USA, et al v. Zevada-Eseberre
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00001-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Beth Pfister +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7537 mary.beth.pfister@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Maricopa
Terminated 3/17/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-00244
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Plea Agreement
PLEA agreement filed as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre sentencing for Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre (1) count(s) 1. Committed to the custody of the BOP for THIRTY FOUR (34) MOS followed by SUPERVISED RELEASE for THREE (3) YRS; SA:$100 ; Court recommends dft participate in the BOP Residential Drug Abuse Treatment Program; Case closed ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 3/17/03) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: ELemke Interpreter: STavrytsky. ; sentencing held for Jose A Zevada-Eseberre ; 5K2.0 dounward departure granted [15-2] (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 1/3/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan . Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish. Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; sentencing set for 9:30 3/17/03 for Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre ORD dft remanded to USM; PSI ordered, plea agreement lodged as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre , dft states true name to be Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre [13-5] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Waiver - Miscellaneous
            WAIVER of indictment by Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan and consent of Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre to plea before a US Mag Judge re: [11-1] (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                INFORMATION by USA attorney Mary Beth Phillips. Counts filed against Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre (1) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver granting motion by Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre to extend time to indict (30 days) [6-1] excludable delay XT started [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE by pla USA to motion by Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre to extend time to indict (30 days) [6-1] as to dft Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 1:15 1/2/03 for Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [7-3] [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                        MOTION by Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre to extend time to indict (30 days) [6-1] [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE re no conflict as to Judge Murguia by pla USA as to dft Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre [ 2:02-m -244 ] (KSB)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Waiver of Indictment
                            WAIVER of Indictment pending by USA as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre ; Judge drawn to hear plea: PGR [ 2:02-m -244 ] (CMM)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              ( FILED: 12/11/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis. Defendant Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre present with counsel Robert McWhirter and Interpreter: Cristina Sporrer/Spanish. Status hearing regarding preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and defendant held to answer. [4-1] re: [4-1] [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre re: detention [3-1] [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  ( FILED: 12/9/02) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis. Interpreter: Louis Velasco SPANISH for Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre. , first appearance of Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre appears with counsel Robert James McWhirter; appointment of counsel hearing held, defendant sworn and counsel ordered appointed; detention hearing submitted and defendant ordered detained pending trial; status hearing regarding preliminary hearings set for 12/10/02 at 11:00 am before Magistrate Judge Mathis [2-4] [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp) Modified on 12/09/2002
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed as to Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 Arrest
                                      DEFENDANT Jose Antonio Zevada-Eseberre arrested. (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:02-m -244 ] (former emp)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?