USA, et al v. Raimundo-Ornelas
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00013-ROS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Wayne Reeves +1 928 344 9550 +1 928 344 3123 mark.reeves@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated 2/23/2004
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-09745
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) - Possession with Intent to Distribute a Controlled Substance
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) - Possession with Intent to Distribute a Controlled Substance
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Other Notice
NOTICE re change of address and telephone number as to Gregory Torok (after 11/1/03 Mr. Torok can be reached at the office of Metcalf and Metcalf, telephone number (928)782-2558 and the address is 217 S. Second Avenue, Yuma, AZ 85364) by dft Juan Raimundo-Ornelas as to dft Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (LCF)
    LREF
    Blank 18 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion to continue hearing scheduled for 7/21/03 by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [17-1] sentencing reset for 10:15 9/15/03 for Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (LCF)
      LREF
      Blank 17 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003, Terminated: 7/21/2003 Motion to Continue
      MOTION to continue hearing scheduled for 7/21/03 by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [17-1] (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 16 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Order
        MINUTE ORDER sentencing reset in time only to 3:00 7/21/03 for Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [16-2] (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 15 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting Motion (Unopposed) to Continue Hearing (plea acceptance and sentencing) Scheduled for 5/19/03 [14-1] by Juan Raimundo-Ornelus sentencing re-set for 10:15 7/21/03 for Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (SAT)
            LREF
            Blank 14 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003, Terminated: 5/13/2003 Motion to Continue
            MOTION (Unopposed) to Continue Hearing (plea acceptance and sentencing) Scheduled for 5/19/03 [14-1] by Juan Raimundo-Ornelus (SAT)
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion to continue hearing (plea acceptance and sentencing) scheduled for 4/21/03 by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [12-1] sentencing reset for 10:15 5/19/03 for Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Motion to Continue
                UNOPPOSED MOTION to continue hearing (plea acceptance and sentencing) scheduled for 4/21/03 by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [12-1] (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                  CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas ; ordered by Judge Roslyn O. Silver (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Order
                    MINUTE ORDER sentencing set for 10:15 4/21/03 for Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [10-2] (LAD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Juan Raimundo-Ornelas re: detention [4-1] [ 2:02-m -9745 ] (KSB)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          (FILED: 1/9/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Ct Rptr: 03-001(5856-7015)02-002(000-731) Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer - SPANISH. Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty ; plea agreement lodged as to Juan Raimundo-Ornelas ; presentence investigation ordered ; sentencing to be set before US District Judge; ORDER dft remanded to US Marshal [cc: all counsel] [8-4] (LAD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                            CONSENT OF DFT (Juan Raimundo-Ornelas) by Mag Judge Jay Irwin re: [7-1] (LAD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                              WAIVER of Indictment by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (LAD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                                INFORMATION by USA attorney Mark Wayne Reeves. Counts filed against Juan Raimundo-Ornelas (1) count(s) 1 (LAD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                  CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [ 2:02-m -9745 ] (KSB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. First appearance of Juan Raimundo-Ornelas; dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Juan Raimundo-Ornelas appears with appointed counsel, Gregory Thomas Torok. Dft sworn re: financial status. Financial affidavit to be filed. Detention Hearing held. Dft continued detained pending trial based on flight risk. Preliminary Hearing set on 1/2/03 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [2-4] [ 2:02-m -9745 ] (KSB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT filed as to Juan Raimundo-Ornelas [ 2:02-m -9745 ] (KSB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Arrest
                                        DEFENDANT Juan Raimundo-Ornelas arrested. [ 2:02-m -9745 ] (KSB)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?