motion , filed. (ogutierrez)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER NUNC PRO TUNC, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge John W. Black ) (ogutierrez)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/13/1996, Entered: 6/21/1996 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER to proceed in forma pauperis , set answer due for 9/15/96 for United States of Ame , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Magistrate Judge John W. Black ) (ogutierrez)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/31/1996 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, with Memorandum of Law by Luis Donald Quintero, Motion Docket Date 6/10/96 [1-1] motion , (mgarza)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?