Jaenke v. Maricopa Cty Sher Of, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00009-SRB--VAM
District Judge Susan R Bolton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul Alex Jaenke, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo John Does, Defendant
No Logo Maricopa County Correctional Health Services, Defendant
No Logo Maricopa County Sheriff's Office, Defendant
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/26/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003, Terminated: 8/26/2003 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a), Fed.R.Civ.P. This action is terminated. (cc: all counsel) re: judgment [16-1] (KMG)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton that pla's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal [14-1] is Granted and that the Complaint and this action are Dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a), Fed.R.Civ.P. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. to dismiss case (cc: all counsel) (KMG)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: 8/21/2003, Terminated: 8/26/2003 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by pla Paul Alex Jaenke [14-1] (KMG)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton that pla's Motions to Extend Time To Amend Complaint (Doc. Nos.10,11) are granted. That pla shall have 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an Amended Complaint on the court-approved form provided with this Order. ; spec. prisoner ddl set for 8/21/03 That the Clerk is directed to enter dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to pla, if pla fails to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. (cc: all counsel) (KMG)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Notice of Change of Address
          NOTICE by pla Paul Alex Jaenke #171574 of change of address: ASPC, Florence East Prison, PO Box 5000, Bed #C-1-2, Florence, AZ 85232 (KMG)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION to Extend Time To Amend Complaint/Lawsuit by pla Paul Alex Jaenke [11-1] (KMG)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Notice of Change of Address
              NOTICE by pla Paul Alex Jaenke #171574 of change of address: Arizona Department of Corrections, PO Box 52109, Phoenix, AZ 85072-2109 (KMG)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE by pla Paul Alex Jaenke of change of address to: 225 W Madison Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003, Booking #A915632 (SAT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Motion for Extension of Time
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Lawsuit by pla [10-1] (SAT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton that pla's Motion for Appointment of counsel [8-1] is Denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send a copy of the 1/14/03 Screening Order [3-1] to pla at his current address of record. (cc: all counsel) (KMG)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                      MOTION for appointment of counsel by pla Paul Alex Jaenke [8-1] (KMG)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Mail Returned
                        RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Paul Alex Jaenke re [3-1] (NOTE: Returned to Sender - Not In Intake - Rele 1/15/03). (KMG)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Mail Returned
                          RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Paul Alex Jaenke re order filed [4-1] **NOTE: Pla has filed a notice of Change of Address at docket #5 - This copy will be remailed to indicated address*** (KMG)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE by pla Paul Alex Jaenke #T46415 of change of address: Chuck Walla Valley State Prison, C7-165L, PO Box 2289, Blythe, CA 92226 (KMG)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE by Judge Susan R. Bolton That the Maricopa County Sheriff shall collect from pla's trust account the $150 filing fee in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). That the Clerk is directed to serve by mail a copy of this Order on Maricopa County Sheriff's Office Inmate Legal Services and upon Richard Stewart, Lead Counsel, Litigation Section, Maricopa County Attorney's Office as well as forward a copy on to the Financial Administration for the Phoenix Division of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona.(cc: all counsel) re: order filed [4-1] (KMG)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton that pla's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. That pla is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $150 for this action. Pla is assessed no initial partial filing fee. That the Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Pla shall have 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an Amended Complaint using the court-approved form provided with this Order. ; spec. prisoner ddl set for 2/13/03 That the Clerk is directed to enter dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to pla, if pla fails to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. (cc: all counsel) (KMG)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Susan R. Bolton and is referred to Virginia A. Mathis (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
                                    PRISONER Civil Rights Complaint filed. (ESH)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?