District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Montana District Court Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit United States Supreme Court

Pfau et al v. Mortenson et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 9:11-cv-00072-SEH

Tags
Last Updated October 6, 2016 at 12:38 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dan Donovan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Langendorf +1 312 782 5933 +1 312 377 1771 rlangendorf@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Daniel Drury +1 312 346 7950 +1 312 346 5777 ldrurylaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOYT & BLEWETT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Blewett, III +1 406 761 1960 +7617 761 761 7186 zblewett@hoytandblewett.com
Space Anders Blewett, IV +1 406 761 1960 +1 406 761 7186 ablewett@hoytandblewett.com
No Logo Deborah Netter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Langendorf +1 312 782 5933 +1 312 377 1771 rlangendorf@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry Daniel Drury +1 312 346 7950 +1 312 346 5777 ldrurylaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by HOYT & BLEWETT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Blewett, III +1 406 761 1960 +7617 761 761 7186 zblewett@hoytandblewett.com
Space Anders Blewett, IV +1 406 761 1960 +1 406 761 7186 ablewett@hoytandblewett.com
No Logo George Pfau, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HOYT & BLEWETT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Blewett, III +1 406 761 1960 +7617 761 761 7186 zblewett@hoytandblewett.com
No Logo Susie Pfau, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HOYT & BLEWETT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander Blewett, III +1 406 761 1960 +7617 761 761 7186 zblewett@hoytandblewett.com
v.
No Logo Central Asia Institute, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert L. Eisenbach, III +1 415 693 2000 +1 415 693 2222 reisenbach@cooley.com
Space Stephen Cassidy Neal +1 415 693 2000 +1 650 849 7400 sneal@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MATOVICH KELLER & MURPHY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carey E. Matovich +1 406 252 5500 +1 406 252 4613 cmatovich@mkfirm.com
No Logo David Oliver Relin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Elliott Ostrander Preston, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonia A. Montalbano +1 503 224 7112 +1 503 224 7819 sonia@eoplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Garlington, Lohn & Robinson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E. Hansberry +1 406 523 2500 +5232 523 523 2595 cehansberry@garlington.com
Space Elena J. Zlatnik +1 406 523 2500 +1 406 523 2595 ejzlatnik@garlington.com
No Logo Greg Mortenson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Clark Maclay +1 202 862 5000 +1 202 429 3301 kcm@capdale.com
Space Todd E. Phillips +1 202 862 7850 +1 202 429 3301 tphillips@capdale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KASTING KAUFFMAN & MERSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Kauffman +1 406 586 4383 +1 406 587 7871 jkauffman@kkmlaw.net
No Logo MC Consulting, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Clark Maclay +1 202 862 5000 +1 202 429 3301 kcm@capdale.com
Space Todd E. Phillips +1 202 862 7850 +1 202 429 3301 tphillips@capdale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KASTING KAUFFMAN & MERSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Kauffman +1 406 586 4383 +1 406 587 7871 jkauffman@kkmlaw.net
No Logo Penguin Group (usa) Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Michael Herman +1 212 415 9200 +1 212 953 7201 herman.jonathan@dorsey.com
Space Frederick M. Ralph +1 612 492 6964 +1 612 340 2868 ralph.matthew@dorsey.com
Office Missoula
Filed 5/5/2011
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County MISSOULA
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (173) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012
RESPONSE to Motion re [166] MOTION To Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Rule 201 M.R.Civ.P. filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012
    RESPONSE to Motion re [166] MOTION To Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Rule 201 M.R.Civ.P. filed by Central Asia Institute. (Matovich, Carey)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012
      RESPONSE to Motion re [166] MOTION To Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Rule 201 M.R.Civ.P. filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012
        Brief/Memorandum in Support re [166] MOTION To Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Rule 201 M.R.Civ.P. filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Blewett, Alexander)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012
          MOTION To Take Judicial Notice Pursuant to Rule 201 M.R.Civ.P. Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau (Blewett, Alexander)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012
            NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Central Asia Institute re [160] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Re: Robert L. Eisenbach III (Matovich, Carey)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012
              NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Central Asia Institute re [159] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Re: Stephen C. Neal (Matovich, Carey)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012
                REPLY to Response to Motion re [147] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Central Asia Institute. (Matovich, Carey)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012
                  NOTICE by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau re [145] Amended Document, Supplemental Authority Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Mortenson's Motion to Dismiss (Blewett, Alexander)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012
                    Letter from Clerk of Court to Counsel Robert Eisenbach III and Counsel Stephen Neal. (ASG, ) Modified on 2/27/2012 to reflect that this document was emailed to counsel on this date. (ASG, ).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [158] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Eisenbach III. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/27/2012. (ASG, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [157] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen Neal. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/27/2012. (ASG, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012, Terminated: 2/27/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                          Unopposed MOTION Robert Eisenbach III to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1017898.) Carey E. Matovich appearing for Defendant Central Asia Institute (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Matovich, Carey)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012, Terminated: 2/27/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                            Unopposed MOTION Stephen C. Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1017877.) Carey E. Matovich appearing for Defendant Central Asia Institute (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Matovich, Carey)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 
                              Remark. Per Order [152], PHV fees have been refunded to Matovich Keller & Murphy Law Firm in the amount of $750.00. (ASG, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 156 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [138] Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Oliver Relin. (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 155 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [134] MOTION to Dismiss 4th Amended Complaint filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 154 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: 2/20/2012
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [136] Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 153 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [147] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint of Capstar filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: 2/13/2012 Court Filing
                                        ORDER denying [149] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; denying [150] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying [151] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/13/2012. (ASG, )
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012, Terminated: 2/13/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                          Unopposed MOTION Kathleen H. Goodhart to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1012523.) Carey E. Matovich appearing for Defendant Central Asia Institute (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit Goodhart, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Matovich, Carey)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012, Terminated: 2/13/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                            Unopposed MOTION Robert L. Eisenbach III to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1012518.) Carey E. Matovich appearing for Defendant Central Asia Institute (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit Eisenbach, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Matovich, Carey)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012, Terminated: 2/13/2012 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                              Unopposed MOTION Stephen C. Neal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1012505.) Carey E. Matovich appearing for Defendant Central Asia Institute (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit Neal, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Matovich, Carey)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 148 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012
                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support re [147] MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Central Asia Institute. (Matovich, Carey)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 147 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: 2/10/2012
                                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint Carey E. Matovich appearing for Defendant Central Asia Institute (Matovich, Carey)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012
                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. Amendment to [143] Response to Motion, to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint - RELIN. (Attachments: # (1) Errata A - Complaint for Class Action, # (2) Exhibit B - Order, # (3) Exhibit C - Three Cups of Tea, pp. 3-5) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012
                                                      AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. Amendment to [142] Response to Motion, Dismiss 4th Amended Complaint - Mortenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Complaint for Class Action, # (2) Exhibit B - Order) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: 2/7/2012
                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. Amendment to [141] Response to Motion, to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint - Penguin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Class Action Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B - Order, # (3) Exhibit C - Stones Into Schools, p. 387, # (4) Exhibit D - Three Cups of Tea, p. 337-338, # (5) Exhibit E - Stones Into Schools, p. 407-408) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012
                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [138] Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 4th Amended Complaint - Relin filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Paglinawan Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B - Judgment and Order, # (3) Exhibit C - Three Cups of Tea pp. 3-5) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [136] Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 4th Amended Complaint - Mortenson filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Paglinawan Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B - Judgment and Order) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012
                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [134] MOTION to Dismiss 4th Amended Complaint - Penguin filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Paglinawan Complaint, # (2) Exhibit B - Judgment and Order, # (3) Exhibit C - Stones Into Schools p. 387, # (4) Exhibit D - 3 Cups of Tea pp. 337-338, # (5) Exhibit E - Stones Into Schools p. 407-408) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 
                                                                Notice of Correction: re [142] Response to Motion, [141] Response to Motion, [143] Response to Motion. These documents do not comply with L.R. 7.1(d)(2)(C). Please correct and refile the documents using the event Amended Document and link back to the originally filed response. Feel free to call the Clerk's Office with any questions. Thank you. (ASG, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [120] Second MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012
                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re [138] Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David Oliver Relin. (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012
                                                                      Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Sonia A. Montalbano appearing for Defendant David Oliver Relin (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012
                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re [136] Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Introduction to 3CT) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012
                                                                          Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendants MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson (Kauffman, John)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012
                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re [134] MOTION to Dismiss 4th Amended Complaint filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS [119] Amended Complaint, by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick) Modified on 1/26/2012 to correct event chosen by counsel per phone call -NEF regenerated (BAW, ).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: 1/23/2012
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susie Pfau. Central Asia Institute served on 1/20/2012, answer due 2/10/2012. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [123] Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012
                                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. Amendment to [121] Brief/Memorandum in Support . (Ralph, Frederick) Modified on 1/23/2012 to reflect that Counsel contacted the Clerk's Office regarding refiling this document to comply with the new local rules by including a table of contents and table of authorities and the Clerk advised to file an Amended Document. (ASG, ).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [126] Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery of Relin filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [123] Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery of Mortenson and MC filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012
                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [120] Second MOTION to Stay Discovery of Penguin filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012
                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re [126] Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery filed by David Oliver Relin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012
                                                                                              Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery Sonia A. Montalbano appearing for Defendant David Oliver Relin (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Summons Issued
                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Central Asia Institute. Original summons mailed to Hoyt & Blewett. (ASG, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012
                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re [123] Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit !st set of document requests, # (2) Exhibit 1st set of interrogatories, # (3) Exhibit 1st set of requests for admission, # (4) Exhibit 2nd set of document requests) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012
                                                                                                    Second MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendants MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012
                                                                                                      DECLARATION in Support re [120] Second MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Pltfs 1st Reqs for Prodn to Penguin, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Pltfs 1st Interrogs to Penguin, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Pltfs 1st Reqs for Admissn to Penguin, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Ltr from J Kauffman to Z Blewett dtd 8-8-11, # (5) Exhibit 5 - Email from Z Blewett to Def Counsel dtd 1-12-12, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Pltfs 2nd Reqs for Prodn with cover email dtd 1-12-12, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Order in Simonsen v Allstate dtd 7-23-03) (Ralph, Frederick) Modified on 1/17/2012 to rename entry from "affidavit" to "declaration" (ASG, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2012: # (8) Declaration with conventional signature) (ASG, ).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012
                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re [120] Second MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012
                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Stay Discovery Frederick M. Ralph appearing for Defendant Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012
                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH against All Defendants, filed by Deborah Netter, Dan Donovan, George Pfau, Susie Pfau. (Blewett, Alexander) Filer inadvertently failed to attach Summons. Summons attached by Court on 1/12/2012: # (1) Summons) (CDH, ).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot [40] Motion to Certify Class; denying [42] Motion for preservation of documents; denying as moot [47] Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot [49] Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot [51] Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot [53] Motion for Protective Order; denying as moot [56] Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot [75] Motion for Joinder; granting [112] Motion to Amend/Correct and motion to drop and add parties; denying as moot [116] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/12/2012. (BAW, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [112] MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint (4th) & Motion to Drop/Add Parties filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [112] MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third Anders Blewett, IV appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension) (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [112] MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third filed by David Oliver Relin. (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [112] MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/10/2011, Entered: 12/10/2011
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [112] MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Transcript, # (2) Exhibit Illinois Complaint) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4th Amended Complaint) (Blewett, Alexander) Modified on 11/30/2011 to create relationship to Brief [111] (CDH, ).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011
                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re [112] MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander) Modified on 11/30/2011 to reflect correct linkage to Motion (CDH, ).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011, Terminated: 11/30/2011 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct [38] Amended Complaint Third Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4th Amended Complaint) (Blewett, Alexander) Modified on 11/30/2011 to reflect that this motion is terminated as the attached pdf was inadvertently filed. Counsel to refile Motion attaching the correct document(s)(CDH, ).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: 10/6/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sam E. Haddon for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Richard F. Cebull on 10/6/2011. (EMA)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011
                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penguin Group (USA), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pearson Longman, Inc. for Penguin Group (USA), Inc... (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Donald W. Molloy recused. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/27/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011
                                                                                                                                      Brief/Response to Order Recusal Issue filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011
                                                                                                                                        Brief/Response to Order permitting brief on recusal issues filed by David Oliver Relin. (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011
                                                                                                                                          Brief/Response to Order re [99] Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Oral Argument Hearing,,,,,, filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: 9/26/2011
                                                                                                                                            Brief/Response to Order permitting briefing on recusal issues filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Oral Arguement re; Motions to Dismiss re [99] Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Oral Argument Hearing, [101] Transcript Designation Order Form, [100] Transcript Designation Order Form held on 9/16/11, before Judge Molloy. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER, the Clerks Office or the court reporter NOTICE: A NOTICE OF INTENT TO REQUEST REDACTION MUST BE FILED WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THIS FILING. Contact Court Reporter Julie Lake, 406-543-6477. Transcript Redaction Procedures . Redaction Request due 10/11/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2011. (CDH, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Transcript Designation Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Greg Mortenson for proceedings held on 9/16/11 before Judge Molloy. Court reporter Julie Lake. Transcript due by 11/3/2011. (TDO delivered directly to CR by counsel) (CDH, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011 Transcript Designation Order FormCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION ORDER FORM by Penguin Group (USA), Inc. for proceedings held on 9/16/11 before Judge Molloy. Court reporter Julie Lake. Transcript due by 11/3/2011. (TDO delivered directly to CR by counsel) (CDH, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donald W. Molloy: Oral Argument Hearing regarding potential legal disqualification of Judge Molloy held on 9/16/2011, parties present: Zander Blewett, Anders Blewett and Larry Drury for plaintiff; Jonathan Herman and Frederick Ralph for defendant Penguin Group, John Kauffman for Defendant Mortenson, and Sonia Montalbano, Chuck Hansberry and Elena Zlatnik for defendant Relin; Court discusses 3rd amended complaint, statute-28 USC 455(b), and Advisory Opinion No. 90 of the Committee on Codes of Conduct; Argument by Zander Blewett, John Kauffman, Sonia Montalbano and Larry Drury; Court wants briefs from parties within 10 days with a maximum length of 15 pages addressing issues raised in open court; Zander Blewett makes oral motion for order to amend the complaint to conform with the motion to certify-no ruling at this time. (Court Reporter Julie Lake.) (BAW, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by the Court. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [51] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, [47] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, as well as arguments regarding potential legal disqualification of Judge Molloy: Contract Court Reporter is Needed. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2011 at 1:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/15/2011. (DLE, )
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [80] Response to Motion filed by Deborah Netter, Dan Donovan, Michele Reinhart is deemed by this Court to be timely filed. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/15/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Kauffman on behalf of MC Consulting, Inc. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [47] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by David Oliver Relin. (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [51] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [75] MOTION for Joinder in Motion for Protective Order re Discovery filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander) Modified on 9/13/2011 to change docket text from Reply to Response.(ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [53] MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [49] MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                          PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY PLAN by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Anders).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY PLAN by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson, Penguin Group (USA), Inc., David Oliver Relin. (Kauffman, John) Modified on 9/12/2011 to add Defendants' (ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                              PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by David Oliver Relin. (Montalbano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                  PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [40] MOTION to Certify Class filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                      PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: 9/1/2011, Terminated: 9/15/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION Unoposed Motion to Deem Brief Timely Filed re [80] Response to Motion of Penguin to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Anders Blewett, IV appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [51] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Defendant Penguin filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint of Defendant Relin filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [47] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Defendants Mortenson & MC Consulting filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [49] MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery, [53] MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Brief/Memorandum in Support re [75] MOTION for Joinder filed by David Oliver Relin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A--Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant David Oliver Relin, # (2) Exhibit B--Plaintiff's First Interrogatories to Defendant David Oliver Relin) (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Joinder Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Defendant David Oliver Relin (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re [73] Response to Motion by David Oliver Relin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1--Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant David Oliver Relin, # (2) Exhibit Christian Science Article, # (3) Exhibit Parade Article, # (4) Exhibit Rock and Ice Article, # (5) Exhibit Billings Gazette Article) (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [40] MOTION to Certify Class David Oliver Relin filed by David Oliver Relin. (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [40] MOTION to Certify Class filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [68] Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/26/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [40] MOTION to Certify Class filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [42] MOTION Preservation of Documents filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011, Terminated: 8/26/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition Briefs to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Anders Blewett, IV appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 8/22/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [66] Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/22/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011, Terminated: 8/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motions for Protective Order Staying Discovery Anders Blewett, IV appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Exhibit "A") (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [42] MOTION Preservation of Documents filed by David Oliver Relin. (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [42] MOTION Preservation of Documents filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA [49] MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery, [47] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, [62] Response to Motion, [48] Brief/Memorandum in Support, [50] Brief/Memorandum in Support,. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: 8/12/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [42] MOTION Preservation of Documents filed by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson. (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by David Oliver Relin re [45] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sonia A. Montalbano (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by David Oliver Relin re [45] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sonia A. Montalbano (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE/DATE: re [60] Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order. The signature on this document does not comply with Local Rules or the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual, or the document is not dated. This notice is for your information for future filings. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. A PDF DOCUMENT IS NOT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. (BAW, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [58] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [40] MOTION to Certify Class. Responses due by 8/26/2011. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/9/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011, Terminated: 8/9/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [40] MOTION to Certify Class John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendant Greg Mortenson (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief/Memorandum in Support re [56] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by David Oliver Relin. (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Defendant David Oliver Relin (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re [53] MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiffs' 1st RFPs to Penguin, # (2) Exhibit Plaintiffs' 1st Interrogatories to Penguin, # (3) Exhibit Plaintiffs' 1st RFAs to Penguin) (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief/Memorandum in Support re [53] MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order Staying Discovery Frederick M. Ralph appearing for Defendant Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief/Memorandum in Support re [51] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Penguin Group (USA), Inc.. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Frederick M. Ralph appearing for Defendant Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief/Memorandum in Support re [49] MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery, [47] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, [48] Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Greg Mortenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Discovery Requests) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order to Stay Discovery John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendant Greg Mortenson (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief/Memorandum in Support re [47] MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Greg Mortenson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Introduction to Book) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendant Greg Mortenson (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: 8/5/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Clerk of Court to PHV counsel Montalbano. (letter, SO 7 and order granting PHV admission to counsel Montalbano) (BAW, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: 8/4/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [39] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sonia A. Montalbano for Defendant Relin. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/4/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart re [43] Brief/Memorandum in Support, [41] Brief/Memorandum in Support Certificate of Compliance (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brief/Memorandum in Support re [42] MOTION Preservation of Documents filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Order) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION Preservation of Documents Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief/Memorandum in Support re [40] MOTION to Certify Class filed by Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011, Terminated: 1/12/2012 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Certify Class Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Deborah Netter, Michele Reinhart (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011, Terminated: 8/4/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Sonia A. Montalbano to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-920850.) Charles E. Hansberry appearing for Defendant David Oliver Relin (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Sonia A. Montalbano in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application, # (2) Exhibit Certification Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion (Sonia Montalbano), # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vica Sonia Montalbano) (Hansberry, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson, Penguin Group (USA), Inc., David Oliver Relin, filed by Dan Donovan, Michele Reinhart. (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [34] Motion for Leave to File third amended complaint. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/27/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Donovan, Michele Reinhart. David Oliver Relin served on 7/7/2011, answer due 7/28/2011. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Herman, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011, Terminated: 7/27/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Class Action with Demand For Jury Trial Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Clerk of Court to PHV Counsel Drury, Langendorf, and Herman. Sent via email with ECF Registration form. (Attachments: # (1) RFC 7 Standing Order) (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [29] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Larry D. Drury; and granting [30] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Langendorf for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/14/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [27] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan M. Herman for Defendant Penguin Group (USA), Inc. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/14/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011, Terminated: 7/14/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Robert A. Langendorf to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-912096.) Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Good Standing of Robert A. Langendorf) (Blewett, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2011: # (2) Notarized Affidavit of Robert Langendorf) (ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011, Terminated: 7/14/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Larry D. Drury to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-912087.) Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Good Standing of Larry Drury) (Blewett, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2011: # (2) Notarized Affidavit of Larry Drury) (ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson (Phillips, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011, Terminated: 7/14/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Jonathan M. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number MTX9-4432.) Frederick M. Ralph appearing for Defendant Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit J. Herman, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by MC Consulting, Inc., Greg Mortenson re [21] Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Maclay, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick M. Ralph on behalf of Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Ralph, Frederick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER from United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re [23] Deeming Motion Moot. (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion to Transfer filed at U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Penguin Group (USA), Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Motion of Defendant Penguin Group for Transfer of Actions to S.D.N.Y., # (2) Brief in Support, # (3) Schedule of Actions, # (4) Defendant Penguin Group's Reasons Why Oral Argument Should be Heard, # (5) Exhibit 1, # (6) Exhibit 2) (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Clerk of Court to Counsel Phillips and Counsel Maclay regarding ECF Registration. Sent to Counsel via email. (Attachments: # (1) RFC 7 Standing Order) (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: 6/29/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [19] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin C. Maclay for Defendant Mortenson; and granting [20] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Todd E. Phillips for Defendant Mortenson. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/29/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011, Terminated: 6/29/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Todd E. Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-903112.) John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendant Greg Mortenson (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit) (Kauffman, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2011: # (2) Notarized Affidavit of Todd Phillips) (ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011, Terminated: 6/29/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Kevin C. Maclay to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-903102.) John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendant Greg Mortenson (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit) (Kauffman, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2011: # (2) Notarized Affidavit of Kevin C. Maclay) (ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to MC Consulting, Inc. and David Oliver Relin. (Attachments: # (1) Summons - MC Consulting, Inc.) Originals mailed to counsel on this date. (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against All Defendants, filed by Michele Reinhart, Jean Price, Dan Donovan. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Summons - Relin, # (2) Exhibit Summons - MC Consulting) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [15] Motion for Leave to File second amended complaint. It is further Ordered that Defendants may have until August 1, 2011, to respond to the second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/17/2011. (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011, Terminated: 6/17/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Alexander Blewett, III appearing for Plaintiffs Dan Donovan, Jean Price, Michele Reinhart (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit Summons-MC Consulting, # (3) Exhibit Summons - Relin, # (4) Text of Proposed Order) (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dan Donovan, Jean Price, Michele Reinhart of Withdrawal (Heenan, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: 6/13/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Reinhart, Jean Price, Dan Donovan. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER:Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/9/2011. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/9/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 1:30 PM in the Russell Smith Courthouse, Missoula, MT before Judge Donald W. Molloy. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 6/3/2011. (dle) Modified on 8/30/2011 to reflect CONTRACT COURT REPORTER JULIE LAKE reporting (CDH, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Central Asia Corporation by Michele Reinhart, Jean Price, Dan Donovan. (Blewett, Alexander) Modified on 5/25/2011 to reflect which party was served.(ASG, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Heenan on behalf of Dan Donovan, Jean Price, Michele Reinhart (Heenan, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Kauffman on behalf of Greg Mortenson (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re [3] Amended Complaint. Greg Mortenson answer due 6/24/2011. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 5/17/2011. (dle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michele Reinhart, Jean Price, Dan Donovan. Greg Mortenson served on 5/13/2011, answer due 6/3/2011. (Blewett, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011, Terminated: 5/17/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [3] Amended Complaint John M. Kauffman appearing for Defendant Greg Mortenson (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order) (Kauffman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to Hoyt and Blewett, PLLC. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Summons - Central Asia Institute, # (2) Summons - Penguin Group) (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Dan Donovan, Jean Price, Michele Reinhart re [3] Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit First Amended Summons-Def Mortenson, # (2) Exhibit First Amended Summons-Def CAI, # (3) Exhibit Summons-Def Penguin) (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, filed by Michele Reinhart, Jean Price, Dan Donovan. (Blewett, Anders)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Original summonses mailed to Hoyt and Blewett. (Attachments: # (1) Summons - Central Asia Institute) (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FOR CLASS ACTION WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Michele Reinhart, Jean Price. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons - Greg Mortenson, # (3) Summons - Central Asia Institute) (ASG, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 313 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?