USA, et al v. Lopez-Ojeda
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00014-FJM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darcy A Cerow +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 364 7929 Darcy.Cerow@USDOJ.GOV

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated 3/24/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-09649
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a)and enhanced by(b)(2) Attempted Re-Entry After Deportation
Count 2
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a)and enhanced by (b)(2) Re-Entry After Deportation
Count 2
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a)and enhanced by (b)(2) Re-Entry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Fugitive
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
PAYMENT voucher by Judge Frederick J. Martone as to Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda for CJA atty Bruce Yancey (DMT)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda ; ordered by Judge Frederick J. Martone (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed on government's oral motion at sentencing , sentencing for Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda (1) count(s) 1. Custody of BOP for term of THIRTY SIX (36) MOS followed by supervised release for term of THREE (3) YRS. S/A: $100 , remanded to cusdoty of USM Case closed ; ordered by Judge Frederick J. Martone. [cc:usm, prob, pts, cnsl, immigration, order book, finance] (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        ( FILED: 3/27/03) MINUTES: before Judge Frederick J. Martone . Ct Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer, spanish. ; sentencing held as to Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda See jgm and commitment [13-2] (DMT)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Plea Agreement
          PLEA agreement filed as to Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda (DMT)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 2/12/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda ; ordered by Judge Frederick J. Martone (DMT)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Order
              MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing set for 3:00 3/24/03 for Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda [cc:prob, pts, cnsl] [10-2] (DMT)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda. [cc:cnsl] (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                  ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda re: detention [4-1] [ 2:02-m -9649 ] (KSB)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    ( FILED: 1/9/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler, spanish. Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , plea hrg held; sentencing to be set before District Judge. remaining count to be dismissed upon entry of jgm; PSI ordered. dft remanded to USM plea agreement lodged as to Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda , [cc: usm, prob, pts, cnsl, FJM] [8-4] (DMT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin and consent of dft Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda to go forward with plea of guilty before magistrate judge. re: [7-1] (DMT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                        WAIVER of indictment by Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda (DMT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                          INFORMATION by USA attorney Mark Wayne Reeves. Counts filed against Cuauhtemac Lopez-Ojeda (1) count(s) 1, 2 (DMT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. Appointment of Counsel hearing held. Dft sworn re: financial status. Bruce Yancey is appointed to represent the dft, Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda. Detention Hearing submitted. Dft continued detained pending trial based on flight risk. Defense attorney requests a continuance of preliminary hearing. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/2/03 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [3-2] [ 2:02-m -9649 ] (KSB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. First appearance of Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda; dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Detention Hearing set on 12/10/02 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. Preliminary Hearing set on 12/19/02 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [2-3] [ 2:02-m -9649 ] (KSB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT filed as to Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda. [ 2:02-m -9649 ] (KSB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Arrest
                                  DEFENDANT Cuauhtemoc Lopez-Ojeda arrested. [ 2:02-m -9649 ] (KSB)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?