Maxwell v. Maricopa Cty Sher Of, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00010-EHC--SLV
District Judge Earl H. Carroll, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Benny Maxwell, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo John Doe Nowicki, Defendant
No Logo Reed, Defendant
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County Maricopa
Terminated 3/17/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: re: order filed [3-3] to dismiss case having failed to comply with this court's order, plaintiff shall take nothing and this complaint and action are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, EHC, SLV, judgment drawer) (TLJ)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Remark - Public
    REMARK as to Benny Maxwell re order filed [3-3] remailed order to plaintiff's new address on February 24th. (TLJ)
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Notice of Change of Address
      NOTICE by pla of change of address to: Benny Maxwell, 8838 W Highland, Phoenix, AZ 85037 (SAT)
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE by Judge Earl H. Carroll the Maricopa County Sheriff shall collect from pla's trust account an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $8.80 and shall forward the amount to the Clerk. Thereafter, the Maricopa County Sheriff shall collect from pla's trust account the balance of the $150 filing fee in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). That the Clerk is directed to serve by mail a copy of this Order on Maricopa County Sheriff's Office Inmate Legal Services and upon Richard Stewart, Lead Counsel, Litigation Section, Maricopa County Attorney's Office as well as forward a copy on to the Financial Administration for the Phoenix Division of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. (cc: all counsel) re: order filed [4-1] (KMG)
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that pla's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. That pla is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $150 for this action. Pla is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $8.80. That the following dft is dismissed from this action: Dismissing party Maricopa Cty Sher Of That the Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Pla shall have 30 days from the date this Order is filed to amend his Complaint using the court-approved form provided with this Order. ; spec. prisoner ddl set for 2/12/03 That the Clerk is directed to enter dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice to pla, if pla fails to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. (cc: all counsel) (KMG)
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
            NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Earl H. Carroll and is referred to Stephen L. Verkamp (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Complaint
              PRISONER Civil Rights Complaint filed. (ESH)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 477 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?