Hennessy Enterprises v. Arco Products Co, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00005-FJM
District Judge Frederick J Martone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hennessy Enterprises, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WILLIAM T. CANNON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Werner Meyer +1 602 279 1663 +1 602 222 4996 ronaldmeyerlaw@myexcel.com
v.
No Logo ARCO Products Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Schepler +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 scheplera@gtlaw.com
Space Jeffrey Harris Wolf +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 wolfj@gtlaw.com
BP Corporation North America, Inc. BP Corporation North America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "BP West Coast Products LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Schepler +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 scheplera@gtlaw.com
Space Jeffrey Harris Wolf +1 602 445 8000 +1 602 445 8100 wolfj@gtlaw.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2801 Petroleum Marketing Practices Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Maricopa
Terminated 11/29/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags STD, TERMED
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 84 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone pursuant to the court's order [83] filed 11/19/04, IT IS ORDERED dismissing this action with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and fees; case terminated (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
    LREF
    Blank 83 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying the Stipulation to Extend Dismissal Deadline (30 days) from 11/8/04 to 12/8/04 by pla, dfts [82-1]; The court notes that as of this writing we are already ten days past the deadline. Solely to give the parties an opportunity to provide their own formal written order of dismissal, we will dismiss this case with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs and fees on 11/22/04, unless before that date, the parties lodge with us their own form of order ; possbl dsm ddl set for 11/22/04 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
      LREF
      Blank 82 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004, Terminated: 11/19/2004 Stipulation
      STIPULATION to Extend Dismissal Deadline (30 days) from 11/8/04 to 12/8/04 by pla, dfts (first request) (SAT)
        LREF
        Blank 81 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone that the court having been advised this case has settled, IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice within 30 days of the date this order is filed unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date; FURTHER ORDERED that all pending hearings and motions are deemed moot; disc ddl moot; dispositive motion ddl moot ; jury trial moot , ; possbl dsm ddl set for 11/8/04 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
          LREF
          Blank 80 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Notice of Settlement
          NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by dft BP West Coast Prod ; possible dism ddl set for 12/6/04 (SAT)
            LREF
            Blank 79 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Frederick J. Martone. Crt Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis. Appearances: Ronald Meyer for plaintiff; Aaron Schepler and Jeffrey Wolf for defendants. Final pretrial conference is held. IT IS ORDERED denying without prejudice the motion in Limine No 1 re Expert Opinions of Gary Hossack by dft BP West Prod [72-1]. Defendants' request for evidentiary hearing re: Daubert outside the hearing of the jury [filed 10/1/04] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying the motion in Limine No 2 re Size, Wealth or Resources of Greenberg Traurig, LLP by dft BP West Coast Prod [73-1]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot the motion in Limine No 3 re Size, Wealth or Resources of BPWCP by dft BP West Coast Prod [74-1]. Court and counsel discuss pretrial matters. The length of trial is reduced to four days as follows: October 13, 14, 19 and 20. The court will order a panel of 25 jurors; eight jurors will be empaneled and any alternates remaining will deliberate. Each side will have three peremptory strikes. Counsel shall deliver to the courtroom deputy no later than noon on October 8, 2004 the trial exhibits, together with exhibit and witness lists to be used at trial. Instructions for marking exhibits and preparing exhibit and witness lists are attached for mailing to counsel. [cc: FJM, all counsel, docket clerk] [79-2] (KCB)
              LREF
              Blank 78 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE by pla to Motion in Limine No 1 re Expert Opinions of Gary Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [72-1] (SAT)
                LREF
                Blank 77 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Jury Instructions
                Proposed Jury Instructions by dft BP West Coast Prod (SAT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 76 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Proposed Voir Dire
                  Proposed Voir dire submitted by dft BP West Coast Prod (SAT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 75 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Memorandum
                    Trial MEMORANDUM of Law by dft BP West Coast Prod re (SAT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 74 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004, Terminated: 10/1/2004 Motion in Limine
                      MOTION in Limine No 3 re Size, Wealth or Resources of BPWCP by dft BP West Coast Prod [74-1] (SAT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 73 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004, Terminated: 10/1/2004 Motion in Limine
                        MOTION in Limine No 2 re Size, Wealth or Resources of Greenberg Traurig, LLP by dft BP West Coast Prod [73-1] (SAT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 72 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004, Terminated: 10/1/2004 Motion in Limine
                          MOTION in Limine No 1 re Expert Opinions of Gary Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [72-1] (SAT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 71 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Proposed Voir Dire
                            Voir Dire Questions submitted by pla (SAT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 71 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Statement
                              STATEMENT of Case by pla (SAT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 70 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Jury Instructions
                                Proposed Jury Instructions by pla (SAT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 69 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Jury Instructions
                                  Jury (Forms of Verdict) by pla (SAT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                    JOINT PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL ORDER submitted by pla, dft (SAT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 68 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Notice of Deposition
                                      NOTICE by dfts OF TAKING DEPO OF Gary Hossack on the following date(s): 8/12/04 (SAT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 67 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Other Notice
                                        NOTICE of compliance of 2nd supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft BP West Coast Prod (LAD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 66 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Other Notice
                                          NOTICE of service of discovery by pla Hennessy Enterprises . (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 65 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying motion (Request) for Settlement Conference by pla [63-1] (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 64 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Response to Motion
                                              RESPONSE by dft BP West Coast Prod to request for Settlement Conference by pla [63-1] (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 63 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004, Terminated: 6/15/2004 Motion for Hearing or Conference
                                                MOTION (Request) for Settlement Conference by pla [63-1] (SAT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting plaintiff's motion to continue trial (set for 6/8/04) [60-1] ; jury trial re-set for 9:00 10/13/04 ; Pretrial conference re-set for 3:00 10/1/04 ; PTO ddl re-set for 9/24/04 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Other Notice
                                                    NOTICE: Satisfaction of Court Order by pla that the Order for payment of attorney's fees in the amount of $1,000.00 as set forth in the Order dated 3/19/04 has been paid in full (SAT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004, Terminated: 5/12/2004 Motion to Continue
                                                      MOTION to Continue Trial (set for 6/8/04) by pla [60-1] (SAT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying in part the motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [40-1] with respect to the Petroleum Marketing Practice Act claim but granting in part the motion with respect to exemplary damages and the state claim (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone granting motion for Attorneys' Fees Incurred in Connection With its Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [50-1] in the amount of $1,000.00 to be paid by pla on or before 4/16/04 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY by dft BP West Coast Prod to response to motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [40-1] (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                              REPLY Memorandum by dft BP West Coast Prod to response in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees Incurred in Connection With its Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [50-1] (SAT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone DENYING defendant BP West Coast Products' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation its reply [54-1]; vacating [0-0] lodged document Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment; The dft shall submit a reply memorandum within the page limits no later than 3/12/04 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004, Terminated: 3/11/2004 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for doc(s) Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [54-1](lodged Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment lodged at docket clerk's desk) (SAT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Lodged Document
                                                                    LODGED Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant BP West Coast Products LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod (not used per order [55-1] dated 3/11/04 and placed on left side of file) (SAT) Modified on 03/11/2004
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone pursuant to the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Expert Deposition Deadline [51-1], IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for completing expert depositions is extended to 3/17/04 and Defendants shall have until 3/31/04 to offer rebuttal expert testimony; This extension and its consequenced will not be offered as a basis to amend any other deadline (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE by pla to Motion for Attorneys' Fees Incurred in Connection With its Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [50-1] (SAT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                          MOTION (Stipulated) for Extension of Expert Deposition Deadline by pla, dfts [51-1] (SAT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004, Terminated: 3/19/2004 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                            MOTION for Attorneys' Fees Incurred in Connection With its Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [50-1] (SAT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Statement
                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS by pla re response to [48-1] Motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [40-1] (SAT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Response
                                                                                RESPONSE by pla to Defendant's Statement of Facts [41-1] (SAT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                  RESPONSE by pla to Motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [40-1] (SAT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying defendant's motion to exclude expert opinions [35-1] (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying BPWCP's Motion in limine to Exclude the Purported Expert Opinions of Jack Hennessy by dft BP West Coast Prod [36-1] (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY Memorandum by dft BP West Coast Prod to response in Support of its Motion in limine re Purported Expert Opinions of Jack Hennessy by dft BP West Coast Prod [36-1] (SAT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                          REPLY Memorandum by dft BP West Coast Prod to response in Support of its Motion in limine re Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [35-1] (SAT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                            RESPONSE by pla to Motion in limine re Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [35-1] (SAT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE by pla to motion in limine re Purported Expert Opinions of Jack Hennessy by dft BP West Coast Prod [36-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004 Statement
                                                                                                STATEMENT OF FACTS by dft BP West Coast Prod in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [40-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004, Terminated: 3/19/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod [40-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: 1/7/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone pursuant to stipulation [38-1], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the response of Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in limine re Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [35-1] and Motion in limine re Purported Expert Opinions of Jack Hennessy by dft BP West Coast Prod [36-1] is due on or before 1/12/04 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 1/7/2004 Stipulation
                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Extend Time until 1/12/04 for Plaintiff to File Responsive Memorandum to Motion in limine re Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [35-1] and Motion in limine re Purported Expert Opinions of Jack Hennessy by dft BP West Coast Prod [36-1] [36-1] by pla, dfts (SAT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY Memorandum in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by dft BP West Coast Prod (document submitted under the wrong caption and case number; should be in CIV 03-338; subsequent filings will correct docket) (SAT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003, Terminated: 2/6/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTION in limine re Purported Expert Opinions of Jack Hennessy by dft BP West Coast Prod [36-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003, Terminated: 2/9/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                            MOTION in limine re Expert Opinions of Mark M Grumley and Gary S Hossack by dft BP West Coast Prod [35-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: 11/14/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Frederick J. Martone. Crt Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis. Appearances (both telephonic): Ronald Meyer for plaintiff; Jeffrey Wolf for defendant. Telephonic conference is held re: the January 20, 2004 trial date. Neither party objects to a continuance of the trial date based on the court's commencement of trial in another cause and prefer not to ride the calendar because the parties have experts and out-of-state witnesses to schedule. Accordingly, the court resets the following deadlines: discovery ddl set for 2/1/04 upon oral request of plaintiff's counsel and defendant not objecting; dispositive motions due 1/12/04; PTO ddl set for 5/21/04; final pretrial conference set for 3:00 pm on 5/28/04; jury trial set for 9:00 am on 6/8/04. [cc: FJM, all counsel] [34-2] (KCB)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                NOTICE: Defendants' Log of Privileged and/or Work-Product Documents by dfts (SAT)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla Hennessy Enterprises (MAP)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of service of discovery by pla Hennessy Enterprises . (MAP)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Discovery by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod . (SAT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying the Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's 10/9/03 Order by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod [28-1] (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003, Terminated: 10/29/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's 10/9/03 Order by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod [28-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of compliance of supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dfts (LAD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of service of discovery by dfts. (LAD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by dfts OF TAKING DEPO OF Jack Hennessy on the following date(s): 11/11/03 at 9 am (LAD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of service of discovery by dft BP West Coast Prod (LAD)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone denying motion to Continue Trial (set for 1/20/04) Due to Counsel's Conflict by dfts [20-1] denying motion to Modify Pretrial Order by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod [22-1] FURTHER ORDERED denying motion Schedule Status Conference by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod [22-2] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Modify Pretrial Order by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod [22-1] (document not submitted) and Schedule Status Conference by dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod [22-2] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines for Expert Disclosures until 10/15/03 by pla, dfts (SAT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003, Terminated: 10/9/2003 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Continue Trial (set for 1/20/04) Due to Counsel's Conflict by dfts [20-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of service of discovery by dfts. (SAT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla Hennessy Enterprises (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of service of discovery by pla Hennessy Enterprises . (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Frederick J. Martone ; discovery due 12/1/03 ; dispositive motions due 10/3/03 ; pretrial order due 1/5/04 ; Pretrial conference set for 3:00 1/9/04 jury trial set for 9:00 1/20/04 (cc: all counsel) (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY before Judge Frederick J. Martone. Crt Rptr: Linda Schroeder-Willis. Appearances: Ronald Meyer for plaintiff; Aaron Schepler for defendants. Also appearing: Jack Hennessy, principal of Hennessy Enterprises. Rule 16 scheduling conference is held; the court enters the following deadlines: discovery ddl set for 12/1/03; dispositive motions due 10/3/03; PTO ddl set for 1/5/04; final pretrial conference set for 3:00 pm on 1/9/04; jury trial set for 9:00 am on 1/20/04 (4 days). [cc: FJM] [15-2] (KCB)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service of Initial Rule 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dfts (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Supplement
                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENT/Addendum by dfts to the Proposed Case Management Plan [12-1] (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                          Proposed CASE MGT PLAN by pla, dfts (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla Hennessy Enterprises (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Frederick J. Martone ; prel scheduling conf set for 3:00 6/6/03 (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Minute Order - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(e), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Frederick J. Martone All further papers/pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CIV-03-05-PHX-FJM FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause hearing scheduled for 3/17/03 is hereby vacated (cc: all counsel/LOA/FJM) [9-2] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                  Party agrees to mag judge jurisdiction (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 Election to Assign Case to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                    Party elects assignment of case to district judge ; mag election form ddl satisfied 2/25/03 ; show cause hearing ddl satisfied 2/25/03 (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDERED that pla Hennessy Enterprises show cause for failure to comply with Local Rule 1.2(e) ; show cause hearing set for 1:30 3/17/03 for Hennessy Enterprises before Judge Stephen M. McNamee (cc: all counsel/AL) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to complaint [1-1] by dfts (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson granting stipulation to extend time for Dfts to answer the complaint thru 2/6/03 [1-1] by pla, dfts [3-1] (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to extend time for Dfts to answer the complaint thru 2/6/03 [1-1] by pla, dfts [3-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon Stat Agent for dft Arco Products Co, dft BP West Coast Prod on 1/3/03 (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/31/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT FILED (ESH)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 135 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?