Erikson v. Villa Seville Townhs
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00003-ROS
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rolf Erikson, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Villa Seville Townhouses Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Stephen Mayhall +1 602 240 6711

Toggle Switch Represented by dbglawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angila Lynn Gallenstein +1 602 240 6711 +1 602 240 6951 algefilings@dbglawfirm.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Maricopa
Terminated 1/28/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: re: order filed [25-1] to dismiss case ; ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (cc: all counsel/jgm drawer) (LAD)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver that this action is dismissed with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; denying as moot the motion to strike paragraphs 3, 6, 7, 8 and 10 of dft's answer by pla Rolf Erikson [4-1]; denying as moot the motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1]; denying as moot the motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1]; denying as moot the motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1]; denying as moot the motion for oral argument on motion for summary judgment by pla Rolf Erikson [12-1]; denying as moot the motion to strike motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1] by pla Rolf Erikson [17-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
      MINUTE ORDER: On Court's motion, IT IS ORDERED vacating hearing re motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1], vacating hearing re motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Seville Townhs [9-1], and vacating hearing re motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] set for hearing on January 16, 2004. The Court has reviewed all the documents filed and determined that a hearing is not necessary to rsolve the pending motions. A separate order will issue on the Court's rulings. (cc: all counsel) [24-1] (SJF)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/9/2003 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
        MINUTE ORDER: On Court's motion, IT IS ORDERED re-setting motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1], re-setting motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1], and re- setting motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] for hearing on January 16, 2004 at 1:30 p.m. and vacating the hearing set December 17, 2003. (cc: all counsel) [23-1] (SJF)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
          MINUTE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1]; setting motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1]; and setting motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] for hearing on December 17, 2003 at 2:00 p.m. (cc: all counsel) [22-1] (SJF)
            LREF
            Blank 21 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
            FURTHER NOTIFICATION AND REPLY by pla Rolf Erikson to response previous notification of Rules violation by dft [20-1] (LAD)
              LREF
              Blank 20 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Response
              RESPONSE by dft to notice of rules violation [17-1] (SAT)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE by dft to Motion to strike motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1] by pla Rolf Erikson [17-1] (SAT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by dft Villa Seville Townhs to dft's statement of facts in support of cross-motion for summary judgment [10-1] (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                    REPLY by dft Villa Seville Townhs to response to motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1] (LAD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Other Notice
                      NOTIFICATION by pla Rolf Erikson of rules violation by dft (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Motion to Strike
                        MOTION to strike motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1] by pla Rolf Erikson [17-1] (LAD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Joinder
                          JOINDER by dft Villa Seville Townhs to motion for oral argument on motion for summary judgment by pla Rolf Erikson [12-1] (LAD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by dft Villa Seville Townhs to motion for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1] (LAD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by pla Rolf Erikson to cross-motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1] (LAD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY by pla Rolf Erikson to response to motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] (LAD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by pla Rolf Erikson to dft's statement of facts in support of cross-motion for summary judgment [10-1] (LAD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by pla Rolf Erikson to response to motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] (LAD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Motion for Hearing or Conference
                                      MOTION for oral argument on motion for summary judgment by pla Rolf Erikson [12-1] (LAD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 ~Motion for Judgment
                                        MOTION for judgment on the pleadings by pla Rolf Erikson [11-1] (LAD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Statement
                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS by dft Villa Seville Townhs re motion for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1] (LAD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Response
                                            RESPONSE by dft Villa Seville Townhs to statement of facts by pla in support of motion for summary judgment [6-1] (LAD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                              CROSS-MOTION for summary judgment (as to entire case) by dft Villa Seville Townhs [9-1] and RESPONSE to motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] by dft Villa Seville Townhs (LAD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by pla Rolf Erikson to response to motion to strike paragraphs 3, 6, 7, 8 and 10 of dft's answer by pla Rolf Erikson [4-1] (LAD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE by dft Villa Seville Townhs to motion to strike paragraphs 3, 6, 7, 8 and 10 of dft's answer by pla Rolf Erikson [4-1] (LAD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Statement
                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS by pla Rolf Erikson re motion for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] (LAD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                      MOTION for summary judgment on entire case (as there is no genuine issue as to any material fact and pla is entitled to entry of judgment as a matter of law) by pla Rolf Erikson [5-1] (LAD) Modified on 03/10/2003
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003, Terminated: 1/28/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                        MOTION to strike paragraphs 3, 6, 7, 8 and 10 of dft's answer by pla Rolf Erikson [4-1] (LAD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Jury Demand
                                                          DEMAND for jury trial by pla Rolf Erikson (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Answer
                                                            ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by dft Villa Seville Townhs (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT FILED (ESH)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?