Shinichiro v. Long, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:03-cv-00011-PGR
District Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Inagaki Shinichiro, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Thomas Long, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia M Parsons +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7760 cynthia.parsons@usdoj.gov
Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2003
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Pinal
Terminated 3/11/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PPS, TERMED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005 Mail Returned
RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Inagaki Shinichiro re order filed [20-2] (forwarding order expired) (MAP)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Judgment*
    JUDGMENT: re: order filed [20-2] having adopted the Report and Recommendation, the petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied, this action is dismissed (cc: all counsel) (SRB)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt accepting and adopting the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; the petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and this action is dismissed; clerk shall enter judgment accordingly terminating case (cc: all counsel) (SRB)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004, Terminated: 3/11/2005 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis recommending that petitioner's habeas corpus proceeding be dismissed (cc: all counsel/PGR) (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt adopting the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge FURHTER ORDERED denying motion to be present re proceedings raised in the petition for writ of habeas corpus (pla removed to Japan) by petitioner Inagaki Shinichiro [10-1] FURTHER ORDERED granting motion by respondent(s) to dismiss w/out prejudice petition for writ of habeas corpus for failure to name proper respondents [15-1] FURTHER ORDERED that the Petitioner sahll have thru 5/28/04 in which to file an amended petition fro writ of habeas corpus that names the proper respondents... possbl dsm ddl set for 5/28/04 FURTHER ORDERED Case referred to Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis (cc: all counsel/VAM) (MAP)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Mail Returned
            RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Inagaki Shinichiro re motion REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION [16-1]; return for better address (resent- to include the Country (Japan) in the address) (former emp) Modified on 12/30/2003
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003, Terminated: 3/24/2004 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis recommending that the motion to dismiss for failure to name the proper party respondents be granted; the petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed without prejudice and petitioner given 30 days from the adoption of this report and recommendation by the District Court to file an amended petition naming both Thomas Ridge, and John Ashcroft as respondents in this matter; this is not an order that is immediately appealable to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals (cc: all counsel/PGR) (former emp) Modified on 12/17/2003
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION by respondent(s) to dismiss petition for writ of habeas corpus for failure to name proper respondents [15-1] (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis granting motion for extension of time limitations, until 10/7/03, to answer to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by respondent Thomas Long [13-1] (cc: all counsel) (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003, Terminated: 9/23/2003 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    MOTION for extension of time limitations, until 10/7/03, to answer to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by respondent Thomas Long [13-1] (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                      RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/petition upon res Thomas Long by service upon the US Attorney in Phoenix, AZ (Victoria Barbuto accepting) on 9/4/03 (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                        USM 285, summons/notice/complaint/order, resent to USMS this date as to dft USA (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                          ACCEPTANCE/ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE summons & complaint on 3/17/03, by certified mail on John Ashcropt in Washington DC (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003, Terminated: 3/24/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION to be present re proceedings raised in the petition for writ of habeas corpus (pla removed to Japan) by petitioner Inagaki Shinichiro [10-1] (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                              NOTICE by petitioner Inagaki Shinichiro of change of address, A78-024-977, Gunma-Ken, Tone-Gun, Shyuwa-Mura, Itoi, 166-2 Japan (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Mail Returned
                                RETURNED MAIL addressed to: Inagaki Shinichiro re order filed [6-3]; unclaimed/not in custody (remailed this date to address in Japan) (former emp) Modified on 03/18/2003
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003 Summons Returned Executed - Complaint/Habeas Petit
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED summons/complaint upon dft Thomas Long by legal evidence of service in Eloy, AZ on 3/12/03 (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt: Grounds One and Two of the Petition are denied; respondent INS is dismissed from the action party INS ; a copy of the summons, petition and this order be personally served at gov expense upon the US Attorney for the District of AZ by the US Marshal; US Marshal shall send a copy of the summons, petition and this order by certified mail to the respondent and the US Attorney General Case referred to Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis (cc: all cnsl/forms to USM) (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Service Packet Forwarded to USMS
                                      USM 285, summons/notice/complaint/order, forwarded to USMS this date as to dft Thomas Long, US Attorney District of AZ, US Attorney General. (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Other Notice
                                        NOTICE by petitioner Inagaki Shinichiro of filing fee payment on 1/3/03 (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Filing Fee Received
                                          RECEIPT of $5 habeas corpus filing fee as to Inagaki Shinichiro (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt: pet shall have 30 days from the date this order is filed to pay the $5 filing fee or file with the Court a properly signed and certified application to proceed in forma pauperis; the Clerk of the Court shall enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to pet if pet fails to pay the $5 filing fee or fails to file a signed and certified application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date this order is filed; Clerk of the Court shall provide to pet a current court-approved form for filing an application to proceed in forma pauperis; ; spec. prisoner ddl set for 2/13/03 (cc: all counsel/pet with form) (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment; case is assigned to Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt and is referred to Virginia A. Mathis (PS) and Court's Legal Staff for review. (ESH)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (ESH)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?