Jenzen, et al v. Michelin North Amer, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00001-MHM
District Judge Mary H. Murguia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Jenzen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas F Dasse PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Fredrick Dasse , +1 480 998 8222 +1 480 998 9092 tdasse@dasselaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by swlawltd.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard D. Swanson +1 701 772 3407 hswanson@swlawltd.com
No Logo Dewayne Janzen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas F Dasse PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Fredrick Dasse , +1 480 998 8222 +1 480 998 9092 tdasse@dasselaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by swlawltd.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard D. Swanson +1 701 772 3407 hswanson@swlawltd.com
v.
No Logo ABC Corporations, Defendant
No Logo Jane Does, Defendant
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Michelin Americas Research And Development Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Michelin North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quarles & Brady LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Ronald Booker +1 602 229 5714 +1 602 229 5690 brian.booker@quarles.com
Space Michael Edward Korenblat +1 602 229 5200
No Logo Uniroyal Goodrich Tire Company, Defendant
No Logo William Bostick, Defendant
No Logo XYZ Partnerships, Defendant
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 355 - Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Maricopa
Terminated 2/4/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV2002-018476[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid
Pro Hac Vice $25 Fee Paid as to Howard D Swanson (BAS)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to voluntarily withdraw its Notice of Removal [1] by dft Michelin North Amer [5-1], granting motion to remand case to State Court w/Plas consent by Dft Michelin North Amer remanding case to state court (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion for admission pro hac vice as to Howard D Swanson, atty for pla Barbara Jenzen, pla Dewayne Janzen [4-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Motion to Withdraw
        MOTION to voluntarily withdraw its Notice of Removal [1] by dft Michelin North Amer [5-1] and to remand case to State Court w/Plas consent by Dft Michelin North Amer (MAP)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
          MOTION for admission pro hac vice as to Howard D Swanson, atty for pla Barbara Jenzen, pla Dewayne Janzen [4-1] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Mary H. Murguia All further papers/pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-03-01-PHX-MHM (cc: all counsel/MHM/DKD) [3-2] (MAP)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
              Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 1/6/03 (MAP)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Michelin North Amer on 12/2/02 (ESH)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 ADR-Miscellaneous
                  NOTICE of removal from Maricopa County Superior Court; Court Number: CV2002-018476. Considered for possible arbitration. (summons/complaint) (ESH)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 153 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?