Adakai v. Salt River Project, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00004-MHM
District Judge Mary H. Murguia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Franklin Adakai, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement And Power District, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JENNINGS, STROUSS & SALMON, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John James Egbert +1 602 262 5900 +1 602 495 2615 johnegbert@jsslaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Jury Verdict
County Navajo
Terminated 2/14/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '06-15528'['Ninth Circuit']
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROTO, STD
  Entries (192) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 185 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Mandate of 9th Circuit
MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy) Dismissing appeal for lack of jurisdiction, case number 06-15528, as to [178] Notice of Appeal filed by Franklin Adakai, (DMT, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 184 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006, Terminated: 2/2/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
    First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Petitioner by Franklin Adakai. (Gottfried, Alona)
      LREF
      Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 Other Notice
      Notice re Request for entire trial transcript by Franklin Adakai re [178] Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Copies of Transcript Order)(LSP)
        LREF
        Legal Document 182 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Taxation of Costs
        Taxation of Costs in amount of $ 4,121.95 against Plaintiff.Signed by Chief Deputy Michael O'Brien on 4/7/06. (AMS, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 181 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 USCA Case Number
          Ninth Circuit Case Number 06-15528 for [178] Notice of Appeal. (LSP)
            LREF
            Legal Document 180 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Other Notice
            Notice of ordering Trial Transcripts by Franklin Adakai (LSP)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Appeal Remark
              Appeal Remark: received Appellant's "Addendum to Appellnat's Informal Brief", re [178] Notice of Appeal; forwarded to the Ninth Circuit this date. (LSP)
                LREF
                Legal Document 179 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Notice of Appeal - Notification Form
                Notice of Appeal Notification Form; Notice of Appeal and copy of docket sheet transmitted to Ninth Circuit and all parties re [178] Notice of Appeal (LSP)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Appeal Remark
                  CADS Sent re [178] Notice of Appeal: Civil Appeals docketing sent to 9th Circuit on this date. (LSP)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 178 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit, as to [172] Clerk's Judgment by Franklin Adakai. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number PHX040756. (LSP)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 USCA Appeal Fees
                      USCA Appeal Fees received $ 255 receipt number PHX040756 re [178] Notice of Appeal filed by Franklin Adakai, (LSP)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        Excerpted TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Day 3 and 4 testimony of George Graham during Proceedings held on 2/3/06 before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Elizabeth A Lemke. (BAS, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 176 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: 3/9/2006 Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Franklin Adakai for testimony of George Graham during trial proceedings held on 2/3/06 through 2/7/06 before Judge Mary H Murguia. (BAS, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 175 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: 3/3/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting [173] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Withdrawing Tod F Schleier and Schleier, Jellison & Schleier for Pla . Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/2/06. (MAP, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 174 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Bill of Costs
                              BILL OF COSTS by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Attachments: # (1) Copies of invoices)(Egbert, John)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 173 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006, Terminated: 3/3/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Plaintiff by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 172 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Clerks Judgment
                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff; case closed. (REW, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 171 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Jury Instructions
                                    Jury Instructions. (SBU, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 170 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Witness List
                                      Witness List by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (SBU, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 169 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Witness List
                                        Witness List by Franklin Adakai. (SBU, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 168 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Exhibit
                                          Exhibit List (Plaintiffs) submitted by the Court (Jury Trial). (MAP, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 167 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006 Exhibit
                                            Exhibit List (Dft) submitted by the Court (Jury Trial) (MAP, ) Modified on 2/14/2006 (MAP, ). MODIFIED TO CORRECT DOCKET TEXT FROM NON-JURY TO JURY)
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 166 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Sealed Document +
                                              Sealed VERDICT . (REW, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 165 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Jury Trial CompletedCourt Filing
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Jury Trial - Day 8. 1:42 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. The Court advises counsel that a verdict has been reached. 1:44 p.m. Jury is now present. Verdict reads as follows: "We, the jury, duly empaneled and sworn in the above-entitled action, do find: in favor of Defendant SRP and againt Plaintiff on Plaintiff's claim of unlawful discrimination based upon race and Plaintiff takes nothing. We, the jury, duly empaneled and sworn in the above-entitled action, do find: in favor of Defendant SRP and against Plaintiff on Plaintiff's claim of unlawful retaliation and Plaintiff takes nothing." 1:47 p.m. Court adjourns. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 164 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is Robert Peterson, defendant's representative. Jury Trial - Day 7. 9:26 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant's motions for judgment as a matter of law. 9:34 a.m. Jury is now present. FOR THE DEFENDANT: William Diak is sworn, examined, cross-examined, further examined on redirect, and excused. Eric Johnson is sworn, examined, cross-examined, and excused. Melissa Jerrell is sworn, examined, cross-examined, and excused. Defendant rests. 10:37 a.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 10:39 a.m. Court stands at recess. 11:44 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Discussion held regarding jury instructions. Mr. Egbert reurges the motions for judgment as a matter of law, which motions are DENIED. 12:05 p.m. Court stands at recess. 12:55 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Discussion held. 1:03 p.m. Court stands at recess. 1:24 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. The instructions and verdict form are finalized. 1:26 p.m. Jury is now present. The Court instructs the jury. Counsel argue the matter in closing. 2:35 p.m. Court stands at recess. 2:47 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Discussion held. 2:48 p.m. Jury is now present. Closing arguments continue. The Court further instructs the jury. The bailiff is administered the oath to take charge of the jury. 4:14 p.m. Jury is excused to begin deliberations. Court and counsel remain in session. The Court DIRECTS counsel to leave their contact information with the Clerk. Counsel do not object to providing the jury with additional copies of instructions, if requested. 4:20 p.m. Court stands at recess. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 163 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/9/2006 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is Robert Peterson, defendant's representative. Jury Trial - Day 6 held. 9:23 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Franklin Adakai resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 10:47 a.m. Court stands at recess. 11:09 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Franklin Adakai resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 12:09 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 12:12 p.m. Court stands at recess. 1:43 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Franklin Adakai resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 3:04 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 3:04 p.m. Court stands at recess. 3:23 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Franklin Adakai resumes the stand, is cross-examined, further examined on redirect, and excused. Exhibit 658 (defendant's impeachment exhibit 2) is admitted into evidence. Plaintiff rests. At sidebar, Mr. Egbert orally moves for judgment as a matter of law re: punitive damages. 4:03 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Mr. Egbert further moves for judgment as a matter of law re: race descrimination. The Court and counsel discuss jury instructions. 4:46 p.m. Court stands at recess until 9:00 a.m. on February 9, 2006. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 162 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                      MOTION for Judgment As A Matter of Law on Race Discrimination by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 161 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006, Terminated: 2/14/2006 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                        MOTION for Judgment As A Matter of Law on Punitive Damages by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is Robert Peterson, defendant's representative. Jury Trial - Day 5. 9:22 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Exhibits 162, 163, 165, 166, 610, and 422 are admitted into evidence. The Court advises counsel that Plaintiff's impeachment exhibit 1 has been renumbered to exhibit 253. Mr. Egbert makes an offer of proof at sidebar. 9:28 a.m. Jury is now present. George Graham resumes the stand, is cross-examined, further examined on redirect, and excused. Reuben Begay is sworn, examined, and cross-examined. Exhibit 14 is admitted into evidence. 10:44 a.m. Court stands at recess. 11:08 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Reuben Begay resumes the stand, is cross-examined, further examined on redirect, and excused. Franklin Adakai is sworn and examined. Exhibit 363 is admitted into evidence. 11:55 a.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 11:57 a.m. Court stands at recess. 1:26 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Exhibits 70, 190, 238, 304, 306, 314, 325, 362, 363, 374, 383, 403, 410, 412, 413, 414, 415, 416, 417, 418, 421, 426, 441, 442, 455, 489, 490, 509, 511, 516, 517, 578, 581, 582, 585, and 586 are admitted into evidence. 1:29 p.m. Jury is now present. Franklin Adakai resumes the stand, is examined, and cross-examined. Exhibits 420, 206, and 2 are admitted into evidence. 2:45 p.m. Court stands at recess. 3:05 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Franklin Adakai resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 4:29 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 4:31 p.m. Court stands at recess until 9:00 a.m. on February 8, 2006. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.] (KSP)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 159 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attachment)(Egbert, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 158 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is defendant's representative, Robert Peterson. Jury Trial - Day 4. 9:16 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Counsel advise the Court that exhibit 652 has been redacted. 9:18 a.m. Jury is now present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand, is examined on redirect, further re-crossed, and excused. Impeachment exhibit 1 is admitted into evidence. Charles Brumback is sworn, examined, cross-examined, further examined on redirect, and excused. 10:38 a.m. Court stands at recess. 10:57 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Dr. Brady Wilson is sworn and examined. Exhibit 652 is admitted into evidence. 11:58 a.m. Jury is excused; court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 12:00 p.m. Court stands at recess. 1:23 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Dr. Brady Wilson resumes the stand, is examined, and cross-examined. 2:32 p.m. Court stands at recess. 2:54 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Discussion held. 2:56 p.m. Jury is now present. Dr. Brady Wilson resumes the stand, is cross-examined, further examined on redirect, and excused. George Graham is sworn and examined. Exhibits 590, 422, 598, 599, 233, 202, and 203 are admitted into evidence. 4:32 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held regarding trial schedule. 4:34 p.m. Court stands at recess until 9:00 a.m. on February 7, 2006. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 157 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is defendant's representative, Robert Peterson. Jury Trial - Day 3. 9:18 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Based upon the stipulation of counsel, the following exhibits are admitted into evidence: 538, 539, 540, 541, 542, 543, 544, 545, 546, 547. Discussion held. 9:21 a.m. Jury is now present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand and is cross-examined. Exhibit 355 is admitted into evidence. 10:42 a.m. Court stands at recess. 11:04 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 11:58 a.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 11:59 a.m. Court stands at recess. 1:20 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 2:43 p.m. Court stands at recess. 3:07 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Discussion held. 3:09 p.m. Jury is now present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 3:51 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 3:54 p.m. Court stands at recess until 9:00 a.m. on February 3, 2006. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached. (KSP)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 155 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [151] STIPULATION by Franklin Adakai, Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John) correcting pretrial order and stating certain facts . Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 02/01/06. (DNH )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006 Jury Trial HeldCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Liz Lemke. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is defendant's representative, Robert Peterson. Jury Trial - Day 2. 9:17 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Based upon the stipulation of counsel, the following exhibits are admitted into evidence: 1, 3, 4, 7, 9, 10, 11, 12, 160, 164, 173, 175, 178, 196, 201, 204, 210, 211, 219, 220, 223, 225, 227, 228, 229, 234, 248, 303, 307, 309, 320, 322, 323, 330, 331, 341, 344, 347, 353, 358, 378, 386, 388, 391, 394, 424, 444, 459, 461, 514, 522, 524, 525, 526, 527, 528, 529, 530, 531, 532, 533, 534, 535, 533, 534, 535, 536, 549, 567, 568, 569, and 576. 9:24 a.m. Jury is now present. Robert Peterson is sworn and examined. Exhibit 169 is admitted into evidence. 10:36 a.m. Court stands at recess. 10:56 a.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand and is examined. 11:56 a.m. Court stands at recess. 1:26 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Jury is not present. Based upon the stipulation of counsel, the following exhibits are admitted into evidence: 110, 126, 141, 177, 179, 182, 185, 191, 193, 199, 200, 205, 222, 301, 302, 312, 313, 317, 318, 319, 321, 326, 329, 332, 334, 338, 339, 345, 347, 350, 352, 356, 357, 360, 369, 370, 372, 373, 374, 377, 395, 407, 408, 423, 429, 430, 431, 434, 435, 437-440, 445, 447, 448, 451-454, 457, 458, 465, 469, 470, 473, 475, 477, 478, 481, 483, 486, 492, 493, 495, 497, 500, 501, 503, 504, 510, 521, 542, 563, 587, 623, 627, 628, 635, and 651. 1:30 p.m. Jury is now present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand, is examined, and cross-examined. 2:56 p.m. Jury is excused. Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 2:59 p.m. Court stands at recess. 3:22 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Robert Peterson resumes the stand and is cross-examined. 4:30 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held. 4:31 p.m. Court stands at recess until 9:00 a.m. on February 2, 2006. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Jury Trial BegunCourt Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. 9:37 a.m. Jury Trial commences - day 1. Plaintiff is present with counsel, Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Also present is Rob Petersen, defendant's representative. A panel of 44 persons is sworn, and the Court conducts voir dire examination. 11:54 a.m. Court stands at recess. 12:10 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel and jury present. Voir dire examination continues. Counsel pass the panel for cause. 12:46 p.m. Court stands at recess. 1:16 p.m. Court and counsel reconvene and 8 jurors are selected and sworn as trial jurors. The Court briefly admonishes the jury. 1:24 p.m. Court stands at recess. 2:33 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. 2:37 p.m. Jury is now present. Counsel invoke the rule of exclusion of witnesses. The Court gives preliminary instructions to the jury. Counsel make opening statements. 3:33 p.m. Court stands at recess. 3:49 p.m. Court reconvenes with counsel. Discussion held. The Court DIRECTS counsel to submit a proposed form of order re: stipulation to amend the proposed pretrial order. 3:51 p.m. Jury is now present. Opening statements continue. 4:29 p.m. Jury is excused; Court and counsel remain in session. Discussion held regarding order of witnesses. 4:31 p.m. Court stands at recess until 9:00 a.m. on February 1, 2006. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 153 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Memorandum
                                                                        MEMORANDUM re: re Retaliatory Discharge re [152] Memorandum by Plaintiff Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 152 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Memorandum
                                                                          MEMORANDUM re: Defendant's Trial Memorandum Regarding Retaliatory Discharge by Defendant Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 151 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006, Terminated: 6/1/2008 Stipulation
                                                                            STIPULATION by Franklin Adakai, Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 150 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Adakai of Patricia McFarlen (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Adakai of Rueben Begay (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried for the plaintiff. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Status Hearing held. Counsel advise the Court that they have been able to resolve the objections to each sides exhibits with the exception of the following: 77, 108, 132, 650, and 654. The Court DIRECTS counsel to provide the Court with copies of those exhibits at issue. Discussion held regarding trial length, procedure, and witnesses. The Court will permit each side a total of 20 hours. Jury Trial set January 31, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. is AFFIRMED. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 147 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: 1/26/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re: Defendant's Trial Memorandum on Examination of Witnesses by Defendant Salt River Project. (Egbert, John)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re: Punitive Damages by Plaintiff Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 145 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re: Defendant's use of leading questions by Plaintiff Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 144 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Franklin Adakai of Charles Brumback (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 143 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Set Hearings
                                                                                            Minute Order: The Court ORDERS that the Status Hearing currently set on January 27, 2006 be moved to Thursday, January 26, 2006 at 3:00 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 142 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Tod Schleier and Alona Gottfried for the plaintiff. John Egbert and Gordon Lewis for the defendant. Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/9/06. Discussion held regarding trial length, witnesses, and procedure. The Court notes Trial is scheduled to begin on January 31, 2006 and the Court will allow a total of eight trial days. Plaintiff's motion in limine on Defendant's affirmate defense of mitigation of damages [doc. 129] is DENIED. The Court reserves its ruling re: Plaintiff's motion in limine on Plaintiff's responses to Defendant's First set of requests for admission to plaintiff [doc. 130]. Defendant's motion in limine re: rumors about Len Burke's alleged prejudices against African Americans [docs. 131] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion in limine re: protected activity [doc. 133] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for advisory jury pursuant to F.R.C.P. 39(c) on the issues of front pay and back pay [doc. 132] is DENIED. There being no objection, a jury of 8 will be selected and all will deliberate. IT IS ORDERED setting this matter for Status Hearing on Friday, January 27, 2006 at 3:30 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSP)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 141 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [132] MOTION for Advisory Jury on Front and Back Pay filed by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 140 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re [129] MOTION in Limine re: Defendant's Affirmative Defense of Mitigation of Damages filed by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 139 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [130] MOTION in Limine re: Plaintiff's Responses to Df's 1st Set of RFA filed by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Egbert, John)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 138 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [133] MOTION in Limine re: Protected Activity filed by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 137 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [131] MOTION in Limine re: Rumors About Len Burke's Alleged Prejudices Against African-Americans filed by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 136 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Proposed Voir Dire
                                                                                                          Proposed Voir Dire by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 135 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 134 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Other Notice
                                                                                                              Notice re of filing Joint Proposed PreTrial Form of Order by Franklin Adakai (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 133 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine re: Protected Activity by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 132 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Advisory Jury on Front and Back Pay by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 131 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine re: Rumors About Len Burke's Alleged Prejudices Against African-Americans by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 130 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 2/14/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine re: Plaintiff's Responses to Df's 1st Set of RFA by Franklin Adakai. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 129 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005, Terminated: 1/9/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine re: Defendant's Affirmative Defense of Mitigation of Damages by Franklin Adakai. (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 128 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [121] Defendant's Motion for Clarification and in the Alternative Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 12/16/05. (MHM)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Set Deadlines
                                                                                                                          Minute Order: Counsel having contacted the Court telephonically, the Court ORDERS granting counsel an extension to lodge their proposed pretrial order until December 20, 2005. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.] (KSP)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [121] MOTION for Reconsideration (Motion for Clarification and Alternative Motion for Reconsideration) and alternative motion for reconsideration filed by Franklin Adakai. (Gottfried, Alona)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 124 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Tod F Schleier on behalf of Franklin Adakai (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Set Deadlines
                                                                                                                                Minute Order: The Court ORDERS directing Plaintiff to file a Response to Defendant's Motion for Clarification and Alternative Motion for Reconsideration [121] within 10 days of today's date. [This is TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.] (KSP)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                  Notice re Association of Tod F. Schleier for Plaintiff by Franklin Adakai (Schleier, Tod)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 125 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address to PO Box 2821, Window Rock, AZ. 86515 by Franklin Adakai (TLJ, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005, Terminated: 12/19/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration (Motion for Clarification and Alternative Motion for Reconsideration) by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (Egbert, John)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                        Minute Order: This is the time set for settlement conference. Present are Plaintiff Franklin Adakai; Plaintiff's counsel, Alona M. Gottfried; defense counsel, John J. Egbert; and, Robert Anderson, in-house counsel for Defendant Salt River Project. A court reporter is not present nor are the proceedings tape recorded. A settlement is not reached. (vlg)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting settlement conference on November 9, 2005 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. The parties are ordered to comply with those orders and directives contained within the attached Settlement Conference Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson on October 25, 2005. (vlg)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Set Hearings
                                                                                                                                            Minute Order: The Court ORDERS amending the minute entry filed 10/17/05 to reflect that the Final Pretrial Conference is set on January 9, 2006 at 4:00 p.m. rather than 9:00 a.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. [This is a TEXT ONLY entry. There is no.pdf document attached.](KSB)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 117 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2006 at 04:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 1/31/2006 at 09:00 AM before the Hon. Mary H. Murguia. Signed by Judge Mary H. Murguia on 10/18/05. (MHM)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Alona Gottfried (telephonically) for the plaintiff. John Egbert for the defendant. Status Hearing held. IT IS ORDERED setting this matter for Jury Trial on January 31, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting this matter for Final Pretrial Conference on January 9, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel submit a joint proposed pretrial order by December 16, 2005. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED referring this matter to a magistrate judge for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. The Clerk, by random lot, draws and assigns this matter to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson, such settlement conference to occur as soon as possible. Status Conference held on 10/17/2005. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/16/2005. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Mary H Murguia. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2006 04:00 PM before Judge Mary H Murguia. (Court Reporter Merilyn Sanchez.) (KSB, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 115 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [73] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part [75] Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/25/05. Pretrial Status Hearing set on 10/17/05 at 3:30 p.m. (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary H. Murguia. Court Reporter: Merilyn Sanchez. Apperances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Alona Gottfried. John Egbert for the defendant. Motion Hearing held. Counsel argue their positions to the Court. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement the cross motions for summary judgment [73 and 75]. [This is a text only entry. There is no.pdf document attached.] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Supplemental Authority by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District (MAP, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY to Response to Motion re [75] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District. (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia denying motion to strike exhibits to statement of fact, and portions of pla's affidavit by dft SRP Agricultural [89-1], denying motion to strike exhibit 1 of plaintiff's errata [96-1] by dft SRP Agricultural [105-1]. Dft is granted leave to file reply to exhibits attached to pla's separate statement of fact in support of pla's response to dft's motion for sum jgm. Dft's reply limited to arguments not previously raised in the briefing, in order to rebut evidence presented in the exhibits. Dft's reply due 7/11/05. (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by dft SRP Agricultural to response to motion to strike exhibit 1 of plaintiff's errata [96-1] by dft SRP Agricultural [105-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Court ORDERS that oral argument re: Motions for Summary Judgment and Motions to Strike [docs. 73, 75, 89, 105] currently set on July 5, 2005 be reset to Monday, August 1, 2005 at 4:00 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. (cc: all counsel) [109-1] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 6/21/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ERRATA by pla Franklin Adakai to Pla's response to Dft's motion to Strike [106-1] (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS setting this matter for oral argument re: cross motions for summary judgment and motions to strike [docs. 105, 89, 73, 75] on Tuesday, July 5, 2005 at 3:00 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. (cc: all counsel) [107-1] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by pla Franklin Adakai to motion to strike exhibit 1 of plaintiff's errata [96-1] by dft SRP Agricultural [105-1] (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to strike exhibit 1 of plaintiff's errata [96-1] by dft SRP Agricultural [105-1] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                        RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re order [98-1]: "Attempted Unknown", Research completed no updates found, Copy also sent to Pla's Attorney Alona Gottfried; Gillespie & Associates (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                          RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re order filed [91-1] envelop marked attempted unknown (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                            RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re order filed [88-1] (unknown) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                              RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re order filed [87-1] (unknown) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re order filed [94-1] (unknown) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft SRP Agricultural to response to motion to strike exhibits to statement of fact, and portions of pla's affidavit by dft SRP Agricultural [89-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to exceed the page limit for doc(s) reply in support of motion to strike by dft SRP Agricultural [97-1], vacating [0-0] lodged document (cc: all counsel) (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005, Terminated: 5/6/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to exceed the page limit for doc(s) reply in support of motion to strike by dft SRP Agricultural [97-1] (reply lodged at docket clerks desk) (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Lodged Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        LODGED reply in support of motion to strike by dft SRP Agricultural (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA by pla to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts [84-1] in Support of his Response to [83-1] Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by pla Franklin Adakai to motion to strike exhibits to statement of fact, and portions of pla's affidavit by dft SRP Agricultural [89-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to exceed the page limit for doc(s) Pla's Response to Dft's Motion to Strike by pla Franklin Adakai [93-1] Lodged Response at Docket Clerk's desk, vacating [0-0] lodged document (cc: all counsel) (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005, Terminated: 4/27/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to exceed the page limit for doc(s) Pla's Response to Dft's Motion to Strike by pla Franklin Adakai [93-1] Lodged Response at Docket Clerk's desk (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005 Lodged Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LODGED Pla's Response to Dft's Motion to Strike by pla Franklin Adakai (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by dft SRP Agricultural to response to motion for summary judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 91 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to exceed the page limit for doc(s) reply to motion for sum jgm by dft SRP Agricultural [90-1], vacating [0-0] lodged document (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005, Terminated: 4/11/2005 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to exceed the page limit for doc(s) reply to motion for sum jgm by dft SRP Agricultural [90-1] (lodged reply at docket clerk's desk) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 89 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005, Terminated: 6/29/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to strike exhibits to statement of fact, and portions of pla's affidavit by dft SRP Agricultural [89-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Lodged Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LODGED reply by dft SRP Agricultural (90) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting stipulation to extend time to 4/5/05 to file reply to motion for summary judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] by dft SRP Agricultural, pla Franklin Adakai (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to continue ruling on the matter until completion of disc by pla [41-2], denying motion for judgment on the pleadings re punitive damages by dft SRP Agricultural [38-1], finding the motion to refuse application by pla [41-1] moot. (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to extend time to 4/5/05 to file reply to motion for summary judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] by dft SRP Agricultural, pla Franklin Adakai (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by pla to response to motion for summary judgment on issue of retaliation by pla [73-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS by pla Franklin Adakai re response to motion [83-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by pla Franklin Adakai to motion for summary judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by dft SRP Agricultural to motion for summary judgment on issue of retaliation by pla [73-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to extend time to 3/3/05 for parties responses to motions for sum jgm by pla Franklin Adakai, dft SRP Agricultural [80-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion to Continue/Reset Status Hearing of 9/20/04 [54-1]. (cc: MHM, all counsel) [79-1] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005, Terminated: 2/16/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION (joint) to extend time for parties responses to motions for sum jgm by pla Franklin Adakai, dft SRP Agricultural [80-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia. Crt Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Alona Gottfried. John Egbert for the defendants. Status Hearing held. Discussion held regarding the status of the case. Plaintiff's counsel having filed a motion to extend time to respond to the pending motions for summary judgment and there being no objection, IT IS ORDERED granting counsel an extension to March 3, 2005 to respond to the cross motions for summary judgment [not yet docketed]. [cc: MHM] [78-2] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERRATA by dft SRP Agricultural to Exhibit A to statement of facts [76-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS by dft SRP Agricultural re motion for summary judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for summary judgment by dft SRP Agricultural [75-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS by pla re motion for summary judgment on issue of retaliation by pla [73-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005, Terminated: 8/29/2005 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for summary judgment on issue of retaliation by pla [73-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION in support by dft SRP Agricultural to motion for judgment on the pleadings re punitive damages by dft SRP [38-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Court ORDERS that the Status Hearing currently set on February 7, 2005 be reset to Thursday, February 10, 2005 at 3:30 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. (cc: MHM, all counsel) [69-2] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by dft SRP Agricultural to supplemental response to motion for judgment on the pleadings re punitive damages by dft SRP Agricultural [38-1] (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of service of fourth supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla Franklin Adakai (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of compliance of fifth supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft SRP Agricultural (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL by pla Franklin Adakai to resp to mtn for judgment on the pleadings re: punitive damages [41-3] (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia. Crt Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez. Telephonic Appearances: Alona Gottfried for the plaintiff and John Egbert for the defendant. Discovery Dispute Hearing held. The Court sustains plaintiff's objection to the defendant's request for admission. The Court DIRECTS counsel to meet personally and confer with respect to plaintiff's request for production of documents. [cc: MHM] [65-1] re: minute entry [65-1] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft SRP Agricultural (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re minute entry "attempted unknown" [61-2] (SRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia : granting stipulation confidentiality agreement and protective order by pla Franklin Adakai, dft SRP Agricultural (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia. Crt Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez. Appearances: Plaintiff is present with counsel, Alona Gottfried. John Egbert appearing for the defendants. Status Hearing held. Discussion held regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Defendant's Cross Motion. The Court GRANTS plaintiff's counsel leave until November 30, 2004 to submit supplemental briefing on additional discovery. Defense counsel shall file any response by December 14, 2004. IT IS ORDERED setting this matter for Status Hearing on February 7, 2005 t 3:45 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. [cc: MHM] [61-2] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION confidentiality agreement and protective order by pla Franklin Adakai, dft SRP Agricultural (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of service of discovery by dft SRP Agricultural . (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Court ORDERS that the Status Hearing regarding settlement status currently set on October 25, 2004 be RESET to Thursday, October 28, 2004 at 2:30 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. (cc: MHM, all counsel) [59-2] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of service of third supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft SRP Agricultural (KCS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to extend deadline for disclosure of Dft's expert witnesses and proposed order by dft SRP Agricultural Improvement and Power District [52-1] . Dft to disclose expert witnesses and reports by 10/7/04 and rebuttal experts to be discloded by 11/1/04. Discovery ddl set for 12/6/04 ; dispositive motions due 1/17/05 (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: At counsel's request due to a calendar conflict, the Court ORDERS that the Status Hearing regarding settlement status set on September 20, 2004 be reset to Monday, October 25, 2004 at 4:30 p.m. before the Honorable Mary H. Murguia. (cc: MHM, all counsel) [55-2] (KSB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by pla to motion to extend deadline for disclosure of Dft's expert witnesses and proposed order by dft SRP Agricultural Improvement and Power District [52-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004, Terminated: 2/14/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to continue/reset status hrg of 9/20/04 with notice of conflict by pla [54-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER status hearing set for 8/23/04 is vacated and reset to 4:45 p.m., 9/20/04 (cc: all counsel) [53] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004, Terminated: 9/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to extend deadline for disclosure of Dft's expert witnesses and proposed order by dft SRP Agricultural Improvement and Power District [52-1] (LSP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of compliance of 2nd supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft SRP Agricultural (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to extend time to 9/7/04 to file disclosure of dft's expert witnesses by dft SRP Agricultural, rebuttal aexperts if any by 10/1/04 [49-1] ; discovery ddl set for 11/5/04 ; dispositive motions due 12/15/04 (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004, Terminated: 7/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to extend time to 9/7/04 to file disclosure of dft's expert witnesses by dft SRP Agricultural [49-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla re expert testimony (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of compliance of first supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft SRP Agricultural (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance of 3rd supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Franklin Adakai re order filed [44-1] (unknown) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting stipulation (JOINT) Motion for change of venue from Prescott Division to Pheonix Div. by plas, dfts . Matter shall be transferred to Phoenix division(cc: all counsel, file room, scanning clerk) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by dft SRP Agricultural to response to motion for judgment on the pleadings re punitive damages by dft SRP Agricultural [38-1] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION (JOINT) Motion for change of venue to by plas, dfts (FMP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CROSS-MOTION to refuse application by pla [41-1] ,or to continue ruling on the matter until completion of disc by pla [41-2] and RESPONSE to motion for judgment on the pleadings re punitive damages by dft SRP [38-1] by pla (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia granting motion to extend time to 4/12/04 for pla to respond to dft's motion for jgm on the pleadings re punitive damages by pla Franklin Adakai, dft SRP Agricultural [39-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004, Terminated: 4/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT MOTION to extend time to 4/12/04 for pla to respond to dft's motion for jgm on the pleadings re punitive damages by pla Franklin Adakai, dft SRP Agricultural [39-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 ~Motion for Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for judgment on the pleadings re punitive damages by dft SRP Agricultural [38-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of compliance of second supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of compliance of first supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia finding the motion for appointment of counsel by pla Franklin Adakai [12-2] moot., denying without prejudice the motion to change venue to Phoenix Division by pla Franklin Adakai [12-1], denying without prejudice the motion for judicial notice by pla [24-1] (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia ; discovery due 10/1/04 ; dispositive motions due 11/15/04 (cc: all counsel) re: order (scheduling) [34-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of service of discovery by dft SRP Agricultural . (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia . Crt Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez. Present: Alona Gottfried for pla; pla, Franklin Adakai; John Egbert for dft. Sched conference held. Court approves case mgmt plan; order to issue. ORDERED denying without prejudice motion for judicial notice by pla [24], denying without prejudice motion to change venue to Phoenix Division by pla Franklin Adakai [12-1]; finding the motion for appointment of counsel by pla Franklin Adakai [12-2] moot. FURTHER ORDERED setting status hearing re settlement status for 3:30 p.m., 8/23/04 [cc: all cnsl] [32] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft SRP Agricultural (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MGT PLAN/REPORT by pla, dft (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia designating action a standard track case; prel scheduling conf set for 4:30 1/26/04 (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: 11/12/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to complaint (amended) [25-1] by dft SRP Agricultural (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for pla by Alona Melanie Gottfried (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla;; jury demand [21-1], [20-1], [11-1], [10-1], [8-1], [1-1] terminating dft Bob Fenchek, dft George W Graham, dft Robert Candelaria, dft Dave G Areghini, dft Robert Peterson, dft Charlie D Brumback; (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003, Terminated: 1/26/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for judicial notice by pla [24-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Mary H. Murguia . Crt Rptr: Merilyn Sanchez. Present: Franklin Adakai, pla; John Egbert for dft. Status hearing held. Court directs pla to file in 30 days an amended complaint that conforms with Rule 8a and 8e of the FrCvP. [23] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Minute Order - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER On or about 8/5/03, plaintiff filed another Amended COmplaint that does not comply with the Court's Order of 6/13/03. A status hearing is set for 4:00PM, 9/22/03 in order to discuss, among other things, pleading requirements with plaintiff. Plaintiff is required to attend in person. Counsel for defendants shall also appear in person. After the hearing, plaintiff will be ordered to file another Amended Complaint. Therefore, defendants do not need to file responses at this time the Amended Compliant filed by plaintiff on or about 8/5/03. (cc: all counsel) [22] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla; [20-1], [11-1], [10-1], [8-1], [1-1] ; (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla Franklin Adakai ; [11-1] ; adding dft Bob Fenchek (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Dave G Areghini, by service on Gina Wong on 6/20/03 in Tempe, AZ (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft SRP Agricultural on 6/20/03 in Tempe, AZ (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Robert Candelaria on 6/14/03 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft George W Graham on 6/16/03 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Robert Peterson on 6/14/03 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED - summons, complaint attempted upon dft Charlie D Brumback (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia that pla shall file by 8/1/03 an amended complaint in compliance with this order (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [13-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by pla Franklin Adakai of current income status (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to change venue to Phoenix Division by pla Franklin Adakai [12-1] , for appointment of counsel by pla Franklin Adakai [12-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla;; jury demand per order [9-1] of 3/17/03; [10-1], [8-1], [1-1] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla;; jury demand [8-1] ; (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia denying motion to change venue to Phoenix by pla Franklin Adakai [6-1], denying motion for appointment of counsel by pla Franklin Adakai [6-2], denying motion for appointment of counsel by pla [7-1], granting motion to extend time to file amended complaint by pla [7-2]. If pla intends to re-file his complaint, he must do so by 4/14/03 and if pla fails to file an amended complaint by this date, Clerk is directed to enter dismissal of action (amended complaint filed 3/12/03) (cc: all counsel) (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla;; jury demand [1-1] terminating dft Salt River Project;adding dft Salt River Project And Agricultural Improvement and Power District, Charlie D Brumback, Robert Peterson, Dave G Areghini, Bob Candelaria, George W Graham (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for appointment of counsel by pla [7-1] , and to extend time to file amended complaint by pla [7-2] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 3/17/2003 Motion to Change Venue/Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to change venue to Phoenix by pla Franklin Adakai [6-1] , for appointment of counsel by pla Franklin Adakai [6-2] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Mary H. Murguia ALl further papaers/pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-03-004-PCT-MHM (cc: all counsel/MHM/VAM) [5-2] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 1/31/03 (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/17/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Franklin Adakai [2-1] FURTHER ORDERED dismissing w/out prejudice Pla's Complaint. If Pla intends to re-file his Complaint, he must do so nlt 3/14/03. If Pla fails to file an amended complaint by this date, Clk of Court is directed to enter dismissal of this action... possbl dsm ddl set for 3/14/03 (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003, Terminated: 1/17/2003 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to proceed in forma pauperis by pla Franklin Adakai [2-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT FILED (ESH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?