Vancouver Wharves LP v. ASARCO Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00002-FJM
District Judge Frederick J Martone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vancouver Wharves LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FRANCIS J. BURKE, JR +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 fburke@steptoe.com
Space Jason Daniel Sanders +1 602 257 5200 +1 602 257 5299 jsanders@steptoe.com
v.
No Logo Asarco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Harris Trust Bank, Garnishee
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Garnishee
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $993000
Nature of Suit 150 - Contract: Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause Section 9 U.S.C. § 9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Loan
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 2/3/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton for Judge Martone granting motion for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank One on or about 3/24/03 in Maricopa County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [28-1]; Garnishee is discharged and fully released from liability to the judgment creditor with respect to the writ of garnishment (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton for Judge Martone: granting motion for release of writ of garnishment on Bank One on or about 3/25/03 in Gila County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [29-1]; Garnishee is discharged and fully released from liability to the judgment creditor with respect to the writ of garnishment (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 43 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton for Judge Martone: granting motion for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank One on or about 3/24/03 in Pima County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [30-1]; Garnishee is discharged and fully released from liability to the judgment creditor with respect to the writ of garnishment (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 42 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton for Judge Martone: granting motion for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank of America on or about 3/24/03 in Maricopa County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [31-1]; Garnishee is discharged and fully released from liability to the judgment creditor with respect to the writ of garnishment (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 41 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton for Judge Martone: granting motion for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank of America on or about 3/24/03 in Gila County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [32-1]; Garnishee is discharged and fully released from liability to the judgment creditor with respect to the writ of garnishment (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 40 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank of America on or about 3/24/03 in Pima County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [33-1]; Garnishee is discharged and fully released from liability to the judgment creditor with respect to the writ of garnishment (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 39 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
              PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ and summons of garnishment on Wells Fargo Bank, Globe, AZ on 3/25/03 by service on Christine Durbin (former emp) Modified on 04/10/2003
                LREF
                Blank 38 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ of garnishment Bank of America, Globe, AZ on 3/25/03 by service on Stacie Allison (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 37 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                  PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ of garnishment and summons on Bank One, Gila County, Payson, AZ (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 36 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
                    ANSWER by garnishee Wells Fargo Bank NA, Gila County, Levy Processing MAC S4101-155, PO Box 29779, Phoenix, AZ 85038-9779 to writ of garnishment (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 35 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
                      ANSWER by garnishee Wells Fargo Bank NA, (Maricopa County) Levy Processing MAC S4101-155, PO Box 29779, Phoenix, AZ 85038-9779 to writ of garnishment (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
                        ANSWER by garnishee Wells Fargo Bank NA, Pima County, Levy Processing, MAC S4101-155,PO Box 29779 Phoenix, AZ 85038-9779 to writ of garnishment (former emp) Modified on 04/02/2003
                          LREF
                          Blank 33 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Quash
                          APPLICATION (MOTION) for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank of America on or about 3/24/03 in Pima County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [33-1] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 32 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Quash
                            APPLICATION (MOTION) for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank of America on or about 3/24/03 in Gila County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [32-1] (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 31 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Quash
                              APPLICATION (MOTION) for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank of America on or about 3/24/03 in Maricopa County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [31-1] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 30 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Quash
                                APPLICATION (MOTION) for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank One on or about 3/24/03 in Pima County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [30-1] (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 29 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Quash
                                  APPLICATION (MOTION) for release of writ of garnishment on Bank One on or about 3/25/03 in Gila County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [29-1] (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 8/19/2003 Motion to Quash
                                    APPLICATION (MOTION) for release of writ of garnishment served on Bank One on or about 3/24/03 in Maricopa County AZ by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [28-1] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 27 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ & summons & garnishment on Washington Mutual, Tucson, AZ on 3/27/03 (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/31/2003 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
                                        ANSWER by garnishee Harris Trust Bank, 6720 N Scottsdale, AZ Ste 111, Scottsdale, AZ 85253-4424 to writ of garnishment (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                          PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ of summons and garnishment on Bank One, Tucson, AZ by service on Carol Cloutier on 3/24/03 (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 24 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                            PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ and summons of garnishment on Bank of America, service on David Duran, Tucson, AZ on 3/24/03 (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                              PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ and summons of garnishment on Harris Trust, Tucson, AZ on 3/24/03, served on Barbara Kingman (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ of garnishment on Wells Fargo, Tucson, AZ on 3/24/03, acceptance by Erin Chico (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Answer to Writ of Garnishment
                                                  ANSWER by garnishee Harris Trust to writ of garnishment (filed by attorneys for pla Vancouver Wharves) (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ and summons of garnishment on Washington Mutual, on Patrick Hiatt on 3/24/03 in Phoenix, AZ (former emp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      PROOF OF SERVICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of writ and summons of garnishment on Wells Fargo, service on Armando Portillo, on 3/24/03 in Phoenix, AZ (former emp) Modified on 03/26/2003
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Application
                                                        APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on garnishee, Harris Trust, Phoenix, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Application
                                                          APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on garnishee, Bank of America, Phoenix, AZ (writ issued) (former emp) Modified on 03/25/2003
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Application
                                                            APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Garnishee, Wells Fargo (Writ Issued) (former emp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Application
                                                              APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Garnishee, Bank One, Phoenix, AZ (writ issued) (former emp) Modified on 03/25/2003
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Application
                                                                APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Washington Mutual, Phoenix, AZ (Writ Issued) (former emp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                  APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Bank One, Payson, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                    APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Harris Trust, Tucson, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                      APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Wells Fargo, Gloge, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                        APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Bank One, Tucson, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                          APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Bank of America, Tucson, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                            APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Washington, Mutual (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                              APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Bank of America, Globe, AZ (writ issued) (former emp) Modified on 03/25/2003
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Application
                                                                                APPLICATION by pla Vancouver Wharves LP for writ of garnishment on Wells Fargo, Tucson, AZ (writ issued) (former emp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                  JUDGMENT by Judge Frederick J. Martone : granting motion for judgment and order confirming arbitration award by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [1-1]; the Arbitration Award to Vancouver Wharves is confirmed in all aspects in the amount of $645,220.60; Vancouver Wharves is awarded additional interest in the amount of $13,788.27; ASARCO is thus ordered to pay $659,008.87 to Vancouver Wharves, L.P.; Vancouver Wharves LP is awarded additional interest at the rate of 6.5% from the date of this order until the award is satisfied in full by ASARCO; ASARCO is also ordered to pay costs in the amount of $150 associated with this proceeding; ASARCO are required to comply with the Arbitration Award in all respects terminating case (cc: all counsel/jgmdrw) (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                    STIPULATION re judgment (the Court may enter judgment) by pla Vancouver Wharves LP, dft ASARCO Inc (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                      STIPULATED request for extension of time until 1/22/03 for ASARCO to respond to application and motion for judgment and order confirming arbitration award by pla Vancouver Wharves LP, dft ASARCO Inc (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                        NOTICE by pla Vancouver Wharves LP of application and motion for judgment and order confirming arbitration award (former emp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                                                          MOTION for judgment and order confirming arbitration award by pla Vancouver Wharves LP [1-1] (LSP)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                                            COMPLAINT FILED (LSP)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?