Youngstown Sheet & Tube Co. v. Sawyer. Sawyer v. Youngstown Sheet & Tube Co.
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 12-123

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marvin D. Horne, et al., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. McConnell +1 202 879 5000 michael.mcconnell@kirkland.com
No Logo Department Of Agriculture, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Russell Palmore +1 202 307 3933
Space Donald B. Verrilli +1 202 514 2217 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
No Logo Cato Institute, et al., Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steffen Nathanael Johnson +1 202 282 5879 sjohnson@winston.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Elwood +1 202 639 6518 +1 202 879 8917 jelwood@velaw.com
No Logo Constitutional Law Scholars, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter Coleman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C Barker +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 cbarker@yettercoleman.com
Space Scott A Keller +1 512 533 0150 skeller@yettercoleman.com
No Logo International Municipal Lawyers Association, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ENVIRONMENTAL AND NATURAL RESOURCES LAW CLINIC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Echeverria +1 802 831 1386 JEcheverria@vermontlaw.edu
No Logo Sun-Maid Growers of California, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Miller Baker +1 202 756 8233 +1 202 756 8087 mbaker@mwe.com
No Logo Texas, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew S. Oldham +1 512 936 1700 +1 512 474 2697 andy.oldham@texasattorneygeneral.gov
Related Case 11A1125
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 10-15270
Lower Court Decision Date 3/12/2012
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
    Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
      Argued. For petitioners: Michael W. McConnell, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Joseph R. Palmore, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
        Reply of petitioners Marvin D. Horne, et al. filed. (Distributed)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
          Brief amicus curiae of Sun-Maid Growers of California filed. (Distributed)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
            Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed. (Distributed)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
              Brief of respondent Department of Agriculture filed. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                Administrative record from U.S. Dept. of Justice is electronic.
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                  CIRCULATED.
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                    Record from U.S.D.C. for Eastern Districtof California (Fresno) is electronic.
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                      Record from U.S.C.A. for 9th Circuit is electronic.
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                        Brief amicus curiae of Texas filed.
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                          Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed.
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                              Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                  Brief of petitioners Marvin D. Horne, et al. filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                    SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, March 20, 2013
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                      The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 12, 2013.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                        The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including January 9, 2013.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          Petition GRANTED.
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                            Reply of petitioners Marvin D. Horne, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                              DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 20, 2012.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                Brief of respondent Department of Agriculture in opposition filed.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 26, 2012.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                    Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                      Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 26, 2012.
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                        Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 27, 2012)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Application (11A1125) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 25, 2012.
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                            Application (11A1125) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 10, 2012 to August 9, 2012, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                              Administrative record from U.S. Dept. of Justice is electronic.
                                                                LREF

                                                                Space Space

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 429 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?