Dalehite v. United States
Administrative Proceeding Supreme Court of the United States, Case No. 07-308

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner
Officially listed as "United States"

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM M. JAY +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 wjay@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul D. Clement +1 202 514 2217
No Logo Clintwood Elkhorn Mining Company, et al., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C. Goldstein +1 202 887 4060 tgoldstein@akingump.com
Space Patricia A Millett +1 202 887 4000 +1 202 887 4288 pmillett@akingump.com
No Logo Alliance Coal, LLC, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Clifton Scott Elgarten +1 202 624 2523 +1 202 628 5116 celgarten@crowell.com
No Logo National Federation of Independent Business Legal Foundation, Other Party

Toggle Switch Represented by The Wolf Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony T. Caso +1 714 628 2666 caso@chapman.edu
Related Case 07A49
Lower Court United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Lower Court Case No(s). 04-5155, 04-5156
Lower Court Decision Date 1/22/2007
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
Record returned to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims.
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
    Record returned to the U.S.C.A. for the Federal Circuit.
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
      Acknowledgement of receipt (05/23/08) of judgment from Clerk, United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit received.
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
        JUDGMENT ISSUED.
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None
          Judgment REVERSED. Roberts, C. J., delivered the opinion for a unanimous Court.
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
            Record received from the U.S. Court of Federal Claims. (1 box)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
              Letter dated March 25, 2008, received from counsel for petitioner. (Distributed)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
                Argued. For petitioner: William M. Jay, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice Washington, D.C. For respondents: Patricia A. Millett, Washington, D.C.
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                  Letter and attachment, dated March 17, 2008, received from counsel for respondents. (Distributed).
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                    Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                      Brief amicus curiae of National Federation of Independent Business Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                        Brief of respondents Clintwood Elkhorn Mining Company, et al. filed. (Distributed)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
                          Record received from the U.S.C.A. for the Federal Circuit. (1 envelope)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None
                            Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Coal LLC filed. (Distributed)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: None
                              CIRCULATED.
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 24, 2008
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: None
                                  Brief of petitioner United States filed.
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None
                                    Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None
                                      Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States.
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                        Petition GRANTED.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                          Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                            DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 30, 2007.
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                              Brief of respondents Clintwood Elkhorn Mining Company, et al. in opposition filed.
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 8, 2007.
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 9, 2007)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Application (07A49) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 9, 2007.
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Application (07A49) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 26, 2007 to September 24, 2007, submitted to The Chief Justice.
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 624 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?