Yanez, et al v. American Natl Gen In, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00007-RCB
District Judge Robert C. Broomfield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carrieanne Yanes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen C Ryan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen C Ryan +1 623 551 3813 +1 623 551 3814 steveryan@azis.com
No Logo Orlando Yanes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen C Ryan PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen C Ryan +1 623 551 3813 +1 623 551 3814 steveryan@azis.com
v.
No Logo American National General Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Matheson +1 602 840 1400 +1 602 840 4411 matheson@poliball.com
No Logo American National Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "American National Insurance Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Matheson +1 602 840 1400 +1 602 840 4411 matheson@poliball.com
No Logo American National Property and Casualty Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Matheson +1 602 840 1400 +1 602 840 4411 matheson@poliball.com
No Logo Corey Wells, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Matheson +1 602 840 1400 +1 602 840 4411 matheson@poliball.com
No Logo Jane Doe Wells, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Paul Matheson +1 602 840 1400 +1 602 840 4411 matheson@poliball.com
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Remanded to State Court
County Maricopa
Terminated 1/28/2003
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case CV2002-023778[Sup Ct Maricopa]
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Robert C. Broomfield granting Stipulation for Remand of Action to State Court Under 28 USC 1447(c) by plas, dfts [4-1]; FURTHER ORDERED remanding this action to state court for all further proceedings; case remanded to state court (cc: all counsel) (SAT)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 1/28/2003 Stipulation
    STIPULATION and Motion for Remand of Action to State Court Under 28 USC 1447(c) by plas, dfts (SAT)
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 ERRATA
      Notice of Correction of Surname by pla [1-2] (Yanes not Yanez) (SAT)
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Answer
        ANSWER to complaint [1-2] by dfts (SAT)
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 ADR-Miscellaneous
          NOTICE of removal from Maricopa County Superior Court; Court Number: CV2002-023778. Considered for possible arbitration. (summons/complaint) (ESH)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 139 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?