USA, et al v. Piceno-Leon
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00016-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Wayne Reeves +1 928 344 9550 +1 928 344 3123 mark.reeves@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
County Yuma
Terminated 3/24/2003
Reopened
Magistrate Case
202-mj-09651
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Attempted Reentry After Deportation
Count 2
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Count 2
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
PAYMENT voucher by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt/RS as to Jose Piceno-Leon for CJA atty Bruce Yancey (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    CJA Form 21 for expert services of Maria D Guzman-Soto by Jose Piceno-Leon ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt/RS (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Jose Piceno-Leon Jose Piceno-Leon (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed on gov mtn at sentencing , sentencing for Jose Piceno-Leon (1) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for TWENTY-SEVEN (27) MOS followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100 Crt recommends dft be placed in institution in Southern CA, Case closed ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Plea Agreement
        PLEA agreement filed as to Jose Piceno-Leon (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 3/26/03) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Elizabeth Lemke Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish. ; sentencing held as to Jose Piceno-Leon; 5K2.0 downward departure granted [12-2] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            CJA Form 21 for expert services of Olga M Keeme by Jose Piceno-Leon ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
              MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing set for 9:30 3/24/03 for Jose Piceno-Leon before Judge Rosenblatt [10-2] (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 9 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Jose Piceno-Leon (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                  ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay Irwin as to Jose Piceno-Leon re: detention [4-1] [ 2:02-m -9651 ] (KSB)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    ( FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin . Interpreter: Marcia Resler/Spanish. plea hrg held Jose Piceno-Leon (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty sentence to be set; ORD dft remanded to USM; PSI expedited, plea agreement lodged as to Jose Piceno-Leon [cc: ausa/usm/pts/ins] [8-3] (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                      WAIVER of indictment by Jose Piceno-Leon (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Mag Judge Jay Irwin and consent of Jose Piceno-Leon to plea before a US Mag Judge re: [6-1] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Information - Misdemeanor
                          INFORMATION by USA attorney Mark Wayne Reeves. Counts filed against Jose Piceno-Leon (1) count(s) 1, 2 (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                            (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. Appointment of Counsel Hearing held. Dft sworn re: financial status. Bruce Yancey is appointed to represent the dft, Jose Piceno-Leon. Detention Hearing submitted. Dft continued detained pending trial based on flight risk. Defense attorney requests a continuance of the Preliminary Hearing. Preliminary Hearing continued to 1/2/03 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [3-2] [ 2:02-m -9651 ] (KSB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              (FILED: 1/8/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay Irwin. Spanish Interpreter: Marcia Resler present. First appearance of Jose Piceno-Leon; dft informed of rights, charges, etc. Detention Hearing set on 12/10/02 at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the USM. Preliminary Hearing set on 12/19/02 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Irwin. [2-3] [ 2:02-m -9651 ] (KSB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT filed as to Jose Piceno-Leon [ 2:02-m -9651 ] (KSB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 1/8/2003 Arrest
                                  DEFENDANT Jose Piceno-Leon arrested. [ 2:02-m -9651 ] (KSB)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?