USA v. Deal
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:02-cr-01028-NVW

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 7:16 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather Hauser-Belt Nelson +1 602 514 7521 +1 602 514 7650 heather.nelson@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Bryan Leland Deal, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark John Berardoni +1 602 257 1295 +1 602 253 2151 berardonilaw@yahoo.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 10/8/2002
County Maricopa
Terminated
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-03137
Citation
Offense Level
18871(a) Threatening the Life of the President [ 202-m -3137 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871(a) - Threats Against the President
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (170) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 193 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Status Hearing re: Mental Competency as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 9/10/2008. Status Hearing re Mental Competency reset for 9/30/2008 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (DNH)
    LREF
    Legal Document 192 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [191] Motion to Continue as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Status Conference re: Mental Competency reset to Wednesday, September 10, 2008 at 1:30 p.m. beforeMagistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 9/3/08.(DMT, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 191 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Continue
      MOTION to Continue Status Conference by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Heather)
        LREF
        Legal Document 190 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY Substitution: Heather Hauser-Belt Nelson appearing for USA. Attorney Daniel R Drake terminated. (Nelson, Heather)
          LREF
          Legal Document 188 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [187] Motion to Continue Status Conference to 09/09/08 at 11:00 a.m. as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 07/17/08.(DNH )
            LREF
            Legal Document 187 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008, Terminated: 7/17/2008 Motion to Continue
            MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Bryan Leland Deal. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Berardoni, Mark)
              LREF
              Blank 186 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Set HearingsCourt Filing
              Minute Entry. After receiving notification that a status report will not be available for the Status hearing presently set for July 22, 2008; IT IS HEREBY resetting the status Conference from July 22, 2008 at 9:30 am to August 14, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (emc)
                LREF
                Legal Document 183 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 182 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bryan Leland Deal re: Competency Hearing held on 4/18/08 before Judge Michelle H Burns. Court Reporter: Taped Proceeding Transcribed by Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2008. (BAS, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 181 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 180 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Bryan Leland Deal re: Competency Hearing held on 4/9/08 before Judge Michelle H Burns. Taped Proceeding Transcribed by Linda Schroeder. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/24/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2008. (BAS, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 178 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal for proceedings held on 4/9/2008, 4/18/2008 before Judge Michelle H. Burns. (Drake, Daniel)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 177 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Receipt
                          Certified Mail Receipt Order returned executed. Warden Beeler received copy of [175] Order on 04/23/08.(ESL, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER that the dft is committed to the custody of the Attorney General of the United States for such a reasonable period of time, not to exceed four months. The Attorney General or his representatives shall submit a written status report to this Court within 60 days after receiving dft. Directing the Clerk of the Court to mail a certified copy of this Order to Complex Warden A.F. Beeler, Federal Medical Center. A Satus Conference re mental comptetency exam is set for 7/22/2008 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 04/21/08. (NOTE: See attached pdf for full details) (Hand delivered to USMS on 04/21/08) (ESL) Modified on 4/21/2008 (ESL, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 176 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order
                              MINUTE ORDER: re Exhibits, exhibits marked and/or admitted for competency hearing are to be returned to counsel; counsel is directed to retain custody of the exhibits until the case is completely terminated, including all appeals as to Bryan Leland Deal. (ESL)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 174 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Exhibit
                                EXHIBIT LIST re Competency Hearing by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal (ESL)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 173 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Witness List
                                  WITNESS LIST re Competency Hearing, by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal (ESL, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 172 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Competency HearingCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Competency Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 4/18/2008. Discussion held. Ordered that counsel submit a proposed Order to the court by close of business today re: competency evaluation of the defendant at FMC-Butner. Written Order to follow will include a date/time for a future Status Hearing to be set on this matter. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Memorandum
                                      MEMORANDUM by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal re Action Following Competency Hearing (Drake, Daniel)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Competency HearingCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Competency Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 4/9/2008. Competency Hearing continued to 4/18/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. See attached pdf document for further information. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (KAL)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 169 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                          Minute Order. Upon defense counsel's request as to Bryan Leland Deal it is ordered resetting the Competency Hearing set for 4/9/2008 from 9:00 AM to 09:30 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (emc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 168 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [167] Motion to Reset/Expedite Competency Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Resetting the Competency Hearing in this matter to 4/9/2008 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 04/01/08. (ESL)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 167 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion to Expedite
                                              MOTION to Expedite Competency Hearing by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, Daniel)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [165] Motion to Continue Comptency Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Resetting the competency hearing from 03/20/08 to 04/09/08 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 03/20/08.(ESL)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008, Terminated: 3/20/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                  MOTION to Continue Competency Hearing by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, Daniel)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [163] Motion for Inoluntary Medical Treatment for Dft's Leg Injury Only as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). The CCA/CADC CADC medical staff immediately provide medical treatment to dft's leg injury on an involuntary basis through the complete healing of the injury. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 02/07/08.(DNH)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008, Terminated: 2/8/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION for Involuntary Medical Treatment for Defendant's Leg Injury Only by Bryan Leland Deal. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Berardoni, Mark)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Status Hearing re Competency as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 1/31/2008. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the cusody of the United States Marshal. Competency Hearing set for 3/20/2008 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Other Notice
                                                          NOTICE of Filing Independent Psychiatric Evaluation and Competency Statement by Bryan Leland Deal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Berardoni, Mark)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 156 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Bryan Leland Deal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 12/12/07.(ESL, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 155 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Status Hearing re: Mental Competency reset for 12/20/2007 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Preliminary Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 12/12/2007. Detention Hearing submitted. Dft continued detained as a flight risk. Admit/Deny Hearing set for 12/20/2007 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 154 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns: Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Revocation Hearings as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 11/27/2007. Detention and Prelminary Revocation Hearing set for 12/12/2007 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Status Hearing re: Mental Competency reset for 12/12/2007 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 153 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Memorandum
                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Bryan Leland Deal Re: Status of Bryan Deal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Berardoni, Mark)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 152 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns: Status Hearing re: Mental Competency/Detention/Preliminary Revocation hearings as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 11/14/2007. Discussion held. ORDERED that defense counsel provide additional information to the court regarding the issue of mental competency of the defendant. Status Hearing is reset for 11/27/2007 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Dft ordered temporarily detained the custody of the US Marshal (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 151 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns: Status Hearing re: Counsel as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 10/24/2007. Attorney Mark John Berardoni (CJA) appointed for Bryan Leland Deal. Court ORDERS dft be evaluated for mental competency. Defense counsel to submit a proposed order with the name of a physician to conduct the evaluation or submit recent mental competency reports for the Court to determine whether a competency evaluation is needed. Status Hearing Re: Detention/Preliminary Revocation Hearings is VACATED. Status Hearing re: Mental Competency/Detention and Preliminary Revocation Hearings set for 11/14/2007 10:00 AM at before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. The court orders the Petition unsealed. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence O Anderson: Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 10/19/2007. Attorney Mark J. Berardoni (CJA) conditionally appointed on behalf of defendant. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USMS. Status Hearing re: Detention, Preliminary, and Counsel Hearings set for 10/24/2007 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 150 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                          Supervised Release Violation Petition Warrant Returned Executed on 10/17/07 as to Bryan Leland Deal. (MAP)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Arrest
                                                                            Arrest of Bryan Leland Deal (ESL)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                              PETITION TO REVOKE SUPERVISED RELEASE as to Bryan Leland Deal (MAP) Modified on 10/29/2007 UNSEALED (REW, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 144 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Order/Judgment Revoking ProbationCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER REVOKING PROBATION committed to BOP for a term of TIME SERVED plus 11 DAYS, FURTHER ORDERED that Dft be transported to the custody of theMaricopa County Sheriff's Office, preferably on 04/02/07, but no later than 04/03/07. FURTHER ORDERED that on 04/11/07 dft to be released to the custody of Value Options or a Level One psychiatric treatment facility FURTHER ORDERED dft to be placed on 1 YEAR supervised release upon release from custody, dismissing the remaining allegations of the Petition to Revoke. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 03/30/07.(ESL)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 145 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Witness List
                                                                                  WITNESS LIST by Bryan Leland Deal (ESL)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 143 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Revocation of Probation HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Probation Revocation Hearing (Disposition) as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 3/30/2007. Order to follow.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 142 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Other Notice
                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing: Advisement by Bryan Leland Deal (Berardoni, Mark)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 141 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Revocation of Probation HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Probation Revocation Hearing (Disposition) as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 2/8/2007. To allow more time to investigate treatment and disposition options, Final Disposition Hearing continued to 3/30/2007 at 01:30 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 140 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Memorandum
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal re Bureau of Prisons Programs for the Mentally Ill Offender (Drake, Daniel)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 139 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake : Disposition Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 12/19/2006. Final Disposition Hearing reset for 2/8/2007 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SBU)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Order on Motion to Continue Dispositional Hearing
                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting [137] Motion to Continue Dispositional Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Disposition Hearing is continued from 12/4/06 to 12/19/06 at 2:00 p.m. (SJF)(PLEASE NOTE: THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY, NO PDF DOCUMENT IS ATTACHED.)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 137 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006, Terminated: 11/15/2006 Motion to Continue Dispositional Hearing
                                                                                                First MOTION to Continue Dispositional Hearing by United States of America as to Bryan Leland Deal. (Attachments: # (1))(Drake, Daniel)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 136 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Revocation of Probation HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Probation Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 10/30/2006. Court finds defendant has violated special condition number 10. Final Disposition Hearing set for 12/4/2006 at 03:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Order as to Bryan Leland Deal: Evidentiary Hearing re-set IN TIME ONLY from 3:00 PM to 10:30 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 134 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Revocation of Probation HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake :Probation Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 9/18/2006 Evidentiary Hearing continued for 10/30/2006 03:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SBU)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 133 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Revocation of Probation HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Probation Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 8/23/2006. Defendant denies allegations. Probation Revocation Hearing set for 9/18/2006 at 02:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 131 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Bryan Leland Deal for violation of probation.Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 8/14/06. (SMH)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 130 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence O Anderson :Initial Appearance re Revocation of Probation as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 8/14/2006.Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 8/14/2006. Appointing Mark John Berardoni for Bryan Leland Deal with Appointment Type: CJA.,FINANCIAL AFDVT TAKEN. Detention Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal submitted on 8/14/2006. Defendant continued detained as a danger. Preliminary Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal waived. Held to answer before District Court. LATER: Admit/Deny Hearing set for 8/23/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Court ORDERS petition unsealed. Court ORDERS nunc pro tunc correcting all references to Supervised Release on the docket. Defendant is on probation, not supervised release.(Court Reporter courtsmart). (CLB)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 132 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                            SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION Warrant Returned Executed on 8/11/06 as to Bryan Leland Deal. (LSP)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 128 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                                                              PETITION TO REVOKE PROBATION as to Bryan Leland Deal (LSP) Modified on 8/14/2006 TO UNSEAL PURSUANT TO [130] MINUTE ENTRY, (LSP).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Arrest
                                                                                                                Arrest of Bryan Leland Deal (CLB)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 118 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 1/30/2006, Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 1/30/2006 is vacated. Competency Hearing set for 2/14/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) (KFZ)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 117 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [116] Motion to Continue as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Status hearing reset on 1/30/06 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/11/06. (SJF)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 116 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006, Terminated: 1/11/2006 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                      Second MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Bryan Leland Deal. (Berardoni, Mark)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Due to defense counsel's scheduling conflict, status conference is reset from 1/5/06 to 1/17/06 at 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. (SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 12/28/2005 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          As to Bryan Leland Deal, status hearing regarding competency is hereby set for 1/5/2006 at 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. (SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [109] Motion to Continue Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal. Hearing reset 1/30/06 at 3:00. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/17/05. (SJF)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005, Terminated: 11/17/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Continue Evidentiary Hearing Re: Revocation by Bryan Leland Deal. (Berardoni, Mark)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 108 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005 Revocation of Probation HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake :Admit/Deny hearing re: Supervised Release violation as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 10/31/2005; Denial entered, Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/21/2005 10:30 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. (1/2 hour allotted)(Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) (JBA)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 107 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Admit/Deny Hearing held on 9/19/2005. At request of defendant, Admit/Deny Hearing continued to 10/31/2005 at 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams.) (SJF)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER issued granting [102] Motion to Continue Admit/Deny hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal (1). Admit/Deny hearing reset for 9/19/05 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/25/05. (SJF)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Notice of Filer of Deficiency
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY as to Bryan Leland Deal re [104] Notice of Filer of Deficiency, [99] Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA. Description of deficiency: Attorney Drake not added to action.. (DMT, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 104 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005 Notice of Filer of Deficiency
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY as to Bryan Leland Deal re [99] Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA. Description of deficiency: Atty Drake was not added as cnsl.. (DMT, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 103 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Notice of Correction
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CORRECTION BY THE CLERK as to Bryan Leland Deal re [101] Order of Recusal. Description of deficiency: attachment omitted from order. Follow up by Clerks Office: attachment to order now available. Court use only: CMM. (DMT, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005, Terminated: 8/25/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Continue Admit/Deny Hearing by Bryan Leland Deal. (Berardoni, Mark)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL in case as to Bryan Leland Deal Judge Earl H Carroll recused. Case reassigned by random lot to Judge Neil V Wake for all further proceedings . Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 8/18/05. (CMM, ) Modified on 8/23/2005 DOCUMENT ATTACHED (DMT, ).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 99 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Attorney Stephen W Laramore terminated. Daniel R. Drake is the Attorney for the United States. (Drake, Daniel) Modified on 8/24/2005 , DOCUMENT STEPS IMCOMPLETE (DMT, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Bryan Leland Deal: Appointment of Attorney Mark John Berardoni for Bryan Leland Deal. Attorney David M Ochoa terminated. (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DETENTION for violation of probation as to Bryan Leland Deal. Signed by Judge David K Duncan on 8/18/05. (SMA)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 96 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Notice of Correction
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTION BY THE CLERK as to Bryan Leland Deal re [71] Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant filed by Bryan Leland Deal,. Description of deficiency: Attorney associated with incorrect party. Follow up by Clerks Office: Atty Laramore now correctly shown as representing plaintiff. Court use only: LCF. (DMT, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David K Duncan :Detention Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal submitted on 8/16/2005, Defendant detained. Preliminary Revocation Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal waived, Defendant held to answer before USDC. Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Revocation Hearings as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 8/16/2005. Admit/Deny Hearing set for 8/25/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Earl H Carroll. (Recorded on CourtSmart.) (SMA)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 94 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David K. Duncan :Appointment of Counsel Hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 8/10/2005. Financial Affidavit taken. Appointing Mark John Berardoni for Bryan Leland Deal with Appointment Type: CJA. Initial Appearance re Revocation of Probation as to Bryan Leland Deal held on 8/10/2005. Appearance entered by Mark John Berardoni for Bryan Leland Deal on behalf of defendant. Defendant temporarily detained.Status Hearing re: Detention and Preliminary Revocation Hearings set for 8/16/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. (Recorded on CourtSmart) (SMA)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                            Supervised Release Warrant Returned Executed on 8/9/05 in case as to Bryan Leland Deal. (SBU, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                              Arrest of Bryan Leland Deal (SMA)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 92 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                                                                                                                PETITION TO REVOKE PROBATION as to Bryan Leland Deal (SBU, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll re: [88-2]; THE USMS release Brryan Deal from custody and transport him bag-and-baggage to the Sandra Day O'Connor Courthouse to the custody of defense counsel David Ochoa on 8/1/05. The Defendant shall be released with a 30 day supply of his medication. (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll, amending sentence for Bryan Leland Deal (1) count(s) 1. Placed on probation for term of 60 MONTHS; S/A in amount of $100.00 IT IS ORDERED ***REINSTATING DEFENDANT'S PROBATION*** for a term of 60 MONTHS, less any time served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dft shall remain in the custody of the US Marshal until such time as a bed becomes available at a community corrections center in Phoenix. (cc: USM,Prob,USA,Dft) (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 5/31/05) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on probation as to Bryan Leland Deal before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . [90-1] re: [90-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 5/31/05) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . Revocation Proceedings re Probation vioaltion; Dispositin conducted, order to follow; IT IS ORDERED denying as moot the Motion to dismiss Petition of Violation of Probation w/o prejudice [83-1] by USA as to Bryan Leland Deal and the Motion for Release from Probation [83-2] by USA as to Bryan Leland Deal [89-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Warrant Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                          PROBATION VIOLATION WARRANT returned unexecuted as to Bryan Leland Deal (dft has been in custody on this charge since 7/2/04) (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER admit/deny hearing reset for 11:00 5/31/05 for Bryan Leland Deal [86-2] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; admit/deny hearing set for 3:00 5/24/05 for Bryan Leland Deal on Petition for Revocation of Probation [85-2] (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 5/9/05) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Ct Rptr: Candy Potter. Status hearing held as to dft Bryan Leland Deal The Court has reviewed the material filed and expresses a concern regardingthe Gov's position with respect to releasing the dft to the general public. Dft counsel requests that the Court consider placing the dft at Value Options. The Court has reviewed a recent opinion from the Ninth Circuit as to what does in fact constitute a threat. After further discussion, a separate order will issue setting a hearing on the penidng Petition for Violation of Probation. [84-2] (KMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005, Terminated: 5/31/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to dismiss Petition of Violation of Probation w/o prejudice [83-1] by USA as to Bryan Leland Deal , and for Release from Probation [83-2] by USA as to Bryan Leland Deal (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    (FILED: 5/3/05) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . ; status hrg held and counsel advises that dft appears to be competent ; hearing on the pending Petition for violation of probation set for 11:00 5/9/05 for Bryan Leland Deal [82-2] (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting motion for status hearing [80-1] by Bryan Leland Deal ; status hearing set for 11:00 5/2/05 for Bryan Leland Deal [cc:cnsl] [81-2] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005, Terminated: 4/21/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for status hearing [80-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Order Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER executed on 2/10/05 as to defendant Bryan Leland Deal re order [63-2] . (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll denying motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal, without prejudice to further proceedings concerning dft's mental competency and authorization for involuntary medication for civil proceedings (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                              PROBATION WARRANT issued for Bryan Leland Deal ; (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                PETITION TO REVOKE probation as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER there being a status heiarng re psychological evaluation currently scheduled before Judge Carroll as to Bryan Leland Deal, the status hrg set for 12/15/04 before Magistrate Judge Anderson is vacated [75-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER re motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal, hearing set for 10:30 12/8/04 for Bryan Leland Deal [73-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Ct Rptr: Candy Potter. Granting motion for expedited hearing for status conference re involuntary medication of dft [72-1] by Bryan Leland Deal and status hearing held re motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal - Order to issue [74-1] (CMM) Modified on 12/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for expedited hearing for status conference re involuntary medication of dft [72-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA: Stephen W Laramore appears and terminating attorney Michael S Somsan for USA (LCF) DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO LINK ATTORNEY TO CORRECT PARTY.(DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum re warden's letter to the court re by dft Bryan Leland Deal re involuntary medication (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter. Taking under advisement on 10/6/04 the motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal re motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal pending further filings with the court [69-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER re motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal ; hearing set for 4:00 10/5/04 for Bryan Leland Deal [68-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by dft Bryan Leland Deal to motion for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal as to dft Bryan Leland Deal (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004, Terminated: 12/17/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order for the Forcible Involuntary Medication of dft [66-1] by USA as to dft Bryan Leland Deal (KMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; This Court has received and considered Warden A. F. Seeler's request that the dft's psychological evaluation period begin on the dat of his arrival to Butner Federal Medical Center on 8/13/04; Warden Seeler's letter further states if this request is granted, then the evaluation period will end on 12/10/04. status hearing regarding competency set for 2:00 12/15/04 for Bryan Leland Deal , before Mag Lawrence O. Anderson , excludable XA started (LCF) Modified on 08/31/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Bryan Leland Deal appointing David Ochoa (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 7/12/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson re: [62-3] mental comptency examination ordered for Bryan Leland Deal dft oral motion for mental competency exam is granted and pursuant to 18:4241(b) and (d)(1), dft is committed to the custody of the Attorney General for evaluation and if appropriate for hospitalization and psychiatric treatment for a period of time not to exceed 4 months and a report will be timely filed with the court pursuant to 18:4247(b) and (c); the clerk of court is directed to mail copies of this roder to both defense attorneys Patrick McGillicuddy and David Ochoa (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED: 7/8/04) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. Status hearing held re mental competency as to Bryan Leland Deal and dft appears with Patrick McGilliguddy for David Ochoa. Oral motion by dft counsel to have dft mentally evaluated locally, gov objects to local evaluation. Motion granted in part and denied in part. dft shall be evaluated but not locally. status hearing re mental competency set for 9:30 9/15/04 for Bryan Leland Deal , before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Dft's presence for this hearing is waived. [62-3] (CMM) Modified on 07/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILED: 7/7/04) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. Dft Bryan Leland Deal arrested 6/1/04 on violation of probation; initial appearance held re violation and dft appears with Patrick McGillicuddy for David Ochoa, appointed this date; appointment of counsel hearing held ; status hearing re preliminary revocation hearing set for 2:30 7/7/04 for Bryan Leland Deal , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson Status hearing re mental competency set for 7/7/04 at 2:30 pm before Magistrate Judge Anderson. [60-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Order of Detention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of detention pending further proceedings as to Bryan Leland Deal - issued in Southern District of CA on arrest for violation of probation re: detention [59-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 40 documents received from Southern Dist of CA as to Bryan Leland Deal - warrant of removal to this district, minutes, docket sheet, detention order (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROBATION WARRANT returned executed on 6/1/04 as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Michael S Somsan appears and terminating attorney Daniel R Drake for USA (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PETITION TO REVOKE probation as to Bryan Leland Deal ; petition filed on 4/1/04. (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/1/2004 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROBATION Violation WARRANT issued for Bryan Leland Deal ; ordered by Judge Earl H. Carroll (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PLEA agreement filed as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT of Probation issued by Judge Earl H. Carroll for Bryan Leland Deal sentencing for Bryan Leland Deal (1) count(s) 1. Placed on probation for term of 60 MONTHS; S/A in amount of $100.00 , Case closed (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED: 2/6/04) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter sentencing held as to Brian Leland Deal [52-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to accelerate sentencing date [49-1] by Bryan Leland Deal sentencing reset for 10:30 2/2/04 for Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING memorandum filed by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004, Terminated: 1/27/2004 Motion to Expedite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to accelerate sentencing date [49-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/18/03) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . Bryan Leland Deal (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , , , ; plea hrg held ; trial vacated ; dft remanded to USM; sentencing set for 2:30 3/1/04 for Bryan Leland Deal [cc: USP/PTS/AUSA] [48-5] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial (4th req) and pretrial conference [45-1] by Bryan Leland Deal ; pretrial conference vacated ; trial reset for 9:00 1/13/04 for Bryan Leland Deal , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 9:30 12/17/03 for Bryan Leland Deal before Judge Carroll cc: pb/pts/usa/cnsl [46-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003, Terminated: 12/11/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to continue trial (4th req) and pretrial conference [45-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 12/3/03) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . ; plea hrg vacated as to Bryan Leland Deal FURTHER ORD upon the filing of a motion by defense counsel, the Court will review that and if appropriate then enter an order vacating the trial setting, and any other pretrial matters, and setting a hearing for further determination with respect to the dft and his competency. [44-2] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 11/19/03) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter . ; status hrg held , ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 12/3/03 for Bryan Leland Deal IT IS ORD a signed plea agreement is to be lodged with this Court no later than 4 p.m., Wednesday, 11/26/03. [43-3] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER ; status hearing regarding trial date set for 10:45 11/19/03 for Bryan Leland Deal before Judge Carroll [42-2] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Bryan Leland Deal re: detention [40-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED: 10/27/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis. Competency hearing held as to dft Bryan Leland Deal and dft is found competent to stand trial trial set for 9:00 12/16/03 for Bryan Leland Deal Detemtion hearing waived, dft continued detained as flight risk and danger. The Doctor's report is recieved and is to be filed under seal. [39-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003 Order Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER executed on 10/10/03 as to defendant Bryan Leland Deal re order [23-3] . (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial [36-1] by Bryan Leland Deal ; trial reset for 9:00 12/16/03 for Bryan Leland Deal pretrial conference set for 11:30 12/8/03 for Bryan Leland Deal , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to continue trial [36-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS list of USA re competency hearing as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED: 7/3/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis ; hearing held re competency as to Bryan Leland Deal Dft and his counsel appear via video conferencing; matter taken under advisement; record of this proceeding is ordered SEALED. [33-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial [27-1] by Bryan Leland Deal ; trial reset for 9:00 8/12/03 for Bryan Leland Deal , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to continue trial [27-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial (1st req) [25-1] by Bryan Leland Deal ; trial reset for 9:00 5/13/03 for Bryan Leland Deal , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial (1st req) [25-1] by Bryan Leland Deal (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Bryan Leland Deal appointing David Ochoa (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis that dft Bryan Leland Deal is not competent at the time to stand trial; the dft shall be committed to custody of the Attorney General for hospitalization and treatment in a suitable facility for a reasonable period of time, not to exceed 4 months as is necessary to determine wheter there is a substantial probability that dft will attain the capacity to permit trial to proceed excludable delay XA stopped , excludable delay competency proceedings started as to 12/30/02 (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED: 1/2/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Status hearing held as to Bryan Leland Deal, parties agree that further study and treatment is needed - request granted. Dft oral motion to substitute counsel granted; withdrawing attorney Craig Stephen Orent for Bryan Leland Deal and substituting attorney David M Ochoa , ; status hrg held [22-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER executed on 11/12/02 as to defendant Bryan Leland Deal re order [14-4] . (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 11/29/2002, Entered: 11/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis finding that dft is mentally incompetent at this time; FURTHER ORDERED that the dft shall be seen and evaluated and treated by a psychiatrist at his present location; FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is set for a status hearing on 12/30/02 at 10:00; status hearing set for 10:00 12/30/02 for Bryan Leland Deal (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 11/27/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis . . ; status hrg held re mental competency; Crt has rcvd rpt from Dr Parrish; crt finds dft is not competent to stand trial, written ord to follow , ; status hearing re mental competency set for 10:00 12/30/02 for Bryan Leland Deal , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [18-4] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER ; status hearing regarding competency reset for 10:00 11/26/02 for Bryan Leland Deal , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis (cc by AS) [17-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of confession, admissions and statements purs. to Local Rule 4.11 as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial [13-1] by Bryan Leland Deal, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [13-2] by Bryan Leland Deal ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 12/30/02 for Bryan Leland Deal ; trial reset for 9:00 2/4/03 for Bryan Leland Deal , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis for competency exam pursuant to 18:4241 as to Bryan Leland Deal by Dr. Susan Downs-Parrish and she shall file a report with the court within 1 week following the examination; she shall submit her bill for payment to the Department of Justice, c/o the US Attorney's Office; excludable delay competency exam started , further hearing set for 1:15 12/13/02 for Bryan Leland Deal , before Mag Judge A. Mathis (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002, Terminated: 11/13/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to continue trial [13-1] by Bryan Leland Deal , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [13-2] by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM) Modified on 11/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial [10-1] by Bryan Leland Deal, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [10-2] by Bryan Leland Deal ; pretrial motions ddl set for 11/12/02 for Bryan Leland Deal ; trial set for 9:00 12/17/02 for Bryan Leland Deal , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BENCH WARRANT returned executed on 9/19/02 as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002, Terminated: 11/1/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to continue trial [10-1] by Bryan Leland Deal , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [10-2] by Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by dft Bryan Leland Deal of agreement re appointment of psychologist (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED: 10/22/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis ; detention hrg vacated as to Bryan Leland Deal due to competency issue Counsel for dft directed to file a motion and order re a competency evaluation [8-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BENCH WARRANT returned executed on 9/19/02 as to Bryan Leland Deal (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 10/11/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis. Dft Bryan Leland Deal ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the US Marshal. Detention hearing set for 10/18/02 at 2:00 before Magistrate Judge Mathis First appearance of Bryan Leland Deal ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Bryan Leland Deal arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Craig Stephen Orent present; , cr dft Bryan Leland Deal appears with counsel , ; pretrial motions due 10/25/02 for Bryan Leland Deal ; trial set for 9:00 11/26/02 for Bryan Leland Deal ; excludable for transfer proceedings stopped this date. [cc: usm,pts,cnsl,ehc,vam] [6-5] (KMG) Modified on 10/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re conflict does not exist with Judge Murguia by pla as to dft Bryan Leland Deal (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BENCH WARRANT issued for Bryan Leland Deal ; (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT by USA attorney Daniel R Drake. Counts filed against Bryan Leland Deal (1) count(s) 1 (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Bryan Leland Deal [ 2:02-m -3137 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 40 documents received from Dist of Ohio at Columbus as to Bryan Leland Deal [ 2:02-m -3137 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT Bryan Leland Deal arrested in Southern District of Ohio. (KMG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT Bryan Leland Deal arrested in the District of Ohio at Columbus. [ 2:02-m -3137 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT Bryan Leland Deal (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:02-m -3137 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT issued for Bryan Leland Deal ; ordered by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [ 2:02-m -3137 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?