MPA International v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:02-cv-02588-FJM
District Judge Frederick J Martone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 12:27 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MPA International, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MCI Worldcom Communications, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monty Lee Greek +1 602 224 7888 +1 602 224 7889 mgreek@zglawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C. Manning +1 602 279 1600 +2406 240 240 6925 mmanning@stinson.com
v.
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo House of Ivana Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Ivana Haute Couture & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Trump, Ivana, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivana Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cody Maryl Hall +1 602 200 1289 +1 602 230 8985 minute-entries@soarizonalaw.com
Space Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 12/23/2002
Jury Demand None
Demand $275000
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/27/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV-2002-019826[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting stipulation to dismiss case w/prejudice by pla, dfts. Each party to bear own costs and fees (cc: all counsel) (MAP) Modified on 08/27/2003
    LREF
    Blank 22 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Stipulation
    STIPULATION to dismiss case w/prejudice by pla, dfts (MAP)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      MINUTE ORDER: On the court's own motion, the Rule 16 scheduling conference is reset to Friday, October 3, 2003 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Martone. (cc: all counsel) [21-2] (KCB)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Frederick J. Martone ; prel scheduling conf set for 3:00 8/22/03 (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Answer
          ANSWER to [1-2] by dfts Ivana Trump, Ivana Haute Couture & Co and House of Ivana, Inc (CMM)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by dfts [5-1], denying motion to transfer case to Southern District of New York by dfts [5-2] (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Frederick J. Martone. Crt Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis. Appearances: Monty Greek and Jamie Williams for plaintiff; Jason Kelly for defendants. Also present is Dan Harrigan, corporate counsel for defendants. Motion hearing is held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement on 3/14/03 the motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by dfts [5-1], taking under advisement on 3/14/03 the motion to transfer case to Southern District of New York by dfts. [cc: FJM] [17-1] (KCB)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY (in response to pla amended opposition) by dfts to response to motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by dfts [5-1], motion to transfer case to Southern District of New York by dfts [5-2] (CMM) Modified on 03/12/2003
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Response to Motion
                  AMENDED RESPONSE by pla to motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by dfts [5-1], motion to transfer case to Southern District of New York by dfts [5-2] (CMM)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying motion for leave to file combined response and separate statement of facts (re motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and alternative motion to transfer case to Southern District of NY) by pla [10-1] (combined response and statement of facts lodged and sent to left side of file along with dfts reply lodged 2/18/03) vacating [0-0] lodged document, vacating [0-0] lodged document; pla shall file its complying memorandum no later than 3/3/03, dfts shall file their reply no later than 3/10/03; oral argument set for 3/14/03 at 2:00 pm is affirmed (cc: all counsel) (CMM) Modified on 02/25/2003
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Lodged Document
                      LODGED reply by dfts in support of their motion to dismiss the complaint (response by pla lodged on 1/31/03, stipulation for leave to file still pending) (CMM)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                        REPLY by pla to response to motion for leave to file combined response and separate statement of facts (re motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and alternative motion to transfer case to Southern District of NY) by pla [10-1] (combined response and statement of facts lodged and placed at docket clerk's desk) (DMT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting stipulation to extend time for two days for pla to respond to motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, or alternatively to transfer case to Southern District of New York by Dfts Ivana Trump, Ivana Haute Couture, of Ivana Inc [5-1] [5-1] by pla, dft (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Motion to Expedite
                            CROSS-MOTION for expedited ruling on motion for leave to file combined response and separate statement of facts (re motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and alternative motion to transfer case to Southern District of NY) by pla [10-1] (combined response and statement of facts lodged and placed at docket clerk's desk) by dfts [11-1] and RESPONSE to motion for leave to file combined response and separate statement of facts (re motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and alternative motion to transfer case to Southern District of NY) by pla [10-1] (combined response and statement of facts lodged and placed at docket clerk's desk) [10-1] by dfts (CMM)
                              LREF
                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MOTION for leave to file combined response and separate statement of facts (re motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and alternative motion to transfer case to Southern District of NY) by pla [10-1] (combined response and statement of facts lodged and placed at docket clerk's desk) (CMM) Modified on 02/05/2003
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Lodged Document
                                LODGED combined response and statmenet of facts re dfts motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or alternatively to transfer case to Southern District of NY by pla, re #10 (CMM)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Stipulation
                                  STIPULATION to extend time for two days for pla to respond to motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, or alternatively to transfer case to Southern District of New York by Dfts Ivana Trump, Ivana Haute Couture, of Ivana Inc [5-1] [5-1] by pla, dft (DMT) Modified on 02/05/2003
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
                                    Party agrees to mag judge jurisdiction (MAP)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                      MINUTE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting hearing on the motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, or alternatively to transfer case to Southern District of New York by Dfts Ivana Trump, Ivana Haute Couture, of Ivana Inc [5-1] at 2:00 p.m. on March 14, 2003 before the Honorable Frederick J. Martone, Courtroom 506, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. District Courthouse, Phoenix, Arizona. (cc: all counsel) [7-1] (KCB) Modified on 02/05/2003
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Frederick J. Martone All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-02-2588-PHX-FJM (cc: all counsel/VAM/FJM) [6-2] (MAP) Modified on 02/05/2003
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 2/5/2003, Terminated: 2/7/2003 Motion to Dismiss Case/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                          MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by dfts [5-1] , or, alternatively to transfer case to Southern District of New York by dfts [5-2] (CMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                            Party elects assignment of case to district judge (MAP)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                              Party elects assignment of case to district judge (MAP)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                                Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 12/27/02 (MAP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Notice of Removal
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court Case Number: CV-2002-019826 (summons/complaint) (MAP)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?