USA, et al v. Campos-Plaza
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00015-JAT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Wayne Reeves +1 928 344 9550 +1 928 344 3123 mark.reeves@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated 3/24/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-09650
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and (b)(2) - Attempted Reentry After Deportation
Count 2
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and (b)(2) - Reentry After Deportation
Count 2
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and (b)(2) - Reentry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Judgment*
JUDGMENT for Jose Raul Campos-Plaza that the defendant/movant's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the defendant/movant take nothing and the action be, and same hereby is, dismissed. (CIV 03-742-PHX-JAT) re: [41-1] (SAT)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg that the MAgistrate Judge's REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [39-1] is ACCEPTED AND ADOPTED; FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza, as supplemented by [25-1] is DENIED (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) (SAT)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004, Terminated: 6/9/2004 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson re motion to vacate/to set aside sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) recommending that the motion be denied, and the the court deny movant's supplemental motion [25-1] (cc: all counsel,jat) (CMM)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Reply to Response
        REPLY (counter response) by dft Jose Raul Campos-Plaza to response to motion to vacate/to set aside sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Other Notice
          NOTICE of change of address by dft Jose Raul Campos-Plaza; #60871-208, PO Box 1000, Cumberland, MD 21501 (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 Judgment Returned Executed
            JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon Jose Raul Campos-Plaza 8/4/03 to FCI Cumberland, MD (CMM)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by pla to motion to vacate/to set aside sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) as to dft Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (LCF)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to enlarge time to on or before 7/24/03 for the govt's response to defendant's motion to vacate/set aside or correct sentence, and supplemental motion [33-1] by USA as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (2nd req) (CMM)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003, Terminated: 7/21/2003 Motion to Extend Time
                  MOTION to enlarge time for the govt's response to defendant's motion to vacate/set aside or correct sentence, and supplemental motion [33-1] by USA as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (2nd req) (LCF)
                    LREF
                    Blank 32 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 Transcript
                    TRANSCRIPT of sentencing by Court Reporter: David German as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza for the following date(s): 3/24/03 (LCF)
                      LREF
                      Blank 31 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Transcript
                      TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary hearing by Court Reporter: recorded by electronic sound recording, transcript produced by transcription service as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza for the following date(s): 1/2/03 (CMM)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson granting motion to enlarge time to 7/30/03 for USA response to dft motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence and supplemental motion (first request) [27-1] by USA as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza - responses to the motion and supplemental motion shall be filed on or before 7/10/03. (CMM)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Transcript Order Form - AppealCourt Filing
                          Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by USA as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza; Change of Plea hearing before Magistrate Judge Jay Irwin held on 1/2/03 (also references dates 01/01/03, 03/24/03). (KMG)
                            LREF
                            Blank 28 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 Receipt
                            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of receipt of notice returned as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza received by Michael Johns on 5/1/03 (CMM)
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Motion to Extend Time
                              MOTION to enlarge time to 7/30/03 for USA response to dft motion to vacate, set aside or correct sentence and supplemental motion (first request) [27-1] by USA as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CMM)
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson granting supplemental motion addressing another mistake in movant's sentence by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza; respondent shall file a response to the supplemental motion (memorandum) on or before 6/10/03 (CMM)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Memorandum
                                  SUPPLEMENT MOTION by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza addressing another mistake in movant's sentence re motion to vacate/to set aside sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) (CMM)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg re: motion to vacate/to set aside sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) [22-1] that the clerk of court shall deliver copies of the motion and this order to the US Attorney for the District of AZ; the US Attorney for District of AZ shall have 60 days from the date of service to answer the motion; matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Anderson pursuant to Local Rules 1.16.and 1.17 for further proceedings and a report and recommendation (cc: ausa,dft,loa,jat) (CMM)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT re motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 by dft Jose Raul Campos-Plaza - case assigned to Judge Teilborg and referred to Magistrate Judge Anderson and the court's legal staff (CMM)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                        MOTION to vacate/to set aside sentence [22-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CV-03-742-PHX-JAT(LOA) (CMM) Modified on 04/22/2003
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Order
                                          PAYMENT voucher as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza for CJA atty Bruce Yancey (CMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Plea Agreement
                                            PLEA agreement filed as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CMM)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (1) count(s) 1. Dismissed at Sentencing , sentencing for Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (1) count(s) 2. Custody BOP for term of 37 MONTHS, with credit for time served; upon release placed on supervised release for term of 3 YEARS; S/A in amount of $100.00. , Case closed ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (CMM)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                FILED: 3/26/03) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David C German Interpreter: Van Duzer (for family). Finding the motion to produce presentence investigation pursuant to mandates of Rule 32 of the FRCP (delivery to dft) [12-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (filed pro se, dft has counsel Bruce Yancey moot; dft withdraws motion for cultural assimilation to be applied to sentencing pursuant to (U.S.S.G.) 5K2.0 [16-1] by Jose Raul Camp;os-Plaza (filed by dft pro se) ; sentencing held [18-2] (CMM)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                  OBJECTION by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza to pre-sentence report re criminal history score. (filed pro se by dft) (CMM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    MOTION for cultural assimilation to be applied to sentencing pursuant to (U.S.S.G.) 5K2.0 [16-1] by Jose Raul Camp;os-Plaza (filed by dft pro se) (CMM) Modified on 03/25/2003
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                      SENTENCING memorandum filed by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza - notice of filing character letters (CMM) Modified on 03/25/2003
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                        SENTENCING memorandum filed by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (filed by dft pro se) (CMM) Modified on 03/25/2003
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                          OBJECTION by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza to pre-sentence report (filed by dft pro se). (CMM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/5/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Motion to Produce
                                                            MOTION to produce presentence investigation pursuant to mandates of Rule 32 of the FRCP (delivery to dft) [12-1] by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (filed pro se, dft has counsel Bruce Yancey (CMM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                              SENTENCING memorandum filed as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza - notice of filing letters for the court's consideration at sentencing (CMM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                                                MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing set for 1:30 3/24/03 for Jose Raul Campos-Plaza [10-2] (CMM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza recommending that the plea be accepted (CMM)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza re: detention [4-1] [ 2:02-m -9650 ] (KSB)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                      FILED: 1/10/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Resler - Spanish. Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (1) count(s) 2 enters a plea of guilty , plea agreement lodged as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza Sentencing to be set by District Court [8-3] (CMM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                                                                        INFORMATION by USA attorney Mark Wayne Reeves. Counts filed against Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (1) count(s) 1, 2 (CMM)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin and CONSENT by dft Jose Raul Campos-Plaza for entry of plea of guilty before a United States Magistrate Judge re: [6-1] (CMM)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                                                                            WAIVER of indictment by Jose Raul Campos-Plaza (CMM) Modified on 01/14/2003
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. Appointment of Counsel hearing held. Dft sworn re: financial status. Bruce Yancey is appointed to represent the dft, Jose Raul Campos-Plaza. Detention Hearing submitted; dft continued detained pending trial based on flight risk. Defense attorney requests continuance of preliminary hearing. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/2/03 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [3-2] [ 2:02-m -9650 ] (KSB)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. First appearance of Jose Raul Campos-Plaza; dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Detention Hearing set on 12/10/02 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. Preliminary Hearing set on 12/19/02 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [2-3] [ 2:02-m -9650 ] (KSB)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed as to Jose Raul Campos-Plaza [ 2:02-m -9650 ] (KSB)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Arrest
                                                                                    DEFENDANT Jose Raul Campos-Plaza arrested. [ 2:02-m -9650 ] (KSB)
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 34 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?