USA, et al v. Chapa-Alvarez
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00002-SMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Robert Lopez, IV +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7537 John.Lopez3@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Maricopa
Terminated 3/17/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-06235
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
PAYMENT voucher by Judge Stephen M. McNamee as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez for CJA atty David M Ochoa (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez sentencing for Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (1) count(s) 1. Committed to the custody of the BOP for EIGHTEEN (18) MOS with credit for TIME SERVED; SUPERVISED RELEASE for THREE (3) YRS; SA:$100 , Case closed ; ordered by Judge Stephen M. McNamee (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Plea Agreement
      PLEA agreement filed as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        ( FILED: 3/19/03) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee . Ct Rptr: GMoll Interpreter: LVanDuzer. ; sentencing held as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez ; granting oral motion by USA for a one level downward departure due to reinstatement of the dft's prior deportation order and the dft's agreement to deportation without challenge [cc: usm/pb/pts/usa/cnsl] [19-2] (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE by pla USA to objection to presentence report by dft Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER: Due to the court's calendar; IT IS ORDERED resetting the sentencing in this matter from March 13, 2003 to Monday, March 17, 2003 at 9:30 a.m. for Carlos Chapa-Alvarez before Chief Judge Stephen M. McNamee in courtroom #605. (cc: AUSA, Defense Counsel, PROB, PTS, SMM) [17-2] (ALL)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
              OBJECTION by Carlos Chapa-Alvarez to pre-sentence report (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  ( FILED: 1/3/03) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan . Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish. Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; sentencing set for 1:00 3/13/03 for Carlos Chapa-Alvarez before Judge McNamee; ORD dft remanded to USM; PSI ordered, plea agreement lodged as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez [14-4] (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                    WAIVER of indictment by Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan and consent of Carlos Chapa-Alvarez to plea before a US Mag Judge re: [12-1] (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                        INFORMATION by USA attorney John Robert Lopez IV. Counts filed against Carlos Chapa-Alvarez (1) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 1:45 1/2/03 for Carlos Chapa-Alvarez , before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan [10-3] [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                            NOTICE re no conflict with Judge Murguia by USA as to dft Carlos Chapa-Alvarez [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Waiver of Indictment
                              WAIVER of Indictment pending by USA as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez ; Judge drawn to hear plea: SMM [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (SAT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson granting motion by Carlos Chapa-Alvarez to extend time to indict (30 days) [6-1] excludable delay XT started [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE by pla USA to motion by Carlos Chapa-Alvarez to extend time to indict (30 days) [6-1] [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002, Terminated: 12/3/2002 Motion to Extend Time
                                    MOTION by Carlos Chapa-Alvarez to extend time to indict (30 days) [6-1] [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                      ORDER of detention pending trial by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez re: detention [4-1] [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (KSB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 CJA 20 Appointment
                                        CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez appointing David Ochoa [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          (FILED: 11/18/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer present. Carlos Chapa-Alvarez present with appointed counsel, David Ochoa. Allen Stooks present for the government. Detention Hearing submitted; dft continued detained pending trial based on flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived; dft held to answer before District Court. [3-1] re: [3-1] [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (KSB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            (FILED: 11/14/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer present. First appearance of Carlos Chapa-Alvarez who appears with appointed counsel, David M. Ochoa. Dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Status Hearing re Detention and Preliminary Hearings set on 11/15/02 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Duncan; dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. [2-4] [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (KSB)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT filed as to Carlos Chapa-Alvarez [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (KSB)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Arrest
                                                DEFENDANT Carlos Chapa-Alvarez arrested (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:02-m -6235 ] (KSB)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?