COMMON CAUSE et al v. BIDEN et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00775-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 1:46 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo CAESAR VARGAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com
Space Kamal Ghali +1 404 881 4143 ghali@bmelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo CELSO MIRELES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com
Space Kamal Ghali +1 404 881 4143 ghali@bmelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo Common Cause, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo ERIKA ANDIOLA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo Henry Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com
Space Kamal Ghali +1 404 881 4143 ghali@bmelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo JOHN LEWIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo KEITH ELLISON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
No Logo MICHAEL MICHAUD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bondurant Mixson & Elmore LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emmet J. Bondurant +1 404 881 4100 bondurant@bmelaw.com
Space Kamal Ghali +1 404 881 4143 ghali@bmelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Common Cause

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Spaulding +1 202 736 5781 sspaulding@commoncause.org
v.
No Logo ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "JOSEPH R. BIDEN"
No Logo NANCY ERICKSON, Defendant
No Logo TERRANCE W. GAINER, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/14/2012
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 12/10/12; Page Numbers: 1-83. Date of Issuance:01/31/13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202-354-3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/1/2013.(Kerr, Catalina) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Transcript Request by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Attachments: # 1 Transcript Order)(Spaulding, Stephen) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 27 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None
      Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 26 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/22/2012)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 25 Memorandum & Opinion, 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0090-3170987. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 25 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 21, 2012. (lcegs6) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 21, 2012. (lcegs6) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
              REPLY re 20 Memorandum re Order filed by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                ERRATA to Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS 21 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Defendants' Memorandum of December 11, 2012 (Dkt. 20) filed by CAESAR VARGAS, CELSO MIRELES, COMMON CAUSE, JOHN LEWIS, HENRY JOHNSON, ERIKA ANDIOLA, MICHAEL MICHAUD, KEITH ELLISON. (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Leave to File A Reply to Defendants' Memorandum of December 11, 2012 (Dkt. 20) by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM re Order,, by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, NANCY ERICKSON, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH. (Frankel, Morgan) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Ghali, Kamal) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                        SUPPLEMENT to re 1 Complaint, filed by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                          Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Correction of Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Emmet) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None
                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, NANCY ERICKSON, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH. (Frankel, Morgan) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Memorandum in Opposition
                              Memorandum in opposition to re [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Bondurant, Emmet)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012, Terminated: 8/20/2012 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Spaulding, Stephen)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: 7/27/2012, Terminated: 7/30/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by ERIKA ANDIOLA, JOSEPH R. BIDEN, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, NANCY ERICKSON, TERRANCE W. GAINER, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Spaulding, Stephen)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                  MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, NANCY ERICKSON, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Frankel, Morgan)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2012, Entered: 7/16/2012, Terminated: 7/18/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, NANCY ERICKSON, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Caballero, Thomas)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/17/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/16/2012. (Ghali, Kamal)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOSEPH R. BIDEN served on 5/21/2012; NANCY ERICKSON served on 5/21/2012; TERRANCE W. GAINER served on 5/21/2012; ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH served on 5/21/2012, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/21/2012. (Ghali, Kamal)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Raymond Vinik on behalf of All Defendants (Vinik, Grant)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia M. Bryan on behalf of All Defendants (Bryan, Patricia)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Caballero on behalf of All Defendants (Caballero, Thomas)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan John Frankel on behalf of All Defendants (Frankel, Morgan)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [4] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kamal Ghali is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 16, 2012. (lcegs6)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [3] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Emmet J. Bondurant is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 16, 2012. (lcegs6)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012, Terminated: 5/16/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kamal Ghali, :Firm- BONDURANT MIXSON & ELMORE LLP, :Address- 1201 West Peachtree Street, NW, Atlanta, GA 30309. Phone No. - (404) 881-4100. by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012, Terminated: 5/16/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emmet J. Bondurant, :Firm- BONDURANT MIXSON & ELMORE LLP, :Address- 1201 West Peachtree Street, NW, Atlanta, GA 30309. Phone No. - (404) 881-4100. by ERIKA ANDIOLA, COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS, MICHAEL MICHAUD, CELSO MIRELES, CAESAR VARGAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(jf, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests NONE by COMMON CAUSE (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT against JOSEPH R. BIDEN, NANCY ERICKSON, TERRANCE W. GAINER, ELIZABETH MACDONOUGH ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616048148) filed by COMMON CAUSE, KEITH ELLISON, MICHAEL MICHAUD, ERIKA ANDIOLA, CAESAR VARGAS, CELSO MIRELES, HENRY JOHNSON, JOHN LEWIS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                      SUMMONS (2) Issued as to, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [14] plaintiffs' unopposed motion for leave to file excess pages. Plaintiffs' memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss shall not exceed 70 pages. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 20, 2012. (lcegs6)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 766 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?