Meas v. Long, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00006-MHM
District Judge Mary H. Murguia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sen Meas, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Immigration & Naturalization Service, Respondent
No Logo John Ashcroft, Respondent
No Logo Thomas Long, Respondent
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Pinal
Terminated 8/5/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Mail Returned
RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Sen Meas re judgment [11-1] per BOP website inmate was released 2/20/03 no other address available (ESH)
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003 Mail Returned
    RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Sen Meas re order filed [10-2] per BOP website petitioner was released 02/20/03 (ESH)
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
      JUDGMENT: that this Court having adopting the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Petitioner take nothing. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and this action are hereby dismissed. (cc: all counsel) re: judgment [11-1] (MAP)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia that the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge FURTHER ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed as moot terminating case (cc: all counsel) (MAP)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Mail Returned
          RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Sen Meas re motion REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [8-1] (research was conducted and no other address found) (TLJ)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 8/5/2003 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis recommending that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied as moot (cc: all counsel/MHM) (MAP) Modified on 05/09/2003
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
              RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/petition (certified mail) upon respondent INS on 4/24/03 (MAP)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/petition (certified mail) upon respondent John Ashcroft on 4/21/03 (MAP) Modified on 05/09/2003
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Other Notice
                  SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS by Respondents re Petition for Writ of H/C (MAP)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                    RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/petition upon Dianne Keefe for US Atty Dist of AZ on 4/17/03 (MAP)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                      USM 285, summons/petition/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to respondents. (MAP)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Mary H. Murguia: that a copy of the summons/petition/order be personally served at govt expense upon the US Atty, Dist of AZ by the US Marshal Svc. The US Marshal Svc shall send by certified mail copies of the summons/petition/order to Respondents and the US Atty Genl FURTHER ORDERED that the Respondents shall answer the Petition w/in 20 days of the date of svc FURTHER ORDERED Case referred to Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis for further proceedings and a Report & Recommendation (cc: All Cnsl/VAM) (MAP)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Mary H. Murguia and is referred to Virginia A. Mathis (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                            PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (ESH)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 171 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?